Burroughs et al v. Mackie Moving Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: John Lee Burroughs and Rose Burroughs
Defendant: Mackie Moving Systems Corporation
Case Number: 4:2007cv01944
Filed: November 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann L. Medler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that AMCO's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is DENIED. [Docs. 167, 168] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that AMCO's Alternative Motion for New Trial is DENIED. [Docs. 167, 168] IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Alter Judgment is DENIED. [Doc. 176, 177] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that AMCO's Motion to Alter Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 169] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion for Bill of Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as more fully set out herein. [Doc. 165]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 2/17/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(LGK)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM OPINION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that AMCO's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is DENIED. [Docs. 167 , 168 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that AMCO's Alternative Motion for New Trial is DENIED. [Docs. 167 , 168 ] IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Alter Judgment isDENIED. [Doc. 176 , 177 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that AMCOs Motion to Alter Judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. 169 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion for Bill of Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as more fully set out herein. [Doc. 165 ] Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 2/15/11. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(ARL)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Based on the analysis set out above: 1. The court finds AMCOs coverage on the Burroughs three vehicles can be stacked to the statutory minimum ($25,000 x 3 = $75,000) and stacked with Zurichs $25,000 coverage for a total of $100,000 Uninsured Motorist coverage. 2. The court finds AMCO and Zurich are entitled to a set off of the $295,000 payment which John Burroughs received from Mackie. Since the jury awarded John Burroughs $460,000, the resulti ng liability, considering the policy limits, is $100,000. 3. The court finds that Rose Burroughs may recover from AMCO $40,000 on her Loss of Consortium claim in addition to the $75,000 limit for John Burroughs. 4. The court finds that Zurichs claims for proration of any liability between AMCO and Zurich are best left to the defendants to calculate and work out between themselves. 5. A separate judgment will be entered consistent with these findings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 11/17/10. (LAH)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION: ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike Report and Opinion Testimony of William Hampton is DENIED. Doc. 77 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 3/24/10. (ARL)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 73 MOTION to Strike 63 Amended Complaint or Alternatively, Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Mackie Moving Systems Corporation motion is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 2/12/10. (LGK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burroughs et al v. Mackie Moving Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee Burroughs
Represented By: John J. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Burroughs
Represented By: John J. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackie Moving Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?