December 15, 2017 |
Filing
166
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motions to Amend-Alter Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed to Motion to Alter or Amend Summary Judgment [Doc. No.'s 161 and 164 ], are DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/15/17. (KKS)
|
March 10, 2017 |
Filing
158
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment [Doc. No.s 86 , 105 and 109 ] are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Deny All Summary Judgment motions, [Doc. No. 154 ] is denied. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/10/17. (KJS)
|
October 19, 2016 |
Filing
130
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions for Appointment of Counsel [Doc. No. 69, 74 and 116], are denied without prejudice. 69 116 74 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/19/16. (CLA)
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing
44
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to update the docket sheet [ECF No. 41 ] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk is directed to terminate Jane Does 2-7 and to add defendants Stacy Mosley, Kala Hunt er, Mary Mills, and Jeremy Trustee to the docket sheet.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Stacy Mosley, Kala Hunter, Mary Mills, and Jeremy Trustee are DISMISSED without prejudice.An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately., Stacy Mosley, Kala Hunter, Mary Mills and Jeremy Trustee added. Jane Does 2-7 terminated.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/20/2016. (CLK)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
40
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motions to compel [ECF No. 35] and for extension of time [ECF No. 36] are DENIED. 35 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/7/16. (CLA)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing
32
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 28] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant Jeffery Ostemann. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Dean Minor, Alan Earls, and John Does 1-10 are DISMISSED without prejudice.An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. 28 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/5/16. (CLA)
|
January 4, 2016 |
Filing
31
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [[ECF No. 29 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/04/2016. (CLK)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
21
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 20 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to reinstate or add Jane Does 1-7 as defendants in this action.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/30/15. (KJS)
|
October 23, 2015 |
Filing
10
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the complaint and for discovery [ECF No. 9 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/23/15. (KJS)
|
October 2, 2015 |
Filing
6
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant unknown Thompson, Correctional Officer, III, Moberly Correctional Center. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining defendants are DISMISSED from the complaint. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/2/15. (KJS)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No.[ 2]] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $45.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an origina l proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/10/2015., Response to Court due by 9/25/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/26/15. (JAB) (Remark: Prisoner Civil rights complaint form and copy of this order mailed to plaintiff)
|