In Re: Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: DACIA D. DAVIS, JACQUELINE LEMIEUX, XIANNA N.M. PEREZ, Theresa Russell, Rachel D. Weliever, ALEXIS SIMMONS, Tamara Dorsett, BLAIR M. LAMENDOLA, Sara Saravia, ANISA LUCAS, ReKeita Anderson, Sasha Bond, SHANNON ELLIS, BRENDA BRINTON, KATHRYN REEVES, FELICIA R. D. MINCHIN, Monifa Jalo, MARTIN FREY, Annetta Pitts, Elisabeth Mora, Tiffany Wilkins, Karey McGee, Lindsey R Moore-Ward-Cox, CHARLES IMMEL, Crystal Berger, Wendy A Sanchez, JEANNE K. WYSOCKI, Wasana McGowan, Donica Doroski, Juliann Harvey, Katie Gesch, Carol Wulf, Kailan Brooks, Mary Hernandez, KRISTA HODGES, Patricia Waller, Nura Jerman, Leann Dawes, BRIAN LENZ, Jennifer Carlucci, Louis Hoskins, Sr., Wondra Lee, Kathi Pieramico, ANNA B. TACKER, Amanda Black, Lauren Axente, Shannon Young, Ziera Davis, Evalena I. Johnson, SHANNON C. ALLEN, Elizabeth Ann Torrez, Henry Rice, Andrea Garrett, UMICA M. BARNES, Stephanie R Huckabee, MONIQUE ARDOIN, Tiffany Tasch, Tracy Eden, Tenesha M. Lay, Nijmegan Bowles, Shanon D. Ballinger, Jody Marie Peterson, Tina Amin, ALYSHA M. HALL, Gregory Kelly, Rachael Garel, Janine Scarcella, DAWNE M. BURTON, KIMBERLY D. KANIA, EMILY A. HERZAN, Debbie Ann Delpapa, Selina Best, Ann Burns, Camilla Lyon, MARQUITA RILEY, KATHERINE PARTHMER, Lara Flynn, NIAMBI FULLER, Tammy Reed, Allyson Wallace, ANGRA G. CHAVEZ, LINDA G. VERNON, Kristi Szelewski, MELISSA S. EVANS, Talaya Clarke, Betsy Gallagher, Angela Postley, Cynthia L. McGowen, Linda M. Adams-Williams, Karen Cusano, Chondale Rutledge, Karhim Benbenu, ATHENA L. THOMAS, Natasha D. Watts, Hailey Sorenson, Trinitta Broadway, CORTNEY D.B. EVERETTE, Kendra Mojica-Green, Mary Snorton, Danielle M Ellickson, Dekeisha Jones, Sara Bruce, Tiara A. Broaddus, SHELLI L. MEYER, LAURA VICKROY, Heather Hascall, Kathy Welsh, MICHELLE M. POWELL, VIRGINIA M MURPHY, HEATHER L. WILHELMI, Erin Peterson, Stephanie Stachow, Melissa Jarvis, Tonia McCown, XUANLAN M. DO, Pamela Tailey, Whitney Hudson, Alexandria McCormack, Paula Dominguez, LaToya Spry, Debbie Davis, Katherine A. Chandler, Ronda Stroud, Gina Spada, Chemika Perry, QUINCY CHILDS, Diane Peterman, GARY MCCRACKEN, Jennifer Gillard, Amber Rhofiry, CELINA MINJAREZ, D'Andra Luvena Johnson, Catalina Castro, Linda Lewis, CARMELLA CHARLEY, Karen Rose, Aimee Axelrod, Rian Kinney, Lauren N Lowe, MICHELLE D. LIPSCOMB, JACKIE D. BROWN, Lauren Gardin, Mylenne Planell, Karlin Donohue, Michele Carr, Elizabeth Jones, Kenya Santos, Jamiese Glass, ROBERT H. BONANNO, Shephanie Combest, ROBIN T. HAWKINS, Rowena Schoenrock, Sarah Jones, Peyton Michael Greenfield, Lindsey Butcher, Shanatha Crandall, JAMES C. BRYAN, Lauren Weinstein, TRICIA CHERRY, SANTINA P. ZAZA, Krista Carls, Michelle Klockenga, Sara Embrey, Jamie Lamb, Ayana Dockery, Corrie King, JESSICA SCOTT, Kevin Brown, Brittney Holloway, STACIE PENA, Anjuli Michelle Morgan, Betty-Anne Stenhouse, SARAH WEBSTER, Ashley Edwards, The Estate of Rachel Mae Spears, Kaile Wilson, Raven Hall, Vonda Brown-Moss, Brandy Blymier, REYNOLDO TORRES, Madeline Flores, SHEILA FONTANEZ, Erica Garcia, Debbie Erwin, TONI ROSE, Amy Bright, KATIE R. WIESNER, Valerie Johnson, Nova Lee Disotell, Ly'Trecia Tre'Cole Springfield, Jodi Bergelt, Cassandra Field, Tamara Norwood, Lauren Frisone, Desirae Buyak, Lacy Nerud, Nicole Spieth, RAYSCHELLE L. VENTRESCO, Andrea Esquibel, Jamilah Miller, TABATHA M. MONTGOMERY, TIMOTHY HUNTER, Amekia Newman, THERESA J. MCDONOUGH, Nadege Boucard, KATAYRA L. HUFF, JAMES A. VENTRESCO, WILLIE HAMMACK, Tameka Jones, Brandy Y. Beauregard, TURQUOISE SIMS, Jaimee Nichole Dorris, MARIA KEITH, BRANDOLYN S. WILLIAMS, Michelle Sanchez, Arrin Cvar, Anthony Coleman, LAURA LENZ, Toni Tassell, Christa Barnes, Kim Daisey, Emma Bloxsom, Caryn Sweats, CYNTHIA TROUTWINE, CHERYL L. ROBERTS, Kelly Whitecotton, Nytira Duplessis, Tonitia Brownlee, DEBORAH GRIMMEL, Shantarias Johnson, Karen Dugger Logan, Lakoshia Robert, Theresa Starling, Patricia Phillips, JULIE BOYLE, REBECCA WEIR, JACOB JONES, Kathy Yoho, ELIZABETH COTTON, Keith Baird, Jill Blum, LORI A. THOMPSON, GWEN A. ELLENBECKER, Laura Bradley, Elizabeth Rogers, Kyersten Galto, JENNA AIZENMAN, Shannon Barksdale, Latisha Silvera, Amanda Payne, Sarah Fontenot, MUNIRA HAYES, Jamilah Martin, Megan Nash, Christine Esparza, Julia Rae Dawson, RYAN OSWEILER, LATRINA GRAY, ERICA TABOR, Starkisha Stephens, Rosemarie Obregon, VANESSA LOPEZ, Sheena S. Hall-Thomas, W.T. EVERETTE, III, Catrecia Royal, Sharon Wilson, Beth Richardson, RAY C. ROELLER, Nicolette I. Nalu, KATHRYN STUART, Deena Ross, ANNA BLAKED, LISABETH A. RAMOS, Shalana Danielle Smith, Crystal Murry, Tracey L. Miller, DAWN M. STARK, RODRICKA BROWN, Geovanna Davis, Osayuware Enagbare, Angie Tate, Jeanette Freeman, Heath Howington, Michelle Wester, Jessica Cowlthorp, Lacy Jensen, LISA MCKENZIE, Patricia Dellaripa, Kimberly Martinez, Amber Price, Jane Bledsoe, Alexandria Ingley, Rebecca Clure, Eric Lowe, LINDA KOEHLER, JULIA B. THOMPSON, Danika Early, Elonda Laurdendine, Suzan McFadden, Rebecca Hord, KAREN FREY, JESSICA HARRISTON, Melissa Perry, Alaina Gurdo, Teresa Wright, Carmita T. Purdiman, MARIE E. THOMAS, MARIA R. NUNEZ, Triesa Jane White, KENAUIYA M. STRAIN, Shannon Howard, Sarah P Lemmerman, Holly Anderson, JENNIFER LIBERTINI, David Webb, Elyssa R Correia, Michael Johnson, NICOLE SCIROTTO, CHRISTY MCCORMICK, Jennifer O'Leary, CHRISTINA GADEKEN, KIMBERLY L. ANDRESS, SANDRA S. AHEARN, Demoria D Sparrell, ILONA EDIE, Jessica Sharp, Morgan Reddy, AMANDA LEE CRUMP, Taylor Wilson, MERIDITH HAMMER, TONYA J. KELLY, TEREZRE K. BROWN, Andrea Heebsh, Kathryn Bogart, Alyssa Wellons, Julia A. McMahon, Nicole Helfer, Suzette Potter, JAMILA WILLIAMS, Erin Zarella, Shannon Peters, Melissa Richards, Catalina Chinchilla, Jordan Beilke, COURTNEY BUCHANAN, NEKA REED, De-Kisha Jones, DONITTA KEMP, Tara Guenther, LAZARO LOPEZ, Natalee Ridenour, AMANDA J. HANSON, JENNIFER N. STEVENS, Kerri Bultman, Rachel L. Lietzke, Mary Stevens, Denise E. Breland, Kimberly Meadows, Jennifer Spence, DEBORAH J. KING, Avis Baker, Sharese McQuiller, Niccole Archuleta, Kimberly W. Beebe, Celia Baltodano, TRACEY HOLMES, Laffenia Griffin, Stephanie Morris, Tara Shupe, Vanessa Chantal Johnson, Sharcarin Bonds, Zane Moses, Jennilee Trujillo, ANGELINE HAGOOD, Deonne Carter, Shanae Smith, LORI A. HEISEY, Ashlee Menefee, Kelly France, Dana Suggs, Jessica Callahan, Michelle Lynn Teolis, Amanda Peka, Katrina Abrizenski, Adriana Hernandez Rodriguez, Andrea Jessica Johnson, KELLY PROBO, PAULINE THUDE, Monee' Hamm, JODY LEE SUTTON-TORRES, JACQUELINE QUALLS, April Colvin, BLAS LOPEZ, Erica A. Warren, LATASHA ALSTON, Victoria Duruh, Linda E. Coleman, JACKLYN GREENE, Jean Golightly, Lori Johns, ELIZABETH ALUCK, LISA ALLEN, Danielle Riley, valerie hyatt, JASON RENDA, KATHERINE LINDLE, Carrisa Archer, David Rose, Karen Nutkiewicz, Mariah Scott, Denise Games, Elaine Nelson, AOIFE M. CONNOLLY, DANIELLE L. BEAUCHAMP, Lori Neece, ERIN C. MEDOVICH, LAUREN J. CAMPBELL, SALLIE JACKSON, DAISY GONZALEZ, CHERI L. DUNN, Monique Smith, Lindsey Hirtzel, Sherrika L. James, Traci Neier, Sara Hudson, STEPHANIE PINEIRO, LORRIE D EVERITT, SARA OSBORN, FRANCIS F. LIPSCOMB, JR., Joseph Kmetz, Jr., Brent Freeman, Gabrielle Blake, Lacie York, BRIAN M. PETERSON, Tonya Ona Henderson, Doris Newman, Natasha Samuel, JOANN C. MERCHANT, HERSCHEL POWELL III, Kyndel Macik, Sharetha Culver, ALISON K. CANNON, JENNIFER L. BURNS, Meghan Bright Buckholtz, KRISTY GUNTHER, Kayla Shepard, Abigail Lardizabal, Kimberly L. Sutter, Nikki Henry, Tiffany Barron, Adriane Goetschius, Diane M. Agresta, Lillian Ernst, LAUREN ZULAUF, Ashellie Johnson, Amanda Mericle, NICOLE MORETTI, Amy Olson, Ziporah Paskman, Susan Carroll, CONNIE M. FRUGE, Dana Houle, SADE L. ALBINO, Khari Saia, Shawn Daryne Kline, Birdella Carter, SCOTT WESTERGREN, Brianne Irons, Angela Clark, Crystal Crawford, ANDERSON WHITE, Deanna Davis, Lekita L. Nance, KRISTIN L WESTERGREN, CATRENIEL L. RICHARDSON, ARTHUR L. DAVIS, Lorraine Luvano, Michelle Geddes, Veronica Davis, ALYSIA IWEN, TAMMY CLEMMONS, WENDY CASTILLO, Kim Fuller, Mary Beth Debus, Chloe Fouts, Vanessa K. Allen, Jamie Oakley, Meghan Smith, Autumn Dunne, Tamika Wilkins, Amber Thomason, Carole Bertman, Jessica Todd, Shannon Marcum, KIMBERLY FORTNEY, Stacey M. Henson, Jameela Jones, Melanie Elizabeth Torrie, Christie Brigman, Nicholle King, Cassidy Gage, Tina Fleege, Katherine Gault, Kathleen Peters, MALINDA L. WALKER, DANA M. ANSPACH, Tonya Abete, TRISHA L. MARTINDALE, Kimberly Korstjens, TANYA D. MAYAN, MIKE ELLENBECKER, Evelyn Sanchez, Isha Thomas, Marianne Asante-Appiah, Lacey Renkoski, KEVIN DECKER, Laquinta Richardson, Lori Frazier, JASON MIXSON, CARLON J. MOORE, EVA L. PALLE AND STEVEN PALLE, DANA JONES, Melissa Culpepper, BEVERLY CLEMENTS, Suskia Hyde, ASHLEY STURGEON, Dena Lasha Wright, NIKKIA L. GEORGE, Cari H. Hayes, CRYSTAL J. BROWN, Connie Bruns, Nefateria Boya, Dana Joubert Hayes, Kim Mayfield, Ebony Gardner, ELIZABETH YRAY, Cheryl A. Bender, CHRISTINA ALLEN, Gloria Armas, NICHOLAS J. MOBILIO, JR., Morgan-Deja Langowski, Nicole Cooper, Sarah Raymond, Anne Wiseman, Michael Gilbert, Megan Tinsley, SARAH E. BYE, Kate Jacobsen, RACHEL L. MARNELL, Rachael Dawn Ward, Karlyn Cunningham, Nicole Soto, Katherine Flore, Brandon Campbell, Debra Wright, Montine Green, Amanda Megan Walker, Kristine Tyni, Namon Story, ALLISON HODGE, Kelli Justesen, STEFANI D. FREEMAN, IRIZ P. MEZA, Riquel Barham, ROBERT STEVENS, JR., Jayne Moore, MICHELLE N. SPEARS, Stephanie Ferrell Merello, TRISHA J. WALKER, Amanda Levi, AMANDA E. KELLEY, Courtney Robson, Dorothy Schardt, CARLA DREWRY, Jennifer Neal Spence, CLAUDIA VILLEGAS, CHRISTOPHER GOEHRS, Kineta Harrington, Heather Watson, MARCYA Y. CAIN, W Michael Wellons, Shannon Leigh, CRYSTAL JOHNSON, Christine Jurmann, JEFF ELLIS, Catherine Loehr, Heidi Gornik, DEREK TERNES, Edith Hall, Katrina Hatfield, Justin Stuckey, Sirena Tallman, Lauren Romak, Marissa Elena Cook, Krista Welborn, Jennifer Grady, Chloe Lasser, Yolanda Davis, Melody Niesen, Dominique Bell, JESSE D MCMACKIN, Kristal Mize, AREANNA E. YZAGUIRRE, Oluwatayo Davis, VANESSA TAYLOR CHILDS, Sharon L. Young, Jo Ellen Hensley, Leann O'Rourke, KACI DUKE, KRISTI DIETZ, Robin Steinberg, LAURA CONTRERAS, Jennifer D. Adams, Deanna Chandler, Jeanine Pace, JANET MUSE, JOSHUA STOMBECK, EASTER M. BROWN, Catherine Mayo, BEATRICE D. BRADY, TANAYA BROWN, Araceli Luera, Martina Andrea Chadwick, Jessica Williams, Jennifer Ward, KELLY L. KUNDER, CATHERINE TURPIN, Malynda Bergeman, Luann Skeval, Stephanie Hunter, Anita Clark, Leah Valerio, KRISTINA M. HARMON, Anthony Smith, Crystal Clark, Gregg Stroud, Sonally Achon, FLOYD E. MCKINNEY, SARAH D. MARR, Jernell Fair, BRANDI TISINGER, JESSICA M. SAILE, Jennifer Harding, Pamela Penn, Nicole R. Nemic, LETICIA C. CAZENAVE-BROWN, DUSTIN MCGOWAN, Jennifer Britton, LORINA D. POTTER, Jane O'Neill, PAULA THURMAN, Michelle Koerner, Tammie Wood-Hess, Jocelyn Osborn, PAUL D. WALKER, Brandi Tucker, Jennifer Hovis, Stephanie Minto, Christina Renee Pitchford, MICHELLE HENRY-YONKIE, CRISTINA R. HECHAVARRIA, JEANNE BAYERL, Melissa Glidden, ASHLEY WYBLE, UNIQUE COLMORE JOYNER, STEVEN G. KERN, ERIN M. FISH, MARGARY BINION-HEMPHILL, Amber J. Wilson, Trence Lyles, Anisha Quinteros, CHAD L. WARREN, TABITHA CRANDALL, Laurie Green, Stephanie Smith, Lanae Babineau, SUSAN MAMROL, Miesha Forte, KAREN A. LUNDQUIST, JACKIE RAISOR, KATY FITZSIMMONS, TIA A. CLIBORNE, HEATHER E. CRONIN, EVELYNE SANE LY, Danielle C. Bacote, Aimee Lashlee, ELIZABETH KLEIN, SHERRY L. MITCHELL, Linda Villalobos, SHERRYLEE M. ANTONELLI, Alisha Little, Sarah Bakka, Katrina Ray, SHAYNA L. MCGILL and Brenda Legree
Defendant: Merck and Co Inc, Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Schering-Plough Corporation, McKesson Corporation,, Merck & Co., Inc., Minal Mehta MD A Professional Corporation, Organon International, Inc. and John Does
Petitioner: Gregory N McEwen, Shirley Moore, Karen Wilson, Rhonda Bays, Ramzi Yusef, Rebecca Sanderson, Mary Sihoff, Terry Nichols and Richard Reid
Case Number: 4:2008md01964
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 2027 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-316) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. FEB v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv17625, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:19-cv-00632-RWS MURRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:19cv00065, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:19-cv-00633-RWS. (DLB)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2026 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-316) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. FEB v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv17625, MURRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:19cv00065. (DLB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2025 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-315) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. LYONS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv15302 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:19cv00165-RWS. (DLB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2024 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-315) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. LYONS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv15302. (DLB)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2023 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-314) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. WARREN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:19cv00234, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:19-cv-00080-RWS, TRAYLOR v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:19cv00237, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:19-cv-00081-RWS. (DLB)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2022 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-314) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. WARREN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:19cv00234,TRAYLOR v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:19cv00237. (DLB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2021 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-313) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Belcher v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:18cv02186 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:19-cv-00031-RWS. (DLB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2020 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-313) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Belcher v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:18cv02186. (DLB)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-312) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Scott v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18-14583, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-CV-01762-RWS. (DJO)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2018 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-312) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Scott v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18-14583. (DJO)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2017 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-311) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Everton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:18cv02349 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18cv1745 RWS. (DLB)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2016 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-311) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Everton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:18cv02349. (DLB)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2015 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-310) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Buchanan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:18cv05136 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-01734-RWS. (DLB)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2014 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Joint Motion for Order Regarding Conclusion of the NuvaRing Resolution Program #2012 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1. The NuvaRing Resolution Program has concluded, and no party has any further obligations there under. 2. The NuvaRing Resolution Program website, located at www.nuvaringofficialsettlement.com, will shut down and be inaccessible to all parties after October 10, 2018. Claimant and claimant counsel access to all records maintained on the Program Website and corresponding portal shall end as of that date. The corresponding Program phone number will also be disabled as of that date. 3. Neither Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel nor Defendants shall have any obligation to maintain or produce records to participants of the NuvaRing Resolution Program. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/3/18. (ARL)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2013 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-310) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Buchanan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:18cv05136. (DLB)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2012 Joint MOTION for Ruling on Conclusion of the NuvaRing Resolution Program by Defendant ORGANON USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Strauss, Stephen)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2011 ORDER APPROVING THE SPECIAL MASTER'S FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING THE NUVARING SETTLEMENT PROGRAM AND FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND EXPENSES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendationof the Special Master is approved and this Court hereby orders as follows. 1. The NuvaRing Settlement Program shall be closed upon entry of this Order.2. The QSF shall be closed and the QSF Administrator, Analytics Consulting LLC, is discharged of any additional obligations upon completion of the steps necessary to wind down the QSF. 3. The remaining proceeds in the various funds held by the QSF Administrator shall be distributed to Schlichter, Bogard & Denton, LLP. 4. Out of these funds, the QSF Administration, Special Master fees, bank charges, and other miscellaneous expenses shall be paid. 5. Roger Denton and Kristine Kraft are hereby discharged as Co-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/10/18. (ARL)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2010 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-309) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. GONZALES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv12354 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18cv1479 RWS. (DLB)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2009 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-309) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. GONZALES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv12354. (DLB)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2008 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-308) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. SANTOS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv11674, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18cv01299-RWS, Jenkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. South Carolina, Case No. 1:18cv00210, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18cv01300-RWS. (DLB)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2007 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-308) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. SANTOS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv11674, Jenkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. South Carolina, Case No. 1:18cv00210. (DLB)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2006 NOTICE Appearance of John P. Sullivan of Holland & Knight LLP: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC.., ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., LLC, ORGANON USA, INC (Sullivan, John)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2005 NOTICE Appearance of Caitlin L. Stachon of Holland & Knight LLP: by Defendants Merck & Co, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Stachon, Caitlin)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2004 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Thomas J. Yoo. (Yoo, Thomas) (The address was updated in CM/ECF.) Modified on 8/7/2018 (LMR).
