Gibbs v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Tommy A. Gibbs
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00009
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy Berryhill filed by Tommy A. Gibbs. (NEP)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tommy A. Gibbs. Matthew Whitaker served. (KEK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tommy A. Gibbs. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Jeffrey B. Jensen served. (KEK)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Tommy A. Gibbs. (KEK)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
February 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KEK)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/14/19. (KEK)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/14/19. (KEK)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Tommy A. Gibbs. (BAK)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 2:19-cv-9 by Plaintiff Tommy A. Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Still, Russell)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT 2:19-cv-9 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Tommy A. Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Still, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy A. Gibbs
Represented By: Russell C. Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?