Fischer v. Saul
Plaintiff: Patty D Fischer and Patty D. Fischer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00069
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Patty D. Fischer. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Dempsey, Vicki) Modified on 8/28/2019 (BRP).
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Patty D. Fischer, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (TMT)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Four [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 08/16/2019. (KCB)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 15, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Vicki Dempsey. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-7398431, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Patty D Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty D Fischer
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty D. Fischer
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?