Goodwin v. Roper
Case Number: 4:2006cv00848
Filed: June 1, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Goodwins supplemental petition for writ of habeas corpus [ECF No. 101] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. 101 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/9/14. (CLA)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Goodwins supplemental petition for writ of habeas corpus [ECF No. 91 ] and motion to stay execution [ECF No. 92 ] are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/5/14. (KJS)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability will not issue in this matter. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 3/12/14. (CLA)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 49 : ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment or in the Alternative Supplemental Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, [Doc. No. 49], is denied.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 2/10/14. (CEL)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 32 ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), [Doc. No. 32], is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Opinion, Memorandum and Order dated September 30, 2009 is amended, nunc pro tunc as provided herein.. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/16/10. (CEL)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 11 , 19 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition of Paul T. Goodwin for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 [Doc. No. 11] and the request for an evidentiary hearing [Doc. No. 19] are denied. The state 9;s motion to dismiss the petition as untimely filed [Doc. No. 20, part III] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right and the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 9/30/09. (CSR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?