Kovach v. MFA, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Stephanie Kovach
Defendant: MFA, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00013
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach. (Nelson, Allison)
March 24, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Younger, Robert)
March 19, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Partial Motion to Dismiss) filed by Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Younger, Robert)
March 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach. (Nelson, Allison)
March 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Dismiss Counts III and IV of First Amended Petition by Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach. (Nelson, Allison)
March 15, 2021 Filing 20 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings (KXS)
March 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE Appearance: by Defendant MFA, Incorporated (Powers, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Partial Motion to Dismiss) filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach. (Nelson, Allison)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE Amended Deposition: by Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Nelson, Allison)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Compel Discovery - Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Kovach. (Nelson, Allison)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Discovery - Supplemental Brief by Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Younger, Robert)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant MFA, Incorporated (Acknowledgment of Receipt) Sent To: State Court - Executed (Younger, Robert)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Benjamin B. Nelson. Review of case shows that Attorney Benjamin B. Nelson is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (BAK)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Allison M. Nelson. Review of case shows that Attorney Allison M. Nelson is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (BAK)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, Montgomery County, Missouri, filed by Stephanie Kovach.(BAK)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER (BAK)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, Montgomery County, Missouri, filed by Stephanie Kovach.(BAK)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - Due to electronic case opening, the above numbered case was inadvertently opened in error. Therefore, this case will be administratively closed. The new case number in the Northern Division is 2:21cv13 NAB (BAK)
March 1, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
March 1, 2021 Judge Baker enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/nannette-baker (MCB)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by MFA, Incorporated.(Younger, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Partial Motion to Dismiss) filed by Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Younger, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Partial Motion to Dismiss) by Defendant MFA, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Younger, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant MFA, Incorporated. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: No,. (Younger, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant MFA, Incorporated Sent To: Plaintiff (Younger, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number 20AU-CC00039-01, with receipt number AMOEDC-8500066, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by MFA, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet , #4 Original Filing Form )(Younger, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kovach v. MFA, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFA, Incorporated
Represented By: Robert D. Younger
Represented By: Michael S. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Kovach
Represented By: Allison M. Nelson
Represented By: Benjamin B. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?