Stroud v. Farr Rentals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Althea J. Stroud
Defendant: Farr Rentals, LLC, Katie Farr, City of Canton, MO, Matthew Farr and Jarrod Phillips
Case Number: 2:2019cv00095
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Referring Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit with the Clerk's Office in paper format by Plaintiff Althea J. Stroud re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Letter and Envelope)(TMT)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (NEP)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 27, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Dec 27 10:02:15 CST 2019 (admin,)
December 27, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
December 27, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (JWD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION Request to File Electronically by Plaintiff Althea J. Stroud. (JWD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Althea J. Stroud. (JWD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Althea J. Stroud. (JWD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants City of Canton, MO, Katie Farr, Matthew Farr, Farr Rentals, LLC, Jarrod Phillips, Jury Demand, filed by Althea J. Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List and Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroud v. Farr Rentals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farr Rentals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Canton, MO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Althea J. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?