Charron v. Whitlock et al
Plaintiff: |
Kenneth G. Charron |
Defendant: |
Michael Whitlock, Miguel Paniagua, Corizon Medican Review Board Members, John Does 1-3, Larry W. Allen, Denise Langley, Unknown Getti and Unknown Lovelace |
Case Number: |
2:2018cv00032 |
Filed: |
May 7, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Pike |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia L. Cohen |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 11, 2020 |
Filing
49
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Miguel Paniagua, 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Larry W. Allen motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/11/20. (MRS)
|
August 23, 2019 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kenneth G. Charron motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/23/19. (MRS)
|
August 9, 2018 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs second motion for appointment of counsel and objections to the Courts July 24, 2018 memorandum and order (Docket No. 15 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/9/18. (KJS)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2 ) is GRANTED as to defendants Miguel Paniagua and Larry Allen. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.04 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) this ca se number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon defendant Miguel Paniagua in his individual capacity. The defendant s hall be served in accordance with the waiver agreement this Court maintains with Corizon Health, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon defendant Larry Allen in his individual capacity. T he defendant shall be served in accordance with the waiver agreement this Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney Generals Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official capacity claims against Miguel Paniagua and Larry Allen are DISMISSE D without prejudice. A separate Order of Partial Dismissal will be entered herewith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as to defendants Michael Whitlock, Mr. Lovela ce, Corizon Medical Review Board Members, John Does 1-3, Denise Langley, and Mrs. Getti. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants Michael Whitlock, Mr. Lovelace, Corizon Medical Review Board Member s, John Does 1-3, Denise Langley, and Mrs. Getti are DISMISSED without prejudice, subject to plaintiff refiling his claims in a separate complaint and paying the $400 filing fee. A separate Order of Partial Dismissal will be entered herewith. Se e 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 7 ) is DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for exemption from initial disclosure (Docket No. 8 ) is DENIED as premature. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 8/14/2018.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 7/24/18. (KJS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?