Allen v. United States of America
Petitioner: Billie Jerome Allen
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2007cv00027
Filed: January 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Billie Jerome Allen's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall not issue a certificate of appealability as to any claim. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 08/22/2014. (CBL)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 377 PRO SE MOTION for recusal filed by Petitioner Billie Jerome Allen. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's pro se motion for recusal 377 is STRICKEN from the record. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on July 8, 2014. (MCB)(Copy sent to Billie Jerome Allen, 26901-044, USP - Terre Haute, P.O. Box 33, Terre Haute, IN 47808 this date.)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Billie Jerome Allen's Amended Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody Under a Sentence of D eath [ECF No. 60 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall not issue a certificate of appealability as to any claim raised in Petitioner Billie Jerome Allen's Amended Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody Under a Sentence of Death [ECF No. 60 ]. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 06/25/204. (CBL)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant Billie J. Allen has twenty days from the filing of this Order to describe his proposed additional grounds for relief and demonstrate such grounds have not been procedurally defaulted. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 12/11/2013. (CBL)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE TO PARTIES - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall return the attached letter directly to Petitioner with a copy of this Notice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on May 2, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 letter with envelope) (Copy of Notice to Parties and the attached letter sent this date to Billie Allen, P.O. Box 33, Terre Haute, IN 47808 this date.)(MCB)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant's Motion 237 is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. Movant's request that the recordings of Dr. Askenazi's neuropsychological evaluation of Movant be re leased for viewing is DENIED. Movant's request that the recordings be transcribed for later review by the Court and counsel is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the recordings of Dr. Askenazi's evaluation of Movant be transcribed for lat er review. If the transcription is not expected to be available prior to trial in the normal due course, the Government can expedite the transcription request. Movant's request that the record be kept open for evidence from the recordings and an y additional testimony or evidence that may be needed after review will be taken under advisement. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 06/01/2012. (Pursuant to direction of chambers - sealed doc. #196 (containing one cd) released to AUSA Steve Holtshauser on this date for transcription. Upon full transcription, the original cd and transcript shall be sealed again by this Court until further order. )(CBL)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM. This matter came before the Court today at the request of the parties. The Court held a telephone status conference, during which counsel for all parties was heard on matters of scheduling and discovery. The Court then indicated the evid entiary hearing ordered in this matter will go forward as scheduled on June 4, 2012. The Court also directed that the Court would promptly consider any motions addressing the transcription of attorney John Simon's notes, and the compensation to be paid to him under the Criminal Justice Act. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 04/25/2012. (CBL)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant Billie Allen's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Authorizing the Deposition of Movant or, in the Alternative, for Order Certifying Interlocutory Appeal [ECF No. 194 ] is DENIED. The Court will, however, enter a forthcoming separate Protective Order with respect to Movant's Depostion. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on November 15, 2011. (BRP)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Motion for Authorization to Conduct Depositions and Independent Examinations and to Require Identification of Hearing Witnesses and Sharing of Deposition Expenses [ECF No. 162 ] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 10/7/11. (KJS)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that with the exception of his Claim J alleging ineffective assistance of counsel based on counsel's alleged failure to investigate and present mitigating evidence at sentencing Movant Billie Jerome All en's Amended Motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody under a Sentence of Death [doc. #60] is DENIED. Allen's Amended Motion shall remain before this Court pending the outco me of an evidentiary hearing on that claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the evidentiary hearing on the aforementioned Claim J will be held before this Court on August 1, 2011 at 9:00 A.M. in Courtroom 17 South of the United States District Court in St. Louis, MO. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17S before Honorable E. Richard Webber. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 05/10/2011. (BRP)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant Billie Jerome Allen's Motion for Discovery and Evidentiary Hearing [doc. # 116 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 3/31/11. (KLH)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Pro Se Motion [doc. #131] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Movant's Pro Se Motion to Address Issues Not Set Forth by Counsel in His § 2255 Motion at an Evidentiary Hearing [doc. #120] is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on July 2, 2010. (MGK)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 91 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Petitioner Billie Jerome Allen, 87 MOTION for Leave to inspect documents filed by Petitioner Billie Jerome Allen. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners Motion to Inspect [doc. #87] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. The Parties are directed to comply with the Courts orders, as set forth above.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Partially Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse [doc. #91] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Petitioner shall be given an additional 60 days in which to file his Reply to Governments Response to Petitioners Amended Motion to Vacate, no later than August 14, 2009. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on June 8, 2009. (MGK)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall remove from this file defendant's motion for appointment of counsel 661 and file and docket the motion as a post-conviction proceeding commended under 28 U.S.C. 2255. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tht the Clerk of Court shall remove from this file the Government's response to the motion for appointment of counsel 663 and file and docket the response in the post-conviction case opened pursuant to this Order. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall retain a copy of defendant's motion for appointment of counsel 661 and the Government's response to the motion 663 in the instant criminal file. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone status co nference concerning defendant's motion to appoint counsel 661 will be held on 1/19/07 at 11:00 a.m.. This Court will initiate the telephone conference with counsel for all parties on the date and time stated above. Status Conference set for 1/19/2007 11:00 AM by Telephone before Honorable E. Richard Webber.. Signed by Judge E. Richard Webber on 1/8/07. (BAK, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Steven E. Holtshouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billie Jerome Allen
Represented By: Elizabeth U. Carlyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?