Carlisle v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Darlene L. Carlisle
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00072
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Berryhill filed by Darlene L. Carlisle. (KJS)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USAG filed by Darlene L. Carlisle. (KJS)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Darlene L. Carlisle. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/27/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (KCB)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
August 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (cc: USMS) (AFC)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/8/2018. (AFC)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/8/2018. (AFC)
August 8, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Darlene L. Carlisle. (JWD)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Darlene L. Carlisle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bill, Karen)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Darlene L. Carlisle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bill, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlisle v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene L. Carlisle
Represented By: Karen Kraus Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?