Hawn v. Saul
Plaintiff: John T Hawn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00073
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John T. Hawn by serving U.S. Attorney General on September 5, 2019. (MCB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John T. Hawn by serving the Office of Regional Counsel on September 3, 2019. (MCB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John T. Hawn. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served by serving the U.S. Attorney on 8/29/2019; answer due 10/28/2019. (EAB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff John T. Hawn, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (EAB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
August 29, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were forwarded to the US Marshals Service for service. (KXS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/28/19. (KXS)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/28/19. (KXS)
August 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff John T. Hawn. (MFG)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John T Hawn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Dempsey, Vicki)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by John T Hawn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawn v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T Hawn
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?