Steele v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Monica R. Steele
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00102
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Monica R. Steele. (EAB)
December 12, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Monica R. Steele to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/19/2018. (CBL)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
November 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS along with a copy of complaint. (MCB)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See CMO for complete details.) This case is assigned to Track: 4. This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiffs complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on November 26, 2018. (MCB)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on November 26, 2018. (MCB)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 21, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Monica R. Steele. (MFG)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Monica R Steele. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Dempsey, Vicki)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Monica R Steele. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica R. Steele
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?