Blair et al v. City Of Hannibal, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: |
Jacob Blair and Sarah Blair |
Defendant: |
Hannibal, Missouri, City of and Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00061 |
Filed: |
August 25, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Marion |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Richard Webber |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 15, 2016 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [ECF No. 55 ] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count I of P laintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint [ECF No. 16 ] be DISMISSED, as to Defendant Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief [ECF No. 65 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Untimely Memorandum [ECF No. 64 ] is DENIED, as moot. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 12/15/2016. (CBL)
|
July 12, 2016 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of Hannibal's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [ECF No. 41] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts I, II, III, IV, V, and VIII of Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint [ECF No. 16] are DISMISSED, with prejudice, against Defendant City of Hannibal. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on July 12, 2016. (MCB)
|
June 8, 2016 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of Hannibal's Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery [ECF No. 43 ] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 6/8/16. (EAB)
|
April 13, 2016 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc.s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [ECF No. 19] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts II, III, IV, V, VI, VII, and VIII of Plaintiffs Amended Class Action Complaint [ECF No. 16] be DISMISSED, as to Defendant Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 4/13/2016. (KMS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?