State of Missouri v. Helmka
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Defendant: Clifford P. Helmka
Case Number: 2:2020cv00047
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1455
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Thu Aug 20 14:38:33 CDT 2020 (Marshall, Sean)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Randolph County, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/20/2020. (SMM) Memorandum and Order of Remand and Copy of Docket Sheet mailed to Randolph County Circuit Court on 8/20/2020.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Wed Aug 19 11:08:21 CDT 2020 (Bernsen, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB) (JAB).
August 18, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Aug 18 12:00:50 CDT 2020 (admin,)
August 18, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
August 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JWD)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Randolph County Circuit Court, case number 19RA-CR00640, Jury Demand, filed by Clifford P. Helmka. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Declaration for Equitable Rescission of Contract and Withdrawal of "Not Guilty" Plea, #2 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Missouri v. Helmka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford P. Helmka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?