Thornton v. City of Kirkwood Featured Case

Plaintiff: Charles Lee Thornton
Defendant: City of Kirkwood
Case Number: 4:2007cv00079
Filed: January 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2008 Filing 40
JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that defendant shall have summary judgment on plaintiff's complaint, and plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff shall bear all taxable costs of this action. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 1/28/08. (BAK)
November 14, 2007 Filing 37
RESPONSE to Motion re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton. (RJD)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for joinder 19 , motion to amend/correct complaint 19 , motion for permanent injunction 20 , and motion for joinder 27 are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for sanctions under Rule 11 25 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion to compel 21 is granted, and plaintiff shall provide his initial disclosures in compliance with the case management order and Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by no later than 6/29/07. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, which could include dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on 6/21/07. (BAK, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 33
REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 MOTION for Joinder filed by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton. (BAK, )
May 8, 2007 Filing 30
ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT (Pilot) proceedings of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on January 18, 2007 before Judge Catherine D. Perry. Court Reporter: T. Hopwood. The transcript filed with the court will not be remotely available until such time as the period for redaction has expired or a request for redaction has been received and the redacted transcript filed. For additional information see the Notice/Instructions to the Bar regarding Electronic Availability of Civil Transcripts on the Court's website at www.moed.uscourts.gov (KCM, )
May 7, 2007 Filing 31
RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11 filed by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton. (BAK, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 28
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 27 MOTION for Joinder (filed 4/26/07) filed by Defendant City of Kirkwood. (Hessel, John)
April 23, 2007 Filing 26
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 25 MOTION for Sanctions under Rule 11 filed by Defendant City of Kirkwood. (Hessel, John)
April 20, 2007 Filing 23
RESPONSE (Objections) to Motion re 21 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton. (JMW)
April 9, 2007 Filing 20
AMENDED MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton. (MCB)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2(standard). Motion to Join Parties due by 4/30/2007. Discovery Completion due by 10/1/2007. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2007. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14S before Honorable Catherine D. Perry. Pretrial Compliance due by 2/5/2008. Motion in Limine due by 2/15/2008. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/30/2007. (JMW)
March 22, 2007 Filing 15
JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton, Defendant City of Kirkwood. (JMW)
March 15, 2007 Filing 14
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 13 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton. (JMW)
February 26, 2007 Filing 12
ENTRY of Appearance by Jami L. Boyles for Defendant City of Kirkwood. (Boyles, Jami)
February 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2(standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/23/2007. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/30/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14S before Honorable Catherine D. Perry. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/22/2007. (JMW)
February 21, 2007 Filing 10
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by City of Kirkwood.(Hessel, John)
January 30, 2007 Filing 8
NOTICE OF PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton Process Server Harry Ming. (JMW)
January 23, 2007 Filing 6
Request for Bench trial by Plaintiff Charles Lee Thornton. (BAK, )
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Charles Lee Thornton, motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on January 18, 2007. (MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. City of Kirkwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lee Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kirkwood
Represented By: John M. Hessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?