July 12, 2018 Filing 2003 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-307) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. BIGGS v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv10918, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18cv01144 RWS. (DLB)
July 11, 2018 Filing 2002 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-307) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. BIGGS v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv10918. (DLB)
June 29, 2018 Filing 2001 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-306) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. ANDULIN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv10336, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-01059-RWS, COLE v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv10688, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-01060-RWS. (DLB)
June 29, 2018 Filing 2000 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-306) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. ANDULIN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv0336, COLE v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv10688. (DLB)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1999 ORDER REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS ALLOCATED TO NUVARING PROGRAM PARTICIPANT TIANA CROSSLEY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the settlement funds allocated to Tiana Crossley, in the amount of $34,341.30, shall be disbursed to Ms. Crossley and her counsel. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/27/18. (ARL)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1998 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. The transferee court in this litigation has advised the Panel that coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in the actions on this conditional remand order have been completed and that remand to the transferor court, as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a), is appropriate. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions on this conditional remand order be remanded to their respective transferor court. MOE 4:16cv00792 / NJ 2:16cv02691 RALPH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv00878 / NJ 2:16cv03083 BOSTIC v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv00879 / NJ 2:16cv03141 PERRY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv00880 / NJ 2:16cv03201 WEYANDT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv00881 / NJ 2:16cv03211 GRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv01035 / NJ 2:16cv03404 SCOTT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv01156 / NJ 2:16cv03566 REYNOLDS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv01157 / NJ 2:16 cv 03610 SCIROTTO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv01158 / NJ 2:16 cv 03611 BOYLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv01159 / NJ 2:16cv03790 GREENE v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv01209 / NJ 2:16cv04159 PALMER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, MOE 4:16cv01241 / NJ 2:16cv04279 MEYER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. (DLB)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1997 NOTICE Service: by Plaintiff Tiana C. Crossley (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Paralegal Charisse Charles Regarding Notice of Order to Show Cause Provided to Lienholders, #2 Certificate of Service)(Paulos, Christopher)
June 14, 2018 Filing 1996 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-305) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Ruiz v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 9:18cv80632, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18cv00964RWS, HELLINGER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv9575 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18cv00965RWS. (DLB)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1994 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-305) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Ruiz v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 9:18cv80632, HELLINGER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv9575. (DLB)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1995 ORDER RE SUGGESTION OF REMAND...[See Order for Complete Details.]. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/11/2018. (NEP)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1993 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any claimed lienholder, including May Medical Center and Mt. Sinai Hospital, show cause no later than June 20, 2018, why the approved settlement amount of $34,341.30 for NuvaRing Program Participant Tiana Crossley should not be disbursed by the QSF Administrator to Ms. Crossley and her counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that claimant Tiana Crossleys counsel is responsible for providing a copy of this Order to any known party with any interest or claimed interest in the settlement funds approved for Tiana Crossley, including but not limited to May Medical Center and Mt. Sinai Hospital. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for telephonic hearing on June 27, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. All interested parties must appear at this hearing. All interested parties must contact Defendants counsel Stephen Strauss for access to the conference call-in number at least 24 hours in advance of the hearing. (Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2018. Telephone Conference set for 6/27/2018 11:30 AM in Telephone before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/7/2018. (NEP)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1992 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss Claimant Erica Hill's claim with prejudice [ #1983 ] is GRANTED. Claimant Erica Hill does not have any further rights under the NuvaRing Resolution Program. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Claimant's counsel: Derek T. Braslow, Pogust Braslow & Milrood, 8 Tower Bridge, Suite 940, 161 Washington Street, Conshohocken, PA 19428, dbraslow@pbmattorneys.com. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/7/2018. (A copy of this Order was emailed to the above listed counsel.)(NEP)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1991 ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss Claimant Anna Saenz's claim with prejudice [ #1981 ] is GRANTED. Claimant Anna Saenz does not have any further rights under the NuvaRing Resolution Program. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Claimants counsel: Hunter J. Shkolnik, Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, 360 Lexington Avenue, 11th Floor, New York, NY 10017, hunter@napolilaw.com and Debra Humphrey, Marc J. Bern & Partners, LLP, One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 950, New York, NY 10165, dhumphrey@bernllp.com. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/7/2018. (NEP) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the above listed counsel.)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1990 MEMORANDUM (Joint Submission of [Proposed] Order Re: Suggestion of Remand) by Defendants Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Merck & Co, Inc., N.V. Organon, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Re: Suggestion of Remand, #2 Appendix A to Order Re: Suggestion of Remand)(Geist, Melissa)
May 24, 2018 Filing 1989 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-304) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. DANIELS v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv09115, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00792-RWS. (DLB)
May 24, 2018 Filing 1988 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-304) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. DANIELS v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv09115. (DLB)
May 23, 2018 Filing 1987 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-303) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. GOOLSBY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv08783, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00787-RWS, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:18cv00229, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00788-RWS. (DLB)
May 22, 2018 Filing 1986 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-303) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. GOOLSBY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1808783, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1800229. (DLB)
May 16, 2018 Filing 1985 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1972 Scheduling Order, by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Biosciences NV, Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1984 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #1983 MOTION to Dismiss Party Claimant Erica Hill filed by Defendant ORGANON USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strauss, Stephen)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1983 MOTION to Dismiss Party Claimant Erica Hill by Defendant ORGANON USA, INC. (Strauss, Stephen)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1982 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #1981 MOTION to Dismiss Party Claimant Anna Saenz filed by Defendant ORGANON USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strauss, Stephen)
May 4, 2018 Filing 1981 MOTION to Dismiss Party Claimant Anna Saenz by Defendant Organon USA, Inc.. (Strauss, Stephen)
April 27, 2018 Filing 1980 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-302) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. DELGADO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv06656, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00671-RWS. (DLB)
April 27, 2018 Filing 1979 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-302) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. DELGADO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv06656. (DLB)
April 23, 2018 Filing 1978 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-301) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. HOLTS v. N.V. ORGANON et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv05826, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00644-RWS. (DLB)
April 20, 2018 Filing 1977 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-301) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. HOLTS v. N.V. ORGANON et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv05826. (DLB)
April 19, 2018 Filing 1976 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-300) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. NASH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv05262, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00628-RWS. (DLB)
April 19, 2018 Filing 1975 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-300) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. NASH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv05262. (DLB)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1974 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-299) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Paulsen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nebraska, Case No. 8:18cv00144, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00608-RWS, COLE v. N.V. ORGANON et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv04820, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00609-RWS. (DLB)
April 16, 2018 Filing 1973 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-299) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Paulsen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nebraska, Case No. 8:18cv00144, COLE v. N.V. ORGANON et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv04820. (DLB)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1972 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is set in this matter on April 12, 2018 is continued and will now be held on May 17, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than May 16, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' counsel is responsible for placing the call and having all parties on the line before contacting my chambers at 314-244-7430. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/11/2018. (CAR)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1971 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-298) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Swanson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:18cv00430, opened as ECMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00516-RWS. (DLB)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1970 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-298) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Swanson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:18cv00430. (DLB)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1969 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-297) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Dojnia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D.Florida, Case No. 8:18cv00532, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00462-RWS, TAYLOR v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv13715, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00463-RWS, SILLS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv02307, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00464-RWS. (DLB)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1968 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-297) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Dojnia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D.Florida, Case No. 8:18cv00532, TAYLOR v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv13715, SILLS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv02307. (DLB)
March 21, 2018 Filing 1967 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-296) FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. CASTILLO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv 02516, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00433-RWS. (DLB)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1966 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-296) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. CASTILLO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:18cv 02516. (DLB)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1965 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the teleconference set in this matter on February 21, 2018 is continued and will now be held on April 12, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than February 10, 2018. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/22/18. (ARL)
February 14, 2018 Filing 1964 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-295) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Augusto v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 0:18cv60109, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00250-RWS. (DLB)
February 14, 2018 Filing 1963 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-295) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Augusto v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 0:1860109. (DLB)
January 24, 2018 Filing 1962 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-294) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Bogart v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Connecticut, Case No. 3:18cv00047, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00116-RWS. (DLB)
January 24, 2018 Filing 1961 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-294) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Bogart v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Connecticut, Case No. 3:18cv00047. (DLB)
December 28, 2017 Filing 1960 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-293) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. ANDERSON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv11931, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02938-RWS, GUZMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv12195, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02939-RWS,COLE v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv12258, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02940-RWS, Zentz v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:17cv03298, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:18-cv-00197-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 2/2/2018 (DLB).
