Gallup v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Wilson C. Gallup
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00003
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Wilson C. Gallup. (AFC)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney General filed by Wilson C. Gallup. (AFC)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Wilson C. Gallup. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (AFC)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 10, 2019. (BRP)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 10, 2019. (BRP)
January 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Wilson C. Gallup. (MFG)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 2:19-cv-3 by Plaintiff Wilson C. Gallup. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Koch, Frank)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT 2:19-cv-3 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Wilson C. Gallup. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Koch, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallup v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson C. Gallup
Represented By: Frank T. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?