Hubert v. Corizon Health Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marilyn Hubert
Defendant: Jenny Meehan and Corizon Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00076
Filed: August 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Marilyn Hubert. Jenny Meehan served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Moffitt, John)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Corizon Health Services, Inc., Jenny Meehan. (Drafahl, Julia) filed by Jenny Meehan, Corizon Health Services, Inc. ; GRANTED. LEAVE TO FILE UP TO AND INCLUDING OCTOBER 22, 2018( Response to Court due by 10/22/2018.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/20/2018. (AAS)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion of Katie M. Rhoten for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Marilyn Hubert in the above matter is GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/19/2018. (AAS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Corizon Health Services, Inc., Jenny Meehan. (Drafahl, Julia)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Julia B. Drafahl for Defendants Corizon Health Services, Inc., Jenny Meehan. (Drafahl, Julia)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James M. Paul for Defendants Corizon Health Services, Inc., Jenny Meehan. (Paul, James)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Katie M. Rhoten by Plaintiff Marilyn Hubert. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel)(Rhoten, Katherine) filed by Marilyn Hubert ; SO ORDERED, Attorney Katherine M. Rhoten terminated.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/19/2018. (AAS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Katie M. Rhoten by Plaintiff Marilyn Hubert. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel)(Rhoten, Katherine)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Marilyn Hubert. Marilyn Hubert served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Rhoten, Katherine)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by John Healy Moffitt, III for Plaintiff Marilyn Hubert. (Moffitt, John)
August 21, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Katherine M. Rhoten. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Marilyn Hubert Process Server: Christin Hagler (BAK)
August 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Corizon Health Services, Inc. with receipt number 0865-6704023, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Marilyn Hubert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet )(Rhoten, Katherine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2018: #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Summons Corizon, #6 Summons Meehan) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubert v. Corizon Health Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Hubert
Represented By: Katherine M. Rhoten
Represented By: John Healy Moffitt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Meehan
Represented By: Julia B. Drafahl
Represented By: James M. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Julia B. Drafahl
Represented By: James M. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?