December 27, 2017 Filing 1959 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-293) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. ANDERSON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv11931, GUZMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv12195, COLE v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv12258. (DLB)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1958 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is set in this matter on December 19, 2017 is continued and will now be held on February 21, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than February 19, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to participate in the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155)...SEE ORDER.... Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/18/17. (LGK)
November 16, 2017 Filing 1957 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-292) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. STANDIFER v. ORGANON USA, INC, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv10692, opened as EDMO Case 4:17-cv-02723-RWS, JOHNSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv10967, opened as EDMO Case 4:17-cv-02724-RWS. (DLB)
November 16, 2017 Filing 1956 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-292) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. STANDIFER v. ORGANON USA, INC, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv10692, JOHNSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv10967. (DLB)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1955 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is set in this matter on November 14, 2017 is continued and will now be held on December 19, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than December 18, 2017. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/13/17. (ARL)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1954 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-291) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. GOULD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-07588, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-02628 RWS, SWEET v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-08074, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-02629 RWS, GOEMAAT v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-08096, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-02630 RWS. (DJO)
October 26, 2017 Filing 1953 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-291) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. GOULD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-07588, SWEET v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-08074, GOEMAAT v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-08096. (DJO)
October 12, 2017 Filing 1952 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-290) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. KOONTZ v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1707420 opened as EDMO Case No.. 4:17-cv-02563-RWS. (DLB)
October 11, 2017 Filing 1951 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-290) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. KOONTZ v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1707420. (DLB)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1950 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is set in this matter on October 12, 2017 is continued and will now be held on November 14, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than November 13, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to participate in the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 1:45 p.m. so the conference may start promptly at 2:00 p.m. Counsel who are not participating and are just monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/10/17. (KJS)
October 2, 2017 Filing 1949 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FINALIZED regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. The transferee court in this litigation has advised the Panel that coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in the actions on this conditional remand order have been completed and that remand to the transferor court, as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a), is appropriate. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions on this conditional remand order be remanded to their respective transferor court. NJ 2:15cv6771 LUCAS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv00299 DUNNINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, NJ 2:16cv00467 NGUYEN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv01237 CORMICLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv01265 SOLOMON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv01669 STUART v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv01806 SCHELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv01833 ROBINS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv02243 GERETY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv02268 HELDMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv02286 DOWDELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, NJ 2:16cv02368 KELLER v. ORGANON USA, INC et al. (DLB)
September 28, 2017 Filing 1948 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-289) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Blom v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland Case No. 1:17-02791, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02488 RWS, CONDER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06957 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02489 RWS. (DJO)
September 27, 2017 Filing 1947 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-289) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Blom v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland Case No. 1:17-02791, CONDER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06957. (DJO)
September 22, 2017 Filing 1946 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-288) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. COLUCCI-WILLIAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06425, opened as EDMO case No. 4:17-cv-02454 RWS. (DJO)
September 21, 2017 ***REMARK - Copy of ORDER RE: SUGGESTION OF REMAND Doc. #1944 forwarded via email to the MDL Panel. (MRC)
September 20, 2017 Filing 1945 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-288) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. COLUCCIWILLIAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06425. (DJO)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1944 ORDER RE: SUGGESTION OF REMAND...SEE ORDER.... Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/19/17. (LGK)
August 31, 2017 Filing 1943 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-287) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. ADAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC et al D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06047, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02346-RWS, ALEXANDER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06048, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02347-RWS, ALLEN v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06144, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-02348-RWS. (DLB)
August 31, 2017 Filing 1942 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-287) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. ADAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC et al D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06047, ALEXANDER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06048, ALLEN v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-06144. (DJO)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1941 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is set in this matter on August 31, 2017 is continued and will now be held on October 12, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than October 10, 2017...see order for additional information.... Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/30/17. (LGK)
August 29, 2017 Filing 1940 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co, Inc., ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC.., ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., LLC, ORGANON USA, INC, Plaintiffs ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., LLC, ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., LLC JOINT SUBMISSION OF [PROPOSED] ORDER RE SUGGESTION OF REMAND (Geist, Melissa)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1939 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is set in this matter on August 31, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Central Time. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than August 29, 2017. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/17/17. (ARL)
August 11, 2017 Filing 1938 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-286) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. HINES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1705549, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-2241 RWS, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 1:1700785, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-2242 RWS, Johnson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1701040, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-2243 RWS. (DJO)
August 10, 2017 Filing 1937 NOTICE by Plaintiff Deborah L. Bell Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Houston, Sharon)
August 10, 2017 Filing 1936 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-286) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. HINES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1705549, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 1:1700785, Johnson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1701040. (DLB)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1935 NOTICE by Defendants McKesson Corporation,, McKesson Corporation, of Change to Firm Name from Morris Polich & Purdy, LLP to Clark Hill, LLP (Frisch, Wendi)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1934 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference in this matter set on August 8, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. Order setting out new date and time to issue at a later date. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/1/17. (ARL)
August 1, 2017 Filing 1933 NOTICE by Plaintiff Deborah L. Bell Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Kasputys, Patricia)
July 27, 2017 Filing 1932 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-285) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. BROWNRIGG v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1704884, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-2152 RWS and MARTINEZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-04885, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-2153 RWS. (DJO)
July 26, 2017 Filing 1931 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-285) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. BROWNRIGG v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1704884, MARTINEZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-04885. (DJO)
July 11, 2017 Filing 1930 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-284) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Newcomb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Massachusetts, Case No. 1:1711151, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01944-RWS, Morgan v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1700967, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01945-RWS. (DLB)
July 10, 2017 Filing 1929 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-284) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Newcomb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Massachusetts, Case No. 1:1711151, Morgan v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1700967. (DLB)
June 26, 2017 Filing 1928 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-283) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Forte v. Organon USA, et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17--3895, opened as MOED Case No. 4:17-cv-1797 RWS, and Shockely v. Organon USA Inc, et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-03991, opened as MOED Case No. 4:17-cv-1798 RWS. (DJO)
June 20, 2017 Filing 1927 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-283) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Forte v. Organon USA, et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17--3895, Shockely v. Organon USA Inc, et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-03991. (DJO)
June 13, 2017 Filing 1926 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-282) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. BIGGERS v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1703497, opened as EDMO Case No.4:17-cv-01658-RWS. (DLB)
June 9, 2017 Filing 1925 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-282) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. BIGGERS v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1703497. (DLB)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1924 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference in this matter set on June 14, 2017 is reset and will now be held on August 8, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than August 3, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/8/17. (KXS)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1923 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-281) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Chaffee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. New Mexico Case No. 2:1700545 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01575-RWS, WEINKAUF v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey Case No. 2:1703063 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01576-RWS, HUTZLER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey Case No. 2:1703066 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01577-RWS. (DLB)
May 22, 2017 Filing 1922 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-281) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. WEINKAUF v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey Case No. 2:17-03063, HUTZLER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey Case No. 2:17-03066, Chaffee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. New Mexico Case No. 2:17-00545. (DJO)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1921 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-280) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Mayfair v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Montana, Case No. 1:1700051, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01492-RWS. (DLB)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1920 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-280) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Mayfair v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Montana, Case No. 1:1700051. (DLB)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1919 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-279) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi Meyer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 1:17-00354 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-1486-RWS. (DJO)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1918 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-279) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. Meyer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. New York Case No. 1:17-00354. (DJO)
May 5, 2017 Filing 1917 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-278) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Murphy v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 5:1700987, opened as EDMO Case 4:17-cv-01448-RWS. (DLB)
May 1, 2017 Filing 1916 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-278) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964. Murphy v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 5:1700987. (DLB)
April 24, 2017 Filing 1915 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-277) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Baker v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 5:17-00545, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-1365-RWS, Floyd v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:17-02554, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-1366-RWS. (DJO)
April 19, 2017 Filing 1914 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-277) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964. Baker v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 5:17-00545 and Floyd v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:17-02554. by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. (DJO)
April 14, 2017 Filing 1913 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-276) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi.Lynch v. Organon USA, Inc et al., D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1700772, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01324-RWS. Moreno v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. New Mexico, Case No. 1:1700400, opened as EDMO Case No.4:17-cv-01325-RWS.(DLB)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1912 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to continue the status conference set in this matter on April 14, 2017 #1910 is GRANTED. The conference is reset and will now be held on June 14, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than June 9, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/14/17. (LGK)
April 13, 2017 Filing 1911 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-275) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Rothell v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, case no. 3:17-828, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-1338 RWS. (DJO) Modified on 4/17/2017 (DJO).
