Loonsfoot v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Angela Loonsfoot
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00059
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela Loonsfoot. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/27/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (KCB)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Angela Loonsfoot. (KCB)
August 8, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Angela Loonsfoot to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BRP)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
July 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (BRP)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative). Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on July 20, 2018. (BRP)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on July 20, 2018. (BRP)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 17, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Angela Loonsfoot. (BAK)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angela Loonsfoot. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Dempsey, Vicki)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Angela Loonsfoot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Summons , #4 Summons , #5 Summons , #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loonsfoot v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Loonsfoot
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?