Clark v. Roper
Case Number: 4:2004cv01364
Filed: October 6, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Presiding Judge: Frederick R Buckles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Petition of Michael A. Clark, for Writ of Habeas Corpus, [Doc. No. 1], pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability will not issue in that, as Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a federal constitutional right. A separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/8/08. (MJM)
July 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Michael A. Clark's petition for writ of habeas corpus is timely filed under 28 USC 2244(d)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order resp ondent shall show cause why procedurally or substantively, the claims raised in Petitioner Michael Clark's petition for writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2005.. Signed by Judge Henry E. Autrey on 7/25/05. (MJM, )
July 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this Court's Order dated July 20, 2005 is vacated and held for naught.. Signed by Judge Henry E. Autrey on 7/22/05. (MJM, )
July 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause is dismissed without prejudice for Petitioner's failure to comply with Rule 2.06(B) of the Local Rules of this Court; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in this cause of action are denied as moot without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Henry E. Autrey on 7/20/05. (MJM, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?