April 13, 2017 Filing 1910 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Status Conference From April 18, 2017 to June 2017 by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
April 13, 2017 Filing 1909 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-276) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Lynch v. Organon USA, Inc et al., D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1700772, Moreno v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. New Mexico, Case No. 1:1700400. (DLB)
April 11, 2017 Filing 1908 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-275) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Rothell v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, case no. 3:1700828. (DJO)
March 30, 2017 Filing 1907 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-274) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Richard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 8:17cv00290, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01215-RWS, Wickizer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:17cv0374, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01216-RWS. (DLB)
March 29, 2017 Filing 1906 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-274) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. Richard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 8:17cv00290,Wickizer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:17cv0374. (DLB)
March 13, 2017 Filing 1905 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-273) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. LEGREE v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:17-01108, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-CV-00878 RWS, Sheets v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. North Carolina Case No. 5:17-00041, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-CV-00879 RWS. (DJO)
March 10, 2017 Filing 1904 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-273) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. LEGREE v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, case no. 1:17-01108, Sheets v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. North Carolina, case no. 5:17-00041. (DJO)
March 6, 2017 Filing 1903 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-272) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964. JOHNS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-00981, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-CV-834 RWS, MCGLONE et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:17-00708, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-CV-835 RWS. (DJO)
March 3, 2017 Filing 1902 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-272) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITYLITIGATION MDL No. 1964 by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. JOHNS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-00981, MCGLONE et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:17-00708. (DJO)
March 3, 2017 Filing 1901 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-271) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964. PINEIRO v. ORGANON USA, INC et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-00671, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00822 RWS. (DJO)
February 23, 2017 Filing 1900 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-271) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. IN RE: NUVARING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 1964 PINEIRO v. ORGANON USA, INC et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17-00671. (DJO)
February 21, 2017 Filing 1899 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-270) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. AndersonBrice v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 6:17cv6076 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00766-RWS. (DLB)
February 16, 2017 Filing 1898 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-270) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: AndersonBrice v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 6:17cv6076. (DLB)
February 8, 2017 Filing 1897 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-269) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. BAKOLLI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1700282, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00499-RWS, BELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1700283, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00500-RWS, McClain v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1700115, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00501-RWS, Tombragel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1700041, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00502-RWS. (DLB)
February 7, 2017 Filing 1896 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-269) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: BAKOLLI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1700282, BELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1700283, McClain v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1700115, Tombragel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1700041. (DLB)
February 7, 2017 Filing 1895 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-268) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. CHARITY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv00085 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00489-RWS. (DLB)
January 23, 2017 Filing 1894 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-268) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: CHARITY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:17cv00085. (DLB)
January 23, 2017 Filing 1893 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-267) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Reddy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 6:17-06012 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00256 RWS. (DJO)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1892 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference set in this matter on April 18, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than April 14, 2017. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/18/17. (ARL)
January 18, 2017 Filing 1891 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 1/18/2017. Order to follow. Next Status Conference set for April 18, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. (Court Reporter: Shannon White) (ARL)
January 18, 2017 Filing 1890 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-267) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Reddy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, Case No. 6:17-06012. (DJO)
January 17, 2017 Filing 1889 TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-266) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Allen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1: 1606932, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00213-RWS. Tamburri v. Organon USA Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 7:1609683, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-00214-RWS. (DLB)
January 17, 2017 Filing 1888 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-266) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Allen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1: 1606932, Tamburri v. Organon USA Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 7:1609683. (DLB)
January 13, 2017 Filing 1887 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Joint Agenda for January 18, 2017 Status Conference by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
January 5, 2017 Filing 1886 ENTRY of Appearance by Debra J. Humphrey for Plaintiff FELICIA M. SULLIVAN. (Humphrey, Debra)
January 5, 2017 Filing 1885 ENTRY of Appearance by Debra J. Humphrey for Plaintiffs OCTAVIA HILL, OCTAVIA HILL. (Humphrey, Debra)
January 5, 2017 Filing 1884 ENTRY of Appearance by Debra J. Humphrey for Plaintiffs CYNTHIA HACKWORTH, KEITH HACKWORTH. (Humphrey, Debra)
December 9, 2016 Filing 1883 TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-265) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: JOHNSON-BYRD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. D. New Jersey Case No. 2:16-08669 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01922 RWS. (DJO)
December 8, 2016 Filing 1882 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-265) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: JOHNSON-BYRD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. D. New Jersey Case No. 2:16-08669. (DJO)
November 28, 2016 Filing 1881 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-264) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: KEMP v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No.2:16-08438, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01867-RWS. (DLB)
November 28, 2016 Filing 1880 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-264) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: KEMP v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No.2:1608438. (DLB)
November 1, 2016 Filing 1879 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964 as to the following cases: TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1501133 to TRANSFEROR COURT HI 1:1500249 Correia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1402084 to TRANSFEROR COURT IAS 4:1400499 Law v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1500394 to TRANSFEROR COURT MA 3:1530014 Longtin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1401328 to TRANSFEROR COURT MSS 3:1400527 Lindsey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1500666 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1502335 HILL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1500953 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1503651 BUFORD v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, M TRANSFEREE COURT OE 4:1501374 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1506136 CARDA v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1501375 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1506181 BUHLER v. ORGANON USA. INC. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1501626 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1507254 KYLES v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1501627 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1507295 MORIN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1501882 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1508197 GUNTHER v. ORAGNON USA, INC. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1600116 to TRANSFEROR COURT NJ 2:1600165 HUFF v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, TRANSFEREE COURT MOE 4:1401568 to TRANSFEROR COURT PAM 1:1401701 Sechrist v. Organon USA, Inc. et al.(DLB)
October 27, 2016 Filing 1878 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-263) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: MURRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-0643, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01671 RWS, WILLIAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-06545, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-1672 RWS. (DJO)
October 25, 2016 Filing 1877 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-263) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: MURRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2;1606543; WILLIAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1606545. (DJO)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1876 ORDER RE SUGGESTION OF REMAND: The cases listed in Exhibit A of this order are ready to be remanded to the transferor courts. To assist the transferor courts following remand, this order describes pertinent events that have taken place to date in this MDL. A copy of this order will be sent to the transferor courts with each remanded case. The documents, orders, and rulings which have been filed in this case and in the individual related cases are available to the transferor courts through the Court's CM/ECF docketing system. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/19/16. (ARL)
October 6, 2016 Filing 1875 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-262)regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: OSTERTAG v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-05599, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01580 RWS, Gamble v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:16-08903, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01581 RWS. (DJO)
October 6, 2016 Filing 1874 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-262) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Gamble v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:16-08903, OSTERTAG v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-05599. (DJO)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1873 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference set in this matter on January 18, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than January 16, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155)...SEE ORDER.... Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/27/16. (LGK)
September 20, 2016 Filing 1872 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-261) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Zulauf v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-cv-5335 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-1481 RWS, Orr v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-cv-5417, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-1482 RWS. (DJO)
September 19, 2016 Filing 1871 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-261) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964 - ZULAUF v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, District New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-05335; ORR v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, District New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-05417. (MRC)
September 15, 2016 Filing 1870 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 9/15/2016. Discussion held between Court and counsel. Next hearing set for 1/18/17 at 11:30 a.m. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:L. Paczkowski) (FTR Gold: No) (LGK)
September 14, 2016 Filing 1869 NOTICE for Joinder to Memorandum of JOINT SUBMISSION OF [PROPOSED] ORDER RE SUGGESTION OF REMAND by Plaintiff Christine Law. (Cook, James) Modified on 9/22/2016 to correct filing event. (ARL)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1868 MEMORANDUM (Joint Submission of Proposed Order Re Suggestion of Remand by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC.., ORGANON USA, INC, Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Appendix A to Order Re Suggestion of Remand)(Geist, Melissa)
September 8, 2016 Filing 1867 STATUS REPORT JOINT AGENDA FOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2016 STATUS CONFERENCE by Merck & Co., Inc., ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC.., ORGANON USA, INC. (Geist, Melissa)
August 26, 2016 Filing 1866 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-260) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: YRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1604680 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01376-RWS. (DLB)
August 25, 2016 Filing 1865 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-260) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: YRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1604680. (DLB)
August 22, 2016 Filing 1864 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-259) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: WILSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, District New Jersey,Case No. 2:16-04723, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01358-RWS,JONES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, District New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-04752, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01359-RWS. (DLB)
August 19, 2016 Filing 1863 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-259) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964 - WILSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, District New Jersey,Case No. 2:16-04723, JONES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, District New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-04752.(MRC)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1862 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1861 MOTION for Leave to Attend September 15, 2016, Status Conference Telephonically filed by Leslie Benyo; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/11/16. (CAR)
August 10, 2016 Filing 1861 MOTION for Leave to Attend September 15, 2016 Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiff Leslie Benyo. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-01671-RWS(Bentley, Gregory)
July 29, 2016 Filing 1860 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-258) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: MEYER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1604279 opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-01241-RWS. (DLB)
July 29, 2016 Filing 1859 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-258) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: MEYER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1604279. (DLB)
July 22, 2016 Filing 1858 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-257) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: PALMER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-04149, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-1209-RWS. (DJO)
July 22, 2016 Filing 1857 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-257) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: PALMER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-04149. (DJO)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1856 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-255) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: STUART v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1601669, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01155-RWS, REYNOLDS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603566, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01156-RWS, SCIROTTO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603610, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01157-RWS, BOYLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603611, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01158-RWS, GREENE v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603790, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01159-RWS. (DLB)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1855 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-256) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: STUART v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1601669, REYNOLDS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603566, SCIROTTO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603610, BOYLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603611, GREENE v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603790. (DLB)
June 28, 2016 Filing 1854 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-255) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: SCOTT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-03404, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-01035-RWS. (DJO)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1853 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference set in this matter on July 6, 2016 is continued to September 15, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than September 8, 2016.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). See Order for full details. Status Conference set for 9/15/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Status Report due by 9/8/2016. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/27/16. (ARL)
June 24, 2016 Filing 1852 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-255) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: SCOTT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-03404. (DJO)
June 17, 2016 Filing 1851 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-254) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: BOSTIC v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603083, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00878-RWS, PERRY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603141, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00879-RWS, WEYANDT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603201, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00880-RWS, GRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603211, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00881-RWS. (DLB)
June 17, 2016 Filing 1850 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-254) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: BOSTIC v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603083, PERRY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603141, WEYANDT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603201, GRAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1603211. (DLB)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1849 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1843 MOTION for Leave to Attend July 6, 2016 Status Conference Telephonically filed by Leslie Benyo; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/16/16. (CAR)
June 14, 2016 Filing 1848 TRANSCRIPT of #1833 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 3/1/16 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Shannon_White@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2016. (LGK)
June 14, 2016 Filing 1847 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-253) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Wiggins v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1601665 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00850-RWS. (DLB)
June 14, 2016 Filing 1846 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-253) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Wiggins v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1601665.(DLB)
June 14, 2016 Filing 1845 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-252) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1605410 opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-00845-RWS. (DLB)
June 9, 2016 Filing 1844 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-252) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1605410. (DLB)
June 8, 2016 Filing 1843 MOTION for Leave to Attend July 6, 2016 Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiff Leslie Benyo. (Bentley, Gregory)
June 3, 2016 Filing 1842 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-251) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the PanelJeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964:RALPH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602691 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16CV00792 RWS. (DJO)
June 2, 2016 Filing 1841 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-251) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: RALPH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602691. (DLB)
May 20, 2016 Filing 1840 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-250) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: GERETY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602243, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00721-RWS, HELDMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602268, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00722-RWS, DOWDELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602286, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00723-RWS, SHAFFER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602308, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00724-RWS, KELLER v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602368, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16-cv-00725-RWS. (DLB)
May 20, 2016 Filing 1839 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-250) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: GERETY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602243, HELDMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602268, DOWDELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602286, SHAFFER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602308, KELLER v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1602368. (DLB)
April 26, 2016 Filing 1838 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-249) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: SCHELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-01806, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16CV00580-RWS, ROBINS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-01833, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:16CV00581-RWS. (DJO)
April 25, 2016 Filing 1837 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-249) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: SCHELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al. D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-01806, ROBINS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al . D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-01833. (DJO)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1836 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-248) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: DUNNINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600299, opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-00379-RWS, MOORE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600459, opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-00380-RWS, NGUYEN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600467, opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-00381-RWS, EULETTE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600543, opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-00382-RWS, CORMICLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1601237, opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-00383-RWS, SOLOMON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1601265, opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-00384-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 3/23/2016 (DLB).
