Rasmussen v. Weber
Petitioner: Philip Rasmussen
Respondent: Scott Weber
Case Number: 2:2020cv00058
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 ***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in Western District of Missouri as case 6:20-cv-03329. (KXS)
October 19, 2020 ***REMARK Case was electronically transferred to the Western District of Missouri this date. (MCB)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT (See Doc. #3) to: United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri Case to be transferred after 10/16/2020. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on October 2, 2020. (MCB)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Fri Oct 2 16:35:10 CDT 2020 (Brown, Erica)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. See 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/2/20. (EAB)
September 30, 2020 Receipt 4644089674 in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS on behalf of Rasmussen, Philip (CCAM)
September 30, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Sep 30 11:01:30 CDT 2020 (admin,)
September 30, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
September 30, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JWD)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION titled "Petition to be Returned to Arkansas to Prove "Actual Innocense"" by Petitioner Philip Rasmussen. (JWD)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 paid.) by Petitioner Philip Rasmussen. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form [Clerk's note: page 2 written on back of Original Filing Form], #2 Exhibit - State Court and 8th Circuit Documents, #3 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen v. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Weber
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?