Goodson v. Orf et al
Plaintiff: Charles L. Goodson
Defendant: Stanley Jansen, James H., Alan Earls, Damian Austin and Olivia Orf
Case Number: 2:2020cv00010
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 ***REMARK Mailed a copy of the Standing Order issued on April 10, 2020 to the plaintiff this day. (AAT)
April 10, 2020 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah. (CSAW)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Charles L. Goodson. (EAB)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to Clerk of Court from Charles Goodson re:magistrate consent form. (Attachments: #1 Response letter from the Court to Mr. Goodson) (MCB)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Clerk of Court from Charles Goodson re:informing the Court that he has requested account balance but has not received it from the institution business office. (MCB)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Feb 27 11:03:00 CST 2020 (admin,)
February 27, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (DJO)
February 27, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Charles L. Goodson. (DJO)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Charles L. Goodson. (DJO)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant Damian Austin, Alan Earls, James H., Stanley Jansen, Olivia Orf Jury Demand,, filed by Charles L. Goodson. (Attachments: #1 MODC Offender Grievance Appeal Complaint, #2 Previous Lawsuit, #3 Relief, #4 Exhibit, #5 Original Filing Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Judge Assignment Label, #8 Envelope)(DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodson v. Orf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Orf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L. Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?