March 21, 2016 Filing 1835 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-248) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: DUNNINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600299, MOORE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600459, NGUYEN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600467, EULETTE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1600543, CORMICLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1601237, SOLOMON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1601265. (DLB)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1834 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on July 6, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The parties shall file a proposed agenda no later than June 29, 2016. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/1/16. (ARL)
March 1, 2016 Filing 1833 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 3/1/2016. Order to follow. Next Status Conference set for July 6, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. (Court Reporter: Shannon White) (ARL)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1832 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Plaintiffs' Agenda for March 1, 2015 Status Conference by In Re Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation. (Kraft, Kristine)
February 29, 2016 Filing 1831 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory Dalton Bentley for Plaintiffs Leslie Benyo, Robert Benyo. (Bentley, Gregory)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1830 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT FILED BY DEFENDANTS AND BY PLAINTIFFS REPRESENTED BY ALONSO KRANGLE LLP by MERCK & CO. INC., ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC.., ORGANON USA, INC, SCHERING CORPORATION. (Geist, Melissa)
February 25, 2016 Filing 1829 TRANSCRIPT of #1819 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 11/10/15 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Shannon_White@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2016. (LGK)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1828 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1827 MOTION for Leave to Attend Hearing Telephonically by Plaintiff Cali Longtin. (Pellegrino, Raipher) filed by Cali Longtin ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/22/16. (LGK)
February 19, 2016 Filing 1827 MOTION for Leave to Attend Hearing Telephonically by Plaintiff Cali Longtin. (Pellegrino, Raipher)
February 8, 2016 Filing 1826 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Filing Application for Approval of Settlement by Peyton Michael Greenfield (Johnson, Regina)
February 1, 2016 Filing 1825 NOTICE Filing of Motion for Filing Under Seal: by Plaintiff Peyton Michael Greenfield (Johnson, Regina)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1824 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-247) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; SHERWOOD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-0068, opened as EDMO Case 4:16CV00115 RWS, HUFF v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-00165, opened as EDMO Case 4:16CV00116 RWS. (DJO)
January 29, 2016 Filing 1823 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-247) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: SHERWOOD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-0068, HUFF v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:16-00165. (DJO)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1822 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-246) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: GUNTHER v. ORAGNON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1508197 opened as EDMO Case 4:15-cv-01882-RWS. (DLB)
December 17, 2015 Filing 1821 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-246) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: GUNTHER v. ORAGNON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1508197. (DLB)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1820 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall produce documents related to the 2013 NuvaRing label change no later than December 31, 2015. Plaintiffs shall have until February 1, 2016 to notify Defendants if Plaintiffs seek additional discovery on the documents produced. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed order providing the status of the ongoing cases which will accompany these remaining cases upon remand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on March 1, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/10/15. (ARL)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1819 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 11/10/2015. Next Status Conference is set for 3/1/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (Court Reporter:Shannon White.) (FTR Gold: No.) (CAR)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1818 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Plaintiff Cali Longtin. (Volpe, Richard)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1817 STATUS REPORT OF DISCOVERY by Elyssa R Correia. (Levitt, Gary)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1816 NOTICE Status of Discovery: by Plaintiffs Leslie Benyo, Robert Benyo (Zonies, Joseph)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1815 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Regarding Updated Regulatory Production by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Merck and Co Inc, Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon, Inc., Schering-Plough Corporation, Defendant Ad Litem Organon USA, Inc.. (Strauss, Stephen)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1814 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Plaintiff Amado Perez. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:13-cv-01620-RWS(Perez, Jose)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1813 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re (1800 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS) Scheduling Order, Regarding Status of Discovery by Plaintiff Amy Sechrist. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-01568-RWS(Eriksson, Reed)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1812 NOTICE Status of Discovery: by Plaintiff Christine Law (Cook, James)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1811 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Plaintiffs CRYSTAL BUFORD, ADRIENNE BUHLER, AMY LYNN CARDA, Rachel Hill, SHELIA KYLES, ANISA LUCAS, HEATHER MORIN. (Krangle, David)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1810 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1800 Scheduling Order, by In Re Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation. (Kraft, Kristine)
October 28, 2015 Filing 1809 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-245) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; KYLES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1507254, opened as EDMO Case 4:15CV1626 RWS; MORIN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1507295, opened as EDMO Case 4:15CV1627 RWS. (DJO)
October 28, 2015 Filing 1808 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-245) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: KYLES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1507254, MORIN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1507295. (DJO)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1807 ORDER GRANTING #1806 Proposed Motion for to Establish Qualified Settlement Fund and Appoint Fund Administrator. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/8/15. (CAR)
October 7, 2015 Filing 1806 MOTION for Settlement PROPOSED MOTION TO ESTABLISH QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND APPOINT FUND ADMINISTRATOR by Plaintiff Ashley Albrecht. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Jaime)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1805 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-244) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; LUCAS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1506771, opened as EDMO Case 4:15-cv-01491-RWS. (DLB) (DLB)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1804 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-244) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; LUCAS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1506771. (DLB)
September 24, 2015 Filing 1803 TRANSCRIPT of #1799 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 9/9/2015 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Shannon_White@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2015. (CAR)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1802 ORDER GRANTING SPECIAL MASTER'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/15/15. (LGK)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1801 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1589 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Kraft, Kristine) filed by Diane M. Agresta, TANAYA BROWN, AMBER BOCK, #1730 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Plaintiffs Catalina Castro, Catalina Castro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Snapka, Kathryn) filed by Catalina Castro, #1555 MOTION for Hearing re #1554 Conditional Transfer Order, #1536 Conditional Transfer Order by Plaintiffs Katrina Frances Baldwin, Beatrice Burgueno, Beatrice Burgueno, Geovanna Davis, Mandy DeGroote, Jacqueline Friar, Mirna Gonzalez, Mirna Gonzalez, Mirna Gonzalez, Sarah Gutierrez-Anderson, Jasmine Herrara, Kinberly Kelly, Linda Messick, Marlin Messick, Elisabeth Mora, Alfonso Reyes, Phoebe Seaton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Mohsenzadegan, Shireen) filed by Sarah Gutierrez-Anderson, Beatrice Burgueno, Marlin Messick, Linda Messick, Katrina Frances Baldwin, Mirna Gonzalez, Elisabeth Mora, Jacqueline Friar, Mandy DeGroote, Jasmine Herrara, Geovanna Davis, Alfonso Reyes, Kimberly Kelly, Phoebe Seaton, #1315 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness David Grimes by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks, WENDY CASTILLO, KAZAN CLARK. (Kraft, Kristine) filed by Diane M. Agresta, KAZAN CLARK, Allison Brooks, AMBER BOCK, WENDY CASTILLO, #1540 MOTION for Hearing re #1536 Conditional Transfer Order,,,, by Plaintiffs Aimee Axelrod, Beatrice Burgueno, Catalina Chinchilla, Mirna Gonzalez, Judy Hackett, Porshe Smith, Elizabeth Vasquez. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support)(Shkolnik, Hunter) filed by Aimee Axelrod, Beatrice Burgueno, Mirna Gonzalez, Judy Hackett, Porshe Smith, Catalina Chinchilla, Elizabeth Vasquez, #1575 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority In Support Of Pending Summary Judgment Motions by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Cassetta, Richard) filed by Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon USA, Inc., #1560 MOTION for Hearing re #1555 MOTION for Hearing re #1554 Conditional Transfer Order, #1536 Conditional Transfer Order by Plaintiffs Katrina Frances Baldwin, Beatrice Burgueno, Geovanna Davis, Mandy DeGroote, Jacqueline Friar, Mirna Gonzalez, Sarah Gutierrez-Anderson, Jasmine Herrara, Kinberly Kelly, Linda Messick, Marlin Messick, Elisabeth Mora, Alfonso Reyes, Phoebe Seaton. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion And Request To Add To May 15, 2013 Status Conference Agenda)(Mohsenzadegan, Shireen) filed by Sarah Gutierrez-Anderson, Beatrice Burgueno, Marlin Messick, Linda Messick, Katrina Frances Baldwin, Mirna Gonzalez, Elisabeth Mora, Jacqueline Friar, Jasmine Herrara, Mandy DeGroote, Geovanna Davis, Alfonso Reyes, Kimberly Kelly, Phoebe Seaton ; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/11/15. (ARL)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1800 ORDER: That a Status Conference is set for 11/10/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants and Plaintiffs shall file notices of the status of discovery no later than 11/6/2015. See Order for specifics. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/9/15. (CAR)
September 9, 2015 Filing 1799 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 9/9/2015. Arguments heard. Order to follow. Next Status Conference set for 11/10/15 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. (Court Reporter: Shannon White) (ARL)
September 8, 2015 Filing 1798 MOTION for Leave to APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Plaintiffs CRYSTAL BUFORD, Rachel Hill. (Krangle, David)
September 4, 2015 Filing 1797 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1787 Scheduling Order,,, Plaintiffs' Agenda for September 9, 2015 Status Conference by In Re Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation. (Denton, Roger)
September 4, 2015 Filing 1796 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Defendants' Agenda for September 9, 2015 Status Conference by Defendants Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
September 4, 2015 Filing 1795 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-243) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; Carda v. Organon USA Inc., et al, D. New Jersey 2:15-06136 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15-cv-01374 RWS; Buhler v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. New Jersy 2:15-06181 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15-cv-01375 RWS. (DJO)
September 2, 2015 Filing 1794 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-243) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; Carda v. Organon USA Inc., et al, D. New Jersey 2:15-06136; Buhler v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. New Jersy 2:15-06181. (DJO).
September 2, 2015 Filing 1793 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Approve Special Master's Supplemental Report and Recommendation by In Re Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kristine)
September 2, 2015 Filing 1792 MEMORANDUM Special Master's Supplemental Report and Recommendation by In Re Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraft, Kristine)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1791 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs CRYSTAL BUFORD, RACHEL HILL, CRYSTAL BUFORD, RACHEL HILL filed by Plaintiffs CRYSTAL BUFORD, RACHEL HILL, CRYSTAL BUFORD, RACHEL HILL. (Krangle, David)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1790 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Cali Longtin. (Volpe, Richard)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1789 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re (16 in 4:14-cv-01568-RWS) Order, by Plaintiffs Amy Sechrist, Amy Sechrist filed by Plaintiffs Amy Sechrist, Amy Sechrist. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-01568-RWS(Oliver, Alyson)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1788 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-242) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; Correia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Hawaii, Case No. 1:1500249 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15-cv-01133-RWS. (DLB)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1787 ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/9/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/17/15. (LGK)
July 17, 2015 Filing 1785 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-242) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; Correia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Hawaii 1:1500249. (DLB)
July 16, 2015 Filing 1786 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 7/16/2015. Discussion held between Court and counsel. Next status conference scheduled for 9/9/15 at 10:30 a.m. (Court Reporter:Shannon White.) (FTR Gold: No.) (LGK)
July 13, 2015 Filing 1784 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Joint Agenda for July 16, 2015 Status Conference by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Schering-Plough Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strauss, Stephen)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1783 AMENDED ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that status conference in this matter will be held on July 16, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The corrected telephone conference activation times are included below. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 2:45 p.m. so the conference may start promptly at 3:00 p.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/8/15. (LGK)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1782 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' consent motion to continue #1781 is granted and the status conference scheduled for July 8, 2015 is reset to be held on July 16, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/2/15. (LGK)
July 1, 2015 Filing 1781 Consent MOTION to Continue the Status Conference Set for July 8, 2015 by In Re Nuvaring Products Liability Litigation. (Kraft, Kristine)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1780 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-241) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; BUFORD v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1503651 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV00953 RWS; (DJO)
June 17, 2015 Filing 1779 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-241) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; BUFORD v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1503651; (DJO)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1778 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney Gregory McEwen's motion to establish aplaintiff firm qualified settlement fund #1777 is DENIED for failing to comply with my December 9, 2014 order #1759 establishing the procedure for filing qualified settlement fund motions. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/5/15. (LGK)
June 4, 2015 Filing 1777 MOTION for Settlement to Establish Plaintiff Firm Qualified Settlement Fund and Appoint Fund Administrator by Petitioner Gregory N McEwen. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A-C, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McEwen, Gregory)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1776 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference scheduled for May 6, 2015 is reset to be held on July 8, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/4/15. (JWD)
April 22, 2015 Filing 1775 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-240) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. HILL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1502335 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15-cv-00666-RWS. (DLB)
April 22, 2015 Filing 1774 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-240) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; HILL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1502335. (DLB)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1773 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1772 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Christine Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-02084-RWS ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/11/15. (JWD)
March 10, 2015 Filing 1772 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Plaintiff Christine Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-02084-RWS(Cook, James)
March 3, 2015 Filing 1771 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-239) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Longtin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Massachusetts Case No. 4:15-30014, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV394 RWS; (DJO)
March 2, 2015 Filing 1770 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-239) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; Longtin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Massachusetts, Case No. 3:1530014; (DJO)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1769 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on May 5, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callersoutside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is notinterrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/14/15. (ARL)
