Cole v. Griggs et al
Plaintiff: |
Lance Adrian Cole |
Defendant: |
Richard Griggs, Alan Earls, Dan Wiley, L. LaBon, Unknown Turner, Unknown McCartney and Unknown Yelton |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00041 |
Filed: |
June 16, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Pike |
Presiding Judge: |
David D. Noce |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 27, 2019 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons discussed above, the defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 29 ) is granted. An appropriate judgment order is issued herewith. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/27/2019. (CLO)
|
November 29, 2016 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [[ECF No. 28 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/29/2016. (CLO)
|
November 21, 2016 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration [ECF No. 23 ] isDENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/21/2016. (CLO)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration [Doc. No. 8 ] is granted in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to add William Jones, Acting Warden at the Northeast Correctional Center , as a defendant in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to issue process as to defendant William Jones. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/14/2016. (CLO)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $26.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant Dan Wiley. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/25/16. (JAB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?