Turnbaugh v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tabetha A Turnbaugh
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00046
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tabetha A Turnbaugh. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (CMH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Plaintiff Tabetha A Turnbaugh. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (CMH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 20, 2020 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were mailed to U.S. Marshal Service, St. Louis, Missouri. (CSG)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/10/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 8/20/20. (CSG)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 8/20/20. (CSG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (BAK)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Tabetha A Turnbaugh. (Dempsey, Vicki)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tabetha A Turnbaugh. (Dempsey, Vicki)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Tabetha A Turnbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turnbaugh v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabetha A Turnbaugh
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?