Drebes v. Saul
Plaintiff: Eric W Drebes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00059
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Eric W Drebes, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (MRS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/2/2019 through U.S Attorney's Office, answer due 10/1/2019. (CSG)
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to USM - St. Louis. (MRS)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/21/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 7/31/19. (MRS)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 7/31/19. (MRS)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (BAK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Eric W Drebes. (BAK)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eric W Drebes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Dempsey, Vicki)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Eric W Drebes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drebes v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric W Drebes
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?