January 14, 2015 Filing 1768 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 1/14/2015. Next Status Conference set for May 5, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Shannon White) (ARL)
January 14, 2015 Filing 1767 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Joint Agenda for 1/14/15 Status Conference by Plaintiffs AMBER BOCK, BRITTANY KEMP-WILSON, SUSAN MAMROL, ANGELICA REYES, ANGELA YATES. (Kraft, Kristine)
January 12, 2015 Filing 1766 NOTICE by Plaintiff Amy Sechrist re (1680 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS) Order, Plaintiff's Adoption of General Causation Reports Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-01568-RWS(Oliver, Alyson)
January 12, 2015 Filing 1765 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Amy Sechrist re (12 in 4:14-cv-01568-RWS) Declaration, (1680 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS) Order, Plaintiff's Certification Attesting to Records Pursuant to Order 1680 of February 7, 2014. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-01568-RWS(Oliver, Alyson)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1764 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-238) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case Transferred in: Law v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1400499, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-02084-RWS. (DLB)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1763 MEMORANDUM in Support of Special Master's Report and Recommendation Regarding the Allocation and Distribution of Common Benefit Fees and Expenses by Plaintiffs AMBER BOCK, Shannon Peters, KRISTEN TERRY, ANGELA ZABEL. (Denton, Roger)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 ORDER APPROVING THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING THE ALLOCATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND EXPENSES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, the Report and Recommendation of the Special Master are approved and adopted by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, the Qualified Settlement Fund Administrator, Analytics Consulting LLC ("Analytics") is authorized andshall make the following distributions from the Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds as set forth in Exhibit 1 of the Special Master's Report and Recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, the balance of the Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds be retained until such time as theSpecial Master recommends to this Court that a future distribution is appropriate. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/18/14. (ARL)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1760 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-238) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Law v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1400499.(DLB)
December 16, 2014 Filing 1761 SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING THE ALLOCATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Special Master on 12/16/14. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Please Note: Exhibit 2 is filed in paper format and maintained by the Clerk's Office.)(ARL)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1759 ORDER: PROCEDURE FOR FILING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND MOTIONS....SEE ORDER FOR ALL DETAILS.... Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/9/14. (LGK)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1758 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1756 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., #1754 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., #1752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/8/14. (KXS)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1757 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (1756 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 13 in 4:14-cv-00339-RWS) MOTION for Order to Show Cause , (1754 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS) MOTION for Order to Show Cause , (1752 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS) MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa A. Geist)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:14-cv-00339-RWS(Geist, Melissa)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1756 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Orders)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:13-cv-00641-RWS, 4:13-cv-02593-RWS, 4:14-cv-00339-RWS(Geist, Melissa)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1755 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (26 in 4:13-cv-01967-RWS, 1754 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 16 in 4:10-cv-00395-RWS) MOTION for Order to Show Cause , (1752 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS) MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Defendants Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa A. Geist)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:10-cv-00395-RWS, 4:13-cv-01967-RWS(Geist, Melissa)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1754 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Orders)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:10-cv-00395-RWS, 4:13-cv-01967-RWS(Geist, Melissa)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1753 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (23 in 4:10-cv-00062-RWS, 9 in 4:11-cv-02074-RWS, 19 in 4:08-cv-02001-RWS, 9 in 4:12-cv-01682-RWS, 1752 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 13 in 4:10-cv-00767-RWS, 11 in 4:13-cv-02604-RWS, 24 in 4:09-cv-01504-RWS) MOTION for Order to Show Cause why the claims of certain non-participating plaintiffs should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with this Court's February 7, 2014 Order filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa A. Geist, Esq.)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS et al.(Geist, Melissa)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 text of proposed orders)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS et al.(Geist, Melissa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 1751 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-237) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi; In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; DUFRESNE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1401511; (DJO)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1750 TRANSCRIPT of #1747 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on October 23, 2014 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Shannon_White@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/1/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2015. (JWD)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1749 ORDER GRANTING NEGOTIATING PLAINTIFFS' COMMITTEE'S REQUEST FOR INTERIM DISTRIBUTION FROM THE COMMON BENEFIT EXPENSE FUND FOR PAYMENT OF EXPENSES. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/3/14. (JWD)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1748 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on January 14, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:45 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:00 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/23/14. (LGK)
October 23, 2014 Filing 1747 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 10/23/2014. Discussion held between Court and counsel. Various motions also heard and ruled on the record. Order to issue. Next Court set for 1/14/15 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter:Shannon White.) (FTR Gold: No.) (LGK)
October 22, 2014 Filing 1746 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Joint Agenda for October 23, 2014 Status Conference by Plaintiffs AMBER BOCK, BRITTANY KEMP-WILSON, SUSAN MAMROL, ANGELICA REYES, ANGELA YATES. (Kraft, Kristine)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1745 MOTION for Leave to Request Interim Distribution from the Common Benefit Expense Fund for Payment of Expenses by Plaintiffs Niccole Archuleta, KENDRA BELL, JENNIFER L. MITCHEM, Angela Rimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 1, 2014 Filing 1744 MOTION for Leave to Establish Plaintiff Firms' Qualified Settlement Fund and Appoint Fund Administrator by Plaintiffs Sonally Achon, Niccole Archuleta, Lanae Babineau, Avis Baker, Avis Baker, Mercedes Ball, Marcia Barnes, Micelle Birch, Jill Blum, Tammy Borowski, Kailan Brooks, Meghan Bright Buckholtz, Veronica Burton, Angela Clark, Anita Clark, April Colvin, Christine Cooke, Cindy Dall, Selica Davis, Latoya Denton, Donica Doroski, Danielle Dulon, Jihan Elgazzar, Aimee Ellison, Lillian Ernst, Christine Esparza, Janice Estep, Karen Failinger, Kimberly Foard, Kim Fuller, Adriane Goetschius, Lisa Grant, Laforrest Harris, Lauren Hill, Jennifer Hummer, Petra Huntsinger, Susette Jimenez, Valerie Johnson, Tameka Jones, Eileen Kahn, Lisa Kempf, April Kimberlain, Maria Law, Barbara Lee, Araceli Luera, Nicole Lyne, Jillian Macklin, Barbara Martin, Patricia Martinez, Danielle Massey, Kim Mayfield, Kellie McElroy, Paula Mizell, Tomica Moore, Kayanna Moreland-Law, Candice Morris, Amanda Morrison, Mellisa Navarrette, Lisa Ness, Pamela Penn, Denise Perry, Patricia Phillips, Jessica Quiroz, Lakoshia Robert, Karen Rose, Shannon Rothfus, Catrecia Royal, Karla Sanchez, Michelle Sanchez, Debra Schaefer, Hope Schultz, Caryn Sweats, Tamra Walderon, Jami Walker, Kathy Welsh, Kelly Whitecotton, Chaumaneik Williams, Anne Wiseman, Carol Wulf. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Driscoll, John)
September 26, 2014 Filing 1743 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-236) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Case Transferred in: Benyo et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1402527, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-01671-RWS. (DLB)
September 25, 2014 Filing 1742 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-236) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Benyo et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1402527. (DLB)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1741 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time of the status conference set in this matter on October 23, 2014 has changed. The conference is now set to start at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446- 0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 9:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/15/14. (JWD)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1740 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-235) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Cases Transferred in: Sechrist v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:14-01701, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV1568 RWS; Duncan v. Merck & Company, Inc., S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:14-02470, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV1569 RWS; (DJO)
September 11, 2014 Filing 1739 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-235) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Sechrist v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M. D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:14-01701; Duncan v. Merck & Company, Inc., S. D. Texas, Case No. 4:14-02470; (DJO)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FILED BY FERRER, POIROT & WANSBROUGH AS DOCUMENT NOS. 1734, 1735, 1736, AND 1737: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough;s Objections to Special Master's Recommendation for Common Benefit Attorneys Fees (#1734 ); Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough's Motion for Leave to Extend the Time for Mediation of the Special Master's Recommendation for Common Benefit Fee Approval (#1735 ); Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough's Motion for Accounting of PSCs Common Benefit Fees (#1736 ); and Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough's Motion to Abate or Enjoin Distribution of Common Benefit Fees to Any PSC Member (#1737 ) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/3/14. (JWD)
September 3, 2014 Filing 1737 MOTION TO ABATE OR ENJOIN DISTRIBUTION OF COMMON BENEFIT FEES TO ANY PSC MEMBER by Objector Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough. (DLB)
September 3, 2014 Filing 1736 MOTION FOR ACCOUNTING OF PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE COMMON BENEFIT FEES by Objector Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough. (DLB)
September 3, 2014 Filing 1735 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR MEDIATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER'S RECOMMENDATION FOR COMMON BENEFIT FEE APPROVAL by Objector Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough. (DLB)
September 2, 2014 Filing 1734 OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S RECOMMENDATION FOR COMMON BENEFIT ATTORNEY'S FEES by Objector Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough. (DLB)
August 18, 2014 Filing 1733 TRANSCRIPT of #1724 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on July 25, 2014 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Shannon_White@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014. (JWD)
August 14, 2014 Filing 1732 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-234) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Case Transferred in: Lamkin et al v. Merck and Company, Inc., E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:14-01748, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-01411-RWS. (DLB)
August 14, 2014 Filing 1731 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-234) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Lamkin et al v. Merck and Company, Inc., E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:1401748. (DLB)
August 8, 2014 Filing 1730 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Plaintiffs Catalina Castro, Catalina Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Snapka, Kathryn)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1729 ORDER: The Court has been informed that you are not participating in the NuvaRing Resolution Program that is currently underway. The Court advises you that the stay in this litigation expired on July 31, 2014, and is no longer in effect. The time for compliance with all pre-trial deadlines set forth in the Court's Order Regarding Preservation of Records and Prima Facie Evidence of Usage, Injury and Causation Requirements for Pending Cases Not Participating in the NuvaRing Resolution Program and Newly Filed or Transferred Cases, entered February 7, 2014 (Doc. 1680) will begin to run on August 1, 2014, for cases not participating in the NuvaRing Resolution Program. These deadlines will apply to your case.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/1/14. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS et al.(LGK)
July 29, 2014 Filing 1728 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-233) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Cases Transferred in: Lindsey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., S. D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:14-00527, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV01328 RWS, Castro v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. D. Texas, Case No. 1:14-00118, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV01329 RWS; (DJO)
July 29, 2014 Filing 1727 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-233) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Lindsey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., S. D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:14-00527, Castro v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. D. Texas, Case No. 1:14-00118; (DJO)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 ORDER: ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference set in this matter is set on October 23, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:45 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:00 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/25/14. (ARL)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held this day, the Court is advised by the parties that the NuvaRing Resolution Program is proceeding as planned. Claims packages have been submitted and are being processed by the parties and the claims administrator. The Court advises all parties that as of July 31, 2014, the stay in this litigation will expire and will no longer be in effect, and the time for compliance with all pre-trial deadlines set forth in the Court's Order Regarding Preservation of Records and Prima Facie Evidence of Usage, Injury and Causation Requirements for Pending Cases Not Participating in the NuvaRing Resolution Program and Newly Filed or Transferred Cases, entered February 7, 2014 (Doc. #1680 ) will begin to run as of that date for cases not participating in the NuvaRing Resolution Program. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/25/14. (ARL)
July 25, 2014 Filing 1724 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 7/25/2014. Discussion held between Court and counsel. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:Shannon White.) (FTR Gold: No.) (JWD)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1723 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER ESTABLISHING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND FOR NUVARING RESOLUTION PROGRAM AND TO APPOINT QSF ADMINISTRATOR. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/14/14. (ARL)
July 9, 2014 Filing 1722 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-232) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Cases Transferred in: HIBBERT v. ORGANON USA INC et al, N.D. Florida, Case No. 4:1400043, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-01224-RWS, Patrick v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 3:1400097, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-01225-RWS. (DLB)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1721 ORDER ESTABLISHING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND FOR NUVARING RESOLUTION PROGRAM AND TO APPOINT QSF ADMINISTRATOR. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/7/14. (JWD)
July 3, 2014 Filing 1720 MOTION for Leave to Agreed Motion to Establish Qualified Settlement Fund by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kraft, Kristine)
July 2, 2014 Filing 1719 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-232) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. HIBBERT v. ORGANON USA INC et al, N.D. Florida, Case No. 4:1400043, Patrick v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 3:1400097. (DLB)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1718 ORDER REGARDING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND. On February 7, 2014, the parties entered into a Master Settlement Agreement (MSA). On June 4 2012, the parties agreed to an amendment to the MSA which confirmed the EffectiveDate of June 4, 2014 and the date of August 13, 2014 as the deadline for Organon to deposit the Settlement Funds into a Qualified Settlement Fund. The Court enters the following orders with respect to the implementation of the MSA and related matters: See Order for Full Details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/25/14. (ARL)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1717 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference set in this matter is set on July 25, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446- 0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:45 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:00 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/17/14. (LGK)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1716 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movants' motion to intervene in this matter [#1715 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/13/14. (JWD)
June 11, 2014 Filing 1714 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-231) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Transferred in: Kmetz v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, N. D. West Virginia, Case No. 5:1400071, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV1081 RWS. (DJO) Modified on 6/11/2014 to edit state (DJO).
