Raybourn v. Corizon Medical Services et al
Plaintiff: |
Connie Raybourn |
Defendant: |
Corizon Medical Services, Hari Kapur, Justin Jones, T.K. Bredeman, Carl Doerhoff, William Rice, Marilyn Hubert and Susan Woodrow |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00010 |
Filed: |
February 25, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Audrain |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia L. Cohen |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 1, 2016 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Woodrow's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs first amended complaint (ECF No. 33) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part in accordance with the terms of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Woodrow's motion for stay of discovery (ECF No. 61) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on December 1, 2016. (MCB)
|
July 14, 2016 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued on all claims in plaintiff's first amended complaint in accordance with the Courts agreement with CMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on July 14, 2016. (MCB)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that GENEVIEVE NICHOLS of the law firm of COFFEY & NICHOLS, 6200 Columbia Avenue, St. Louis, Missouri, 63139, 314-647-0033, is appointed to represent plaintiff in this matter. The Clerk of Court shall provide a complete copy of the court file to plaintiff's appointed counsel at no cost. The Court file shall include the entirety of Docket entr y #1, as well as Docket Entry #8 and Docket Entry #11. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's counsel shall have until June 1, 2016, to file an amended complaint in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an appoin tment with an independent medical expert [Doc. # 9 ] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel an appointment with Dr. Doerhoff [Doc. # 10 ] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 4/6/16. (EAB) (Copy mailed to plaintiff on 4/6/16).(EAB).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?