American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. v. Wooldridge et al
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Defendant: Larue Baker, Larry Robuck, Macon Electric Cooperative, G. Phil Sanders, Kemper Walker, Glenda Wood, Andrew Sporleder, Harold Beach, Doug Drake and Kenneth L. Wooldridge
Case Number: 2:2019cv00083
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by Defendants Larue Baker, Harold Beach, Doug Drake, Larry Robuck, Kemper Walker, Glenda Wood. (Lem, Philip) filed by Kemper Walker, Glenda Wood, Larue Baker, Harold Beach, Doug Drake, Larry Robuck ; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JANUARY 6, 2020. Larue Baker answer due 1/6/2020; Harold Beach answer due 1/6/2020; Doug Drake answer due 1/6/2020; Larry Robuck answer due 1/6/2020; Kemper Walker answer due 1/6/2020; Glenda Wood answer due 1/6/2020.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/19/2019. (AAS)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 CJRA ORDER. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (EAB)
December 18, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/23/2019. (EAB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. as to Defendant Doug Drake served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (EAB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. as to Defendant Larry Robuck served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; Glenda Wood served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (EAB)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. as to Kenneth L. Wooldridge. (Goleaner, Kenneth)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. as to Defendant Andrew Sporleder, Harold Beach, Kemper Walker, Larue Baker, Macon Electric Cooperative, G. Philip Suanders served on 11/26/19. (Goleaner, Kenneth) Modified on 12/18/2019 (EAB).
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerri S. Reisdorff for Defendants Larue Baker, Harold Beach, Doug Drake, Macon Electric Cooperative, Larry Robuck, G. Phil Sanders, Andrew Sporleder, Kemper Walker, Glenda Wood. (Reisdorff, Kerri)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by Defendants Larue Baker, Harold Beach, Doug Drake, Larry Robuck, Kemper Walker, Glenda Wood. (Lem, Philip)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by Defendants Macon Electric Cooperative, G. Phil Sanders, Andrew Sporleder is ORDERED GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including January 6, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on December 17, 2019. (HEH)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by Defendants Macon Electric Cooperative, G. Phil Sanders, Andrew Sporleder. (Lem, Philip)
December 6, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/13/2019. (AAS)
November 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Philip C. Graham. (AAS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth R. Goleaner for Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Goleaner, Kenneth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Parent companies: American Family Mutual Holding Company is the parent of AmFam, Holdings, Inc., which is the parent of Plaintiff, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Graham, Philip)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. Process Server: Eastern Missouri Legal Services (Attachments: #1 Summons Douglas Drake, #2 Summons Larry Robuck, #3 Summons Glenda Wood, #4 Summons Andrew Sporleder, #5 Summons Kemper Walker, #6 Summons G Phil Saunders, #7 Summons Macon Electric Cooperative, #8 Summons Kenneth Wooldridge, #9 Summons Harold Beach, #10 Summons Larue Baker)(Graham, Philip)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
November 6, 2019 ***REMARK Attorney for plaintiff Phillip Graham contacted via email on 11/4/19 at 4:15 pm and by voicemail on 4/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. and directed to file, pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, Fed.R.Civ.P.4 service documents. Counsel for plaintiff has not filed service documents as of 9:00 am on 11/6/19. Case to proceed to judge assignment. Summons or waiver to issue upon filing. (MFG)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7560510, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Graham, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. v. Wooldridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larue Baker
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Robuck
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon Electric Cooperative
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Phil Sanders
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Walker
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Wood
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Sporleder
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Beach
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Drake
Represented By: Kerri S. Reisdorff
Represented By: Philip Keng Lem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Wooldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Philip C. Graham
Represented By: Kenneth R. Goleaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?