June 11, 2014 Filing 1712 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-231) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Kmetz v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, N. D. Virginia, Case No. 5:1400071; (DJO)
June 6, 2014 Filing 1715 MOTION to Intervene by Movants Rhonda Bays, Edward Breivik, Bethany Brittan, Holly Bruce, Christopher Donnelly, James Holmes, John Lindh, Shirley Moore, Terry Nichols, Richard Reid, Jonathan Rich, Rebecca Sanderson, Mary Sihoff, Jimmy James Thule, Rebecca Turner, Karen Wilson, Christopher Wirth, Ramzi Yusef. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JWD)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1711 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that adversarial litigation in these cases, including all discovery, motions, hearings on motions, and rulings related to any of these cases, shall be held in further abeyance until July 30, 2014.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/29/14. (LGK)
May 16, 2014 Filing 1713 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-230) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Case Transferred in: Strong v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1400138, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00932-RWS.(DLB)
May 13, 2014 Filing 1710 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-230) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Strong v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1400138. (DLB)
April 23, 2014 Filing 1709 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-229) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Case Transferred in: Lamb v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 2:1301056, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV788 RWS. (DJO)
April 23, 2014 Filing 1708 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-229) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Lamb v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 2:1301056. (DJO)
April 17, 2014 Filing 1707 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-228) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Case Transferred in: Compton v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 8:1401187, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00760-RWS. (DLB)
April 17, 2014 Filing 1706 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-227) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Compton v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 8:1401187. (DLB)
April 4, 2014 Filing 1705 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER w/ Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Cases transferred in: FLOURNEY, ET AL. V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., N.D. California No. 3:14-37, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV690 RWS, MAJOR-MACK V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., N.D. California No. 3:13-5421, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV691 RWS, RIFENBERY, ET AL. V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., N.D. California No. 3:13-5463, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV692 RWS, STEVENS V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., N.D. California No. 3:13-5713, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV693 RWS. (DJO)
April 3, 2014 Filing 1704 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-227) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Case Transferred in: Brown v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. Michigan, Case No. 2:14-11147, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV682 RWS. (DJO)
April 1, 2014 Filing 1703 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-227) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Brown v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Michigan, 2:1411147. (DJO)
April 1, 2014 Filing 1702 TRANSFER ORDER w/ Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. MAJOR-MACK V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., C.A. No. 3:13-5421, RIFENBERY, ET AL. V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., C.A. No. 3:13-5463, STEVENS V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., C.A. No. 3:13-5713, FLOURNEY, ET AL. V. ORGANON USA, INC., ET AL., C.A. No. 3:14-37. (DJO)
March 28, 2014 Filing 1700 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-226) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Cases transferred in: ALEXANDER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306368, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00557-RWS, BAYERL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306369, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00558-RWS, BELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306370, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00559-RWS, DANIELE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306371, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00560-RWS, DANIELS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306372, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00561-RWS, HARRISTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306373, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00562-RWS, EDIE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306375 2:1306375, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00563-RWS, JACKSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306388, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00564-RWS, KEITH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306389, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00565-RWS, LAINE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306390, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00566-RWS, MCFALL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306393, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00567-RWS, MUWONGE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306395, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00568-RWS, PIRONE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306396, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00569-RWS, SHIMEK v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306397, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00570-RWS, VILLEGAS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306398, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00571-RWS, MIRANDA v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306399, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00572-RWS, MOSS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306400, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00573-RWS, HESTANDEVANS v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306410, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00574-RWS, DIETZ v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306411, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00575-RWS, Garcia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. MDL No.4:1400119, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00577-RWS, Brown v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., M.D. Alabama, Case No. 3:1400069, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00595-RWS, Laurdendine v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:1400497, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00597-RWS, Lay v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:1400530, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00598-RWS, Archuleta v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400151, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00599-RWS, Babineau v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400154, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00600-RWS, Benidt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400156, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00601-RWS, Birch v. Organon USA, Inc., S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400157, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00602-RWS, Bynum v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400159, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00603-RWS, Clark v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400162, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00604-RWS, Colvin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400164, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00605-RWS, Combest v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400165, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00606-RWS, Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400168, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00607-RWS, Elgazzar v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400170, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00608-RWS, Estep v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400173, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00609-RWS, Failinger v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400174, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00610-RWS, Foard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400175, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00611-RWS, Forte v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400176, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00612-RWS, Grant v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400179, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00613-RWS, Hairston v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400180, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00615-RWS, Hill v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400181, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00616-RWS, Ball v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400155, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00617-RWS, Harris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400182, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00618-RWS, Hill v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400195, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00619-RWS, Jensen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400197, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00620-RWS, Jimenez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400198, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00621-RWS, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400199, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00622-RWS, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400200, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00623-RWS, Kimberlain v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400202, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00624-RWS, Martin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400204, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00625-RWS, McDonald v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400205, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00626-RWS, Martinez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400210, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00627-RWS, Martinez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. MDL No.3:1400211, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00628-RWS, McElroy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400212, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00629-RWS, Lyne v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400213, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00630-RWS, Law v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400214, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00631-RWS, Mayfield v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400215, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00632-RWS, Moore v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400227, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00633-RWS, Mizell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400228, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00634-RWS, Quiroz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400238, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00635-RWS, Robert v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400239, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00636-RWS, Ralston v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400244, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00637-RWS, Purvis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400245, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00638-RWS, Rothfus v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400253, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00639-RWS, Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400261, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00640-RWS, Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400262, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00641-RWS, Schaefer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400263, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00642-RWS, Walker v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400264, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00643-RWS, Willis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400268, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00644-RWS, Wulf v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400269, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00645-RWS, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400270, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00646-RWS, Wiseman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400271, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00647-RWS, Whitecotton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400273, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00648-RWS, Welsh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400274, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00649-RWS, Fuller v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400177, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00650-RWS. (DLB)
March 25, 2014 Filing 1699 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-225) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Cases transferred in: Clure v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N. D. Alabama, Case No. 2:14-00338, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV526 RWS, Consuelo Owens v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, C. D. California, Case No. 2:14:1619, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV551 RWS, Carter v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. California, Case No. 1:14-00246, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV514 RWS, Dulon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. California, Case No. 2:14-00527, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV519 RWS, Denmark v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:14-00263, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV524 RWS, Clark v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400161, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV521 RWS, Perry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400236, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV530 RWS, Patel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400237, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV513 RWS, Penn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400242, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV522 RWS, Phillips v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400243, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV528 RWS, Tate v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400266, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV531 RWS, Schultz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:14-00082, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV515 RWS, Borowski v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nevada, Case No. 2:1400301, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV516 RWS, Tallman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 5:1400239, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV512 RWS, Awan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1401268, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV540 RWS, Hummer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 5:1400456, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV525 RWS, Dall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1400182, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV523 RWS, Lee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Rhode Island, Case No. 1:1400113, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV520 RWS, Goetschius v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 1:14-00550, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV517 RWS, Ellison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 8:1400485, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV518 RWS, Morris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:1402157, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV533 RWS, Watkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1400166, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV532 RWS, Morrison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 1:1400226, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV538 RWS, Royal v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 1:1400232, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV539 RWS, McGowan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400059, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV527 RWS, MorelandLaw v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400305, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV534 RWS, Rasband v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400317, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV535 RWS, Lymangrover v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1405183, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV536 RWS, Ness v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1405184, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV537 RWS, Lamb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Wyoming, Case No. 2:1400044, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV529 RWS, Walderon v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 1:14-00194, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV555 RWS. (DJO)
March 25, 2014 Filing 1698 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-226) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Brown v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., M.D. Alabama, Case No. 3:1400069, Archuleta v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400151, Babineau v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400154, Ball v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400155, Benidt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400156, Birch v. Organon USA, Inc., S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400157, Bynum v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400159, Clark v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400162, Colvin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400164, Combest v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400165, Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400168, Elgazzar v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400170, Estep v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400173, Failinger v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400174, Foard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400175, Forte v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400176, Fuller v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400177, Grant v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400179, Hairston v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400180, Hill v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400181, Harris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400182, Hill v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400195, Jensen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400197, Jimenez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400198, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400199, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400200, Kimberlain v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400202, Martin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400204, McDonald v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400205, Martinez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400210, Martinez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. MDL No.3:1400211, McElroy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400212, Lyne v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400213, Law v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400214, Mayfield v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400215, Moore v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400227, Mizell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400228, Quiroz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400238, Robert v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400239, Ralston v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400244, Purvis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400245, Rothfus v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400253, Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400261, Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400262, Schaefer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400263, Walker v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400264, Willis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400268, Wulf v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400269, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400270, Wiseman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400271, Whitecotton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400273, Welsh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400274, Laurdendine v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:1400497, Lay v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:1400530, ALEXANDER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306368, BAYERL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306369, BELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306370, DANIELE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306371, DANIELS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306372, HARRISTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306373, EDIE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306375 2:1306375, JACKSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306388, KEITH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306389, LAINE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306390, MCFALL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306393, MUWONGE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306395, PIRONE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306396, SHIMEK v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306397, VILLEGAS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306398, MIRANDA v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306399 MOSS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306400, HESTANDEVANS v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306410, DIETZ v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306411, Garcia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1400119. (DLB)
March 19, 2014 Filing 1697 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-225) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Clure v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N. D. Alabama, Case No. 2:14-00338, Consuelo Owens v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, C. D. California, Case No. 2:14:1619, Carter v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. California, Case No. 1:14-00246, Dulon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. California, Case No. 2:14-00527, Denmark v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:14-00263, Clark v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400161, Perry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400236, Patel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400237, Penn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400242, Phillips v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400243, Tate v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400266, Schultz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:14-00082, Borowski v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nevada, Case No. 2:1400301, Tallman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 5:1400239, Awan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1401268, Hummer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 5:1400456, Dall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1400182, Lee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Rhode Island, Case No. 1:1400113, Goetschius v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 1:14-00550, Ellison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 8:1400485, Morris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:1402157, Watkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1400166, Walderon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 1:1400194, Morrison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 1:1400226, Royal v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 1:1400232, McGowan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400059, MorelandLaw v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400305, Rasband v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400317, Lymangrover v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1405183, Ness v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1405184, Lamb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Wyoming, Case No. 2:1400044. (DJO)
March 13, 2014 Filing 1696 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-224) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Ellison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1405167, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00464-RWS, Falis v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., D. New Hampshire, Case No. 1:1400021, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00465-RWS, Loehr v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1400708, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00466-RWS, Loza v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400209, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00467-RWS. (DLB)
March 12, 2014 Filing 1695 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-224) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Loza v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400209, Falis v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., D. New Hampshire, Case No. 1:1400021, Loehr v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1400708, Ellison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1405167. (DLB)
March 6, 2014 Filing 1694 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-223) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel; Case transferred in: Stinnett v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:14-00513, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV00414 RWS. (DJO)
March 6, 2014 Filing 1693 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-223) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Stinnett v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:14- 00513. (DJO)
February 27, 2014 Filing 1692 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-222)regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Barnes v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1400103, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00354-RWS, Davis v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1400104, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00356-RWS, Rindahl v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1400105, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00355-RWS, Ward v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1303053, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00357-RWS, Justesen et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1400036, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00358-RWS, Johnson et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1303602, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00359-RWS, Brightwell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303329, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00360-RWS, Gonzalez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303039, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00361-RWS, Rice v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302529, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00362-RWS, Junt et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1304600, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00363-RWS, EVERITT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305627, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00364-RWS, JU v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1400558, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00365-RWS, VENTRESCO et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1400152, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00366-RWS, MANN et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1400151, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00367-RWS, WELLS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1307795, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00368-RWS, O'MALLON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1307645, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00369-RWS, ALBINO et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306503, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00370-RWS, ASHLAND v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306462, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00371-RWS, MONTGOMERY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306076, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00372-RWS, THOMAS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305445, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00373-RWS, MAYAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305438, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00374-RWS, BEAVANS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305433, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00375-RWS, Young v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:1302777, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00376-RWS, Watson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. West Virginia, Case No. 5:1403773, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00377-RWS, CRATTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1201122, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00379-RWS. (DLB)
February 26, 2014 Filing 1691 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-222) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Barnes v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1400103, Davis v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1400104, Rindahl v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1400105, Ward v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1303053, Rice v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302529, Gonzalez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303039, Brightwell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303329, CRATTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1201122, BEAVANS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305433, MAYAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305438, THOMAS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305445, EVERITT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305627, MONTGOMERY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306076, ASHLAND v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306462, ALBINO et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306503, O'MALLON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1307645, WELLS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1307795, MANN et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1400151, VENTRESCO et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1400152, JU v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1400558, Junt et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1304600, Young v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:1302777, Johnson et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1303602, Justesen et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1400036, Watson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. West Virginia, Case No. 5:1403773. (DLB)
February 25, 2014 Filing 1690 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-221)regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Zachodni v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400061, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV00339-RWS, Hall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400067, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV00340-RWS, Redmon et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Kentucky, Case No. 5:1400038, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV00341-RWS, STIEBEN v. ORGANON USA INC et al, D. Maine, Case No. 2:1400036, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV00342-RWS, Quinteros et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1400543, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV00343-RWS, Eric Ross v. Organon USA Inc et al, C. D. California, Case No. 8:1400142, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV00344-RWS. (DJO)
February 24, 2014 Filing 1689 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER w/ Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Cases transferred in: Ann Asche, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 4:13-04986, opened as EDMO Case No.4:14-cv-00326-RWS, Candy Garza, et al. v. Oreganon USA, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 3:13-04988, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00327-RWS. (DLB)
February 20, 2014 Filing 1688 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-221) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Eric Ross v. Organon USA Inc et al, C. D. California, Case No. 8:1400142, Quinteros et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1400543, Redmon et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Kentucky, Case No. 5:1400038, STIEBEN v. ORGANON USA INC et al, D. Maine, Case No. 2:1400036, STIEBEN v. ORGANON USA INC et al, D. Maine, Case No. 2:1400036, Zachodni v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400061, Hall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400067. (DJO)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1687 TRANSFER ORDER w/ Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Candy Garza, et al. v. Oreganon USA, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 3:13-04988 Ann Asche, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 4:13-04986 (DLB)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1686 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-220) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Edmunds v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1305072, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00268-RWS, Nienaber et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1306900, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00269-RWS Hord v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400260, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00270-RWS Waiting v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400284, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00271-RWS RYAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 1:1300965, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00272-RWS Knewtson v Organon USA Inc, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1303161, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00273-RWS Garrett v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400036, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00274-RWS DeShaw v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Wyoming, Case No. 1:1400020, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00275-RWS, LEACH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306367, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00294-RWS, WASHINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1400069, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00311-RWS, VERNON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1400070, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00312-RWS.. (DLB) Modified on 2/20/2014 (DLB).
