Liddell, et al v. Board of Education, et al
Plaintiff: Caldwell/NAACP and Deric James Liddell
Defendant: Special School District, Missouri, State of, St. Louis County, City Board, Lindbergh School Districct and Special Administrative Board of the Transitional School District of the City of St. Louis
Miscellaneous: Financial Advisor
Movant: Minnie Liddell
Case Number: 4:1972cv00100
Filed: February 18, 1972
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 549 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the State of Missouris Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, [Doc. No. 521 ], is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no bond shall be required.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the States request for a temporary administrative stay is denied as moot.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/26/2021. (AAT)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Enforce Settlement, [Doc. No. 468 ], is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order, all local desegregati on tax funds, whether paid to the District or allocated to the Charter schools through a deduction from the funds given to the District, and provided to the Charter schools, shall be used solely for desegregation programs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no desegregation programs exist in the Charter schools, the funds shall be turned over to the District to continue to implement and fashion the programs contemplated by the Settlement Agreement.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/24/2020. (AAT)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 OPINION, MEMORANDUM and ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Motion to Enforce, [Doc. No. 470 ], is denied. The State is given 14 days from the date of this Order to file its response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Strike, [Doc. No. 471 ], is denied. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/24/20. (EAB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 467 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Supplemental Suggestions in Support of the Motion to Intervene on behalf of Charter Public School Parents and Children, [Doc. No. 449 ], is denied as moot, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/15/19. (KJS)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 466 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant State of Missouris Motion to Strike the Motion to Enforce Court Order Approving Settlement, to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and to Hold the State in Contempt, [Doc. No. 389 ], is GRANT ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Motion to Enforce Court Order Approving Settlement, to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and to Hold the State in Contempt, [Doc. No. 381 ], is stricken, without prejudice to Plaintiffs refiling the motion on behalf of themselves only.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/26/19. (KJS)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 464 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Remove Intervenor Ken Ross, Junior and Substitute Intervenor Michelle Neals, [Doc. No.458] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Reconsider and/or Amend Order, [Doc. No. 460] is DENIED. 458 451 . Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/10/18. (CLA)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movants' Motion to Intervene, [Doc. No 398 ], is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/20/2016. (GGB)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Joint Motion to Modify Consent Judgment [ECF No. 373 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all aspects of the Agreement [ECF No. [373-4]] are adopted herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court retains jurisdiction over the matter to enforce the provisions of the Agreement and for such matters which may come before the Court. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 9/21/15. (EAB)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Modify Consent Decree [ECF No. 370 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all aspects of the Agreement [ECF No. 371-1] are adopted herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court retains jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the provisions of the Agreement and for such other matters which may come before the Court. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 09/04/2013. (CBL)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 359 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Defendant Special Administrative Board of the Transitional School District of the City of St. Louis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Special Administrative Board of the Transitional Sch ool District of the City of St. Louis's Motion to Substitute Parties pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c) 359 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Special Administrative Board of the Transitional School District of the City of St. Louis is substituted as a party defendant in place of the Board of Education of the City of St. Louis, Missouri. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on November 15, 2011. (MCB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liddell, et al v. Board of Education, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special School District
Represented By: Donna A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri, State of
Represented By: John J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County
Represented By: Robert P. Baine, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Board
Represented By: Kenneth C. Brostron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindbergh School Districct
Represented By: Mark J. Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Administrative Board of the Transitional School District of the City of St. Louis
Represented By: Evan Z. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caldwell/NAACP
Represented By: Veronica Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deric James Liddell
Represented By: William A. Douthit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Financial Advisor
Represented By: Warren M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Minnie Liddell
Represented By: William A. Douthit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?