Eoff v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nancy Eoff
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00072
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Nancy Eoff. Defendant Andrew Saul served on 12/28/2020 by serving the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (EAB)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Nancy Eoff, Defendant Andrew Saul. (AAT)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Nancy Eoff. Defendant Andrew Saul served on 12/17/2020 by serving the U.S. Attorney. Answer due 2/16/2021. (EAB)
November 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (AAT)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will bemodified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances:This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative).This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The partieshave twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding MagistrateJudge Jurisdiction forms. - See Order For Full Details -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 11/24/2020. (AAT)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 11/24/2020. (AAT)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert F. Thompson III. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8296283) by Plaintiff Nancy Eoff. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, Robert) filed by Nancy Eoff ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 11/24/2020. (AAT)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
November 23, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert F. Thompson III. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8296283) by Plaintiff Nancy Eoff. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Thompson, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nancy Eoff. (Thompson, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Nancy Eoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Filing Form, #3 Form Verification of Signed Original Document, #4 Summons Summons Barr, #5 Summons Summons Jensen, #6 Summons Summons Saul, #7 Form Proof of Service, #8 Certificate of Good Standing Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing, #9 Affidavit Application and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eoff v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Eoff
Represented By: Robert F. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?