Conrad v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tabatha L Conrad
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00009
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed US Attorney General served on 3/5/2021 filed by Tabatha L Conrad. (LNJ)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tabatha L Conrad. Regional SSA Office served on 2/22/2021. (LNJ)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tabatha L Conrad. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served upon U.S. Attorney on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (LNJ)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (JAB)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/16/21. (JAB)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/16/21. (JAB)
February 12, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
February 12, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Tabatha L Conrad. (Dempsey, Vicki)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tabatha L Conrad. (Dempsey, Vicki)
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Tabatha L Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabatha L Conrad
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?