Bellegante v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lois A Bellegante
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00040
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General served on 6/14/21 (MRS)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/14/2021 through Office of Regional Counsel. (MRS)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Lois A Bellegante, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (MRS)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/3/2021 thru US Atty, answer due 8/2/2021. (MRS)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/14/2021. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/26/21. (MRS)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 5/26/21. (MRS)
May 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to USM- St. Louis. (MRS)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Lois A Bellegante. (Dempsey, Vicki)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lois A Bellegante. (Dempsey, Vicki)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Lois A Bellegante. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)
May 24, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellegante v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois A Bellegante
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?