Fischer v. Steward, et al.
Plaintiff: |
Richard B. Fischer |
Defendant: |
St. Charles County Prosecuting Attorney, Rachel A. Smith, James Gooch, Missouri Highway Patrol, St. Charles, Missouri, City of, Robert Boerding, J. Sam Steward, John Does 1-20, St. Charles City Police Department and Timothy Swope |
Case Number: |
4:2007cv01798 |
Filed: |
October 22, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 11, 2010 |
Filing
140
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment of Defendants James Gooch, Timothy Swope, Robert Boerding, and the City of St. Charles, Missouri [doc. # 102 ] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant J. Sam Steward's Motion for Summary Judgment [doc. # 105 ] and Defendant Rachel A. Smith's Motion for Summary Judgment [doc. # 107 ] are GRANTED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 1/11/2010. (KLH)
|
June 29, 2009 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint [doc. #80] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint in accordance with the limitation specified in this order by Monday, J uly 6, 2009. The Court acknowledges that the Parties may need additional time for discovery and preparing dispositive motions as aresult of this amendment. As a result, the Parties are hereby ordered to submit a proposed joint scheduling plan by Frid ay, July 10, 2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Responding toMotions to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment [doc. #82] is DENIED, as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that St. Charles Defendants' Motion to Dismis s and forSummary Judgment [doc. #69] is DENIED, as moot, with leave to refile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Steward's Motion for Summary Judgment [doc. #72] is DENIED, as moot, with leave to refile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Smith's Motion for Summary Judgment [doc. #75] is DENIED, as moot, with leave to refile. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/10/2009.)Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on June 29, 2009. (MCB)
|
May 21, 2009 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition Answers [doc. # 61 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff may depose Defendant Steward and Defendant Smith for forty-five (45) minutes each, over the limited topics that were discussed at the hearing on this matter. FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery shall be completed no later than June 5, 2009. Any dispositive motions shall be filed no later than June 15, 2009; a Response shall be filed within twenty (20) days; and any Reply shall be filed within five (5) days thereafter. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 5/21/09. (KLH)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Request for Mental Examination of Plaintiff 47 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall submit a proposed protective order within seven days. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 12/2/08. (BAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?