Secure Energy, Incorporated et al v. Coal Synthetics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Secure Energy, Incorporated and Secure Energy Decatur, LLC
Defendant: Coal Synthetics, LLC, Icon Construction, Inc., Datel Engineering, LLC, Narendra Ramdas Patel, Jesse Gump, Matthew Patel, Stuart Rose and Brian Handy
Case Number: 4:2008cv01719
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Donald J. Stohr
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action withprejudice.( Dismissal Paper(s) due by 11/27/2010.) Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 9/27/10. (CLA)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 JUDGMENT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that on DefendantsDefendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts II, III, IV, V, VII, VIII, IX, XI and XII Based on Preemption (Doc. No. 182) is GRANTED, in part, and Counts II, III, IV, V, VII, VIII and IX are dismissed.Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/27/10. (CLA)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 206 and Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion to Compel 209 are DENIED. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/17/10. (TRC)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 145 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff Secure Energy, Incorporated to Provide Discovery (Doc. No. 145) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part. FURTHER ORDERED that Secure shall produce all communications with Sega within ten (10) days of the date of this order.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 1/13/10. (CEL)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 149 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel Kenny Securities Corporation to Comply with Subpoena (Doc. No. 149) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that KSC shall produce responsive documents within ten (10)days of the date of this order.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 1/7/10. (CEL)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 113 ORDERED that Plaintiffs'Motion to Compel (Doc. No. 113) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Icon and Datel shall supplement their answers to interrogatory numbers 14 and 15 and their responses to document request numbers 24 and 25 within ten (10) days. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 9/2/09. (CEL)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re 113 ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel no later than August 24, 2009. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their Motion to Compel no later than August 31, 2009.. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 8/17/09. (CEL)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM: The Court reviewed the documents submitted by Defendants in response to the telephone conference on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 113 . The Court believes that additional clarification is required. The Court will issue an ex parte order to Defendants directing the them to submit additional documents to clarify their response no later than Monday, August 17, 2009. (Response to Court due by 8/17/2009). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 8/11/09. (TRC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secure Energy, Incorporated et al v. Coal Synthetics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secure Energy, Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph F. Devereux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secure Energy Decatur, LLC
Represented By: Joseph F. Devereux, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coal Synthetics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datel Engineering, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narendra Ramdas Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Gump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?