February 13, 2014 Filing 1685 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-220) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. RYAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 1:1300965, Hord v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400260, Waiting v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400284, LEACH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306367, Edmunds v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1305072, Nienaber et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1306900, WASHINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1400069, VERNON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1400070, Knewtson v Organon USA Inc, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1303161, Garrett v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Washington, Case No. 2:1400036, DeShaw v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Wyoming, Case No. 1:1400020. (DLB)
February 11, 2014 Filing 1684 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-219) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: O'Leary v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400189, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV214 RWS, Crews v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1302256, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV215 RWS, Fields et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 2:1300826, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV216 RWS, Mathis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1400103, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV217 RWS, Kristina Kesterson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nevada, Case No. 3:1300428, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV218 RWS, NicholsonTait v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1306058, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV219 RWS, Russell v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 2:1400201 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV220 RWS, Orozco v. Organon USA Inc. et al, D. Delaware, Case No. 1:1400053, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV221 RWS, Jennifer Fletcher v. Organon USA Inc. et al, C. D. California, Case No. 2:1400409, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV222 RWS, AsanteAppiah v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1400339, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV223 RWS, Whitworth v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400065, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV234 RWS, Deleon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1400336, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV235 RWS, Taylor v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1303650, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV236 RWS. (DJO)
February 10, 2014 Filing 1683 TRANSCRIPT of #1682 (SETTLEMENT HEARING) held on 2/7/2014 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Shannon_White@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. (KMS)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1682 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status hearing announcing a tentative settlement agreement held on 2/7/2014. (Court Reporter:Shannon White.) (FTR Gold: No.) (KJS)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1681 ORDER formalizing the appointment of each of the co-lead counsel as members of the Negotiating Plaintiff Committee (NPC). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/7/14. (KJS)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1680 ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF RECORDS AND PRIMA FACIE EVIDENCE OF USAGE, INJURY AND CAUSATION REQUIREMENTS FOR PENDING CASES NOT PARTICIPATING IN THE NUVARING RESOLUTION PROGRAM AND NEWLY FILED OR TRANSFERRED CASES. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/7/14. (KJS)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1679 ORDER regarding Settlement Agreement and deadlines with Settlement Agreement attached as Exhibit A. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/7/14. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KJS)
February 5, 2014 Filing 1678 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-219) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Jennifer Fletcher v. Organon USA Inc. et al, C. D. California, Case No. 2:1400409, Orozco v. Organon USA Inc. et al, D. Delaware, Case No. 1:1400053, Fields et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 2:1300826, Mathis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1400103, Crews v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1302256, Deleon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1400336, AsanteAppiah v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1400339, Whitworth v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1400065, Taylor v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1303650, O'Leary v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1400189, Kristina Kesterson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nevada, Case No. 3:1300428, NicholsonTait v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1306058, Russell v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 2:1400201. (DJO)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1677 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on February 7, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callersoutside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 11:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 11:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/4/14. (ARL)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1676 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER OF JANUARY 29, 2014. (Supplemental Census of Claims) Further to Case Management Order of October 8, 2013 (Document #1636 )(Census of Claims), the Court, having discussed this issue with Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel/Executive Committee and Defendants' Lead Counsel and finding good cause shown, believes that in the management of this litigation as the transferee District, it is necessary to have a more accurate census of the cases as well as claims of putative plaintiffs, represented by Counsel with cases pending before this Court. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/29/14. (ARL)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1675 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1674 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff Jennifer Spence ;attorney/firm Kendall Law Group, LLP by Plaintiff Jennifer Spence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation of Consent to Withdrawal of Cousel)(Rudman, Jody) filed by Jennifer Spence ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/29/14. (ARL)
January 28, 2014 Filing 1674 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff Jennifer Spence ;attorney/firm Kendall Law Group, LLP by Plaintiff Jennifer Spence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Consent to Withdrawal of Cousel)(Rudman, Jody)
January 24, 2014 Filing 1673 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-218) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Cusano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 5:1301466, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00140-RWS. (DLB)
January 23, 2014 Filing 1672 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-218) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Cusano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 5:1301466. (DLB)
January 23, 2014 Filing 1671 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-217) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Beauregard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400059, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV126 RWS, Wilson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400060, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV127 RWS, Eggebrecht v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400065, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV128 RWS, Edie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400066, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV129 RWS, Messman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400068, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV130 RWS, Embrey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400069, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV132 RWS, Ago v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400073, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV133 RWS, Gage v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400074, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV134 RWS, Lowe et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case Number 3:1400025, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV131 RWS. (DJO)
January 23, 2014 Filing 1670 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-216) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Flore et al v. McKesson Corporation et al, N. California, Case No. 3:1305939, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV120 RWS, Bly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N. Ohio, Case No. 1:1302740, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV121 RWS, Harris-Moten v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300325, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV122 RWS, Frisbie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300326, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV123 RWS, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300327, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14CV124 RWS, Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300328, opened as EDMO Case No 4:14CV125 RWS. (DJO)
January 22, 2014 Filing 1669 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-217) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Beauregard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400059, Wilson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400060, Eggebrecht v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400065, Edie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400066, Messman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400068, Embrey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400069, Ago v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400073, Gage v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case Number 0:1400074, Lowe et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case Number 3:1400025. (DJO)
January 16, 2014 Filing 1668 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-216) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Flore et al v. McKesson Corporation et al, N. California, Case No. 3:1305939, Bly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N. Ohio, Case No. 1:1302740, HarrisMoten v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300325, Frisbie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300326, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300327, Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. Ohio, Case No. 3:1300328. (DJO)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1667 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference set on January 16, 2014 is cancelled and will be reset at a later date. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/13/14. (ARL)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1666 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that adversarial litigation in these cases, including all discovery, motions, hearings on motions, and rulings related to any of these cases, shall be held in abeyance until May 31, 2014.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/9/14. (LGK)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1665 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the trial setting in this matter is vacated. The trial will be reset at a later date.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/9/14. (LGK)
December 31, 2013 Filing 1664 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-215) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Schraff v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 0:1362382, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02590-RWS, Borkholder v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302989, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02593-RWS, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303041, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02594-RWS, Freeman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303327, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02595-RWS, Daughenbaugh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303330, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02596-RWS, De La Vega v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303344, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02597-RWS, Brown v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303409, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02598-RWS, Corbin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:130341, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02599-RWS, Crawford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303411, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02600-RWS, Jentz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303413, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02601-RWS, TAYLOR v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305966, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02602-RWS, NELSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306301, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02603-RWS, SPENCER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306304, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02604-RWS, AVERY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306310, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02605-RWS, BENYA v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306311, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02606-RWS, CHARLEY v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306312, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02607-RWS, COLMORE JOYNER v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306314, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02608-RWS, KEMP v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306319, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02609-RWS, KUHN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306321, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02610-RWS, LAFOND v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306322, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02611-RWS, LIBERTINI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306324, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02612-RWS, PARTHMER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306325, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02613-RWS, REYNA v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306326, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02614-RWS, ROBINSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306327, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02615-RWS, STEVENS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306328, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02616-RWS, WASHINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306329, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02617-RWS, GOEHRING et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306330, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02618-RWS, TISINGER et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306331, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02619-RWS, CRANDALL et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306332, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02620-RWS, CLEMENTS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306333, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02621-RWS, SIMS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306334, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02622-RWS, MATCHETT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306795, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02623-RWS, Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1303933, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02624-RWS, Binder v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1304202, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02625-RWS, Morin v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1304205, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02627-RWS, JamesJohnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1301975, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02628-RWS, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, S.D. West Virginia, Case No. 6:1328891, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00002-RWS, Shea v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Louisiana, Case No. 6:1302411, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00003-RWS, Holly Anderson et al v. McKesson Corporation et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1309155, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:14-cv-00009-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 1/2/2014 (DLB). Modified on 1/3/2014 (DLB).
December 30, 2013 Filing 1663 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-215) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Holly Anderson et al v. McKesson Corporation et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1309155, Schraff v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 0:1362382, Shea v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Louisiana, Case No. 6:1302411, Borkholder v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302989, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303041, Freeman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303327, Daughenbaugh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303330, De La Vega v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303344, Brown v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303409, Corbin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:130341, Crawford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303411, Jentz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303413, TAYLOR v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305966, NELSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306301 SPENCER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306304, AVERY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306310, BENYA v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306311, CHARLEY v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306312, COLMORE JOYNER v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306314, KEMP v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306319, KUHN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306321, LAFOND v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306322, LIBERTINI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306324, PARTHMER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306325, REYNA v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306326, ROBINSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306327, STEVENS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306328, WASHINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306329, GOEHRING et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306330, TISINGER et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306331, CRANDALL et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306332, CLEMENTS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306333, SIMS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306334, MATCHETT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306795, Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1303933, Binder v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1304202, Morin v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1304205, JamesJohnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1301975, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, S.D. West Virginia, Case No. 6:1328891. (DLB)
December 20, 2013 Filing 1662 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-214) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Garcia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al. D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1303229, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02551-RWS, Rhofiry v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302091, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02552-RWS, Gauquie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303325, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02553-RWS, Bone v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303328, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02554-RWS, Morris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1306566, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02555-RWS, Yvonne Terry v. Organon USA Inc et al, C. D. California, Case No. 5:1302160, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02556-RWS, Bandel v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 6:1301449, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02558-RWS, Ramos v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 9:1381214, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02589-RWS. Gunter v. Organon USA, Inc. et al. E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1300659, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02635-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 12/22/2013 (DLB). Modified on 12/31/2013 (DLB).
December 19, 2013 Filing 1661 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-214) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Yvonne Terry v. Organon USA Inc et al, C. D. California, Case No. 5:1302160, Garcia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al. D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1303229 Ramos v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 9:1381214, Bandel v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 6:1301449, Rhofiry v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302091, Gauquie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303325, Bone v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0 1303328, Morris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1306566, Gunter v. Organon USA, Inc. et al. E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1300659. (DJO)
December 16, 2013 Filing 1660 CERTIFIED ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO (CTO-212) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Merchant v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N. D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-05179, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02502-RWS. (DLB)
December 16, 2013 Filing 1659 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER w/ Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Laura Reyes, et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-3428, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2495 RWS, Ovion Starnisha Anderson, et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-3599, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2496 RWS, Heather Carlena Bennett, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13- 3606, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2497 RWS. (DJO)
December 13, 2013 Filing 1658 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Laura Reyes, et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-3428, Ovion Starnisha Anderson, et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-3599, Heather Carlena Bennett, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13- 3606. (DJO)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1657 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CTO (CTO-212) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Merchant v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N. D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-05179. (DLB)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1656 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-213) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Vresko v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303072, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02473-RWS Wallace v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303186, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02474-RWS Scarcelli v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303187, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02475-RWS LAROCQUE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306009, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02476-RWS HOOKS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306011, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02477-RWS MOSES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306012, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02478-RWS, O'Donnell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1300537, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02479-RWS, Field et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. California, Case No. 5:305414, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02491-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 12/13/2013 (DLB).
December 11, 2013 Filing 1655 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-213) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Field et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. California, Case No. 5:305414, O'Donnell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1300537, Vresko v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303072, Wallace v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303186, Scarcelli v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1303187, LAROCQUE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306009, HOOKS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1306011, MOSES v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:13 (DLB)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1654 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-211) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Brown v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N. California, 4:13-5141, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2346 RWS, BROOKS v. ORGANON USA INC et al, M. Georgia, 3:1300098, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2345 RWS, Mayo v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N. Georgia, 1:1303307, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2373 RWS,Wilson v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302518, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2347 RWS, Villalobos v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302519, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2348 RWS, Tassell v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302521, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2349 RWS, Klotz v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302538, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2350 RWS, Green v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302539, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2351 RWS, Elliot v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302541, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2352 RWS, Gray v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302631, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2353 RWS, Ray v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302645, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2354 RWS, Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302659, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2355 RWS, Martinez v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302669, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2356 RWS, Sawyers v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302671, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2359 RWS, Kattinge v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302961, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2360 RWS, Taylor v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1303036, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2362 RWS, Gale v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1303038, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2363 RWS, Gurdo v. Organon USA, Inc. et al D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1303040, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2364 RWS, STURGEON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1303906, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2367 RWS, WILLIAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1304176, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2368 RWS, WILHELMI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1304181, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2369 RWS, BRANCH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1305347, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2370 RWS, LEWIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1305685, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2371 RWS, BUCHANAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1306001, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2372 RWS, Banks v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1-1303932, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2344 RWS, Saravia v. Organon USA, Inc., et al E.D. New York, Case No. 1-1305527, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2342 RWS, Chandler v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1301969, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2366 RWS, Cherie NoelRoberts v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texsas, Case No. 3-1303643, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2357 RWS, Ellis v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304203, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2358 RWS, Hodges v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304206, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2361 RWS, Kirby v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304207, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2365 RWS, McDaniel v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304208, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2387 RWS, Hall et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4-1302806, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2342 RWS, Sanders v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302411, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2383 RWS, Cooper v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2-1300560, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2411 RWS. (DJO)
November 21, 2013 Filing 1653 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-211) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; Brown v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 4:1305141, BROOKS v. ORGANON USA INC et al, M. Georgia, Case No. 3:1300098, Mayo v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N. Georgia, Case No. 1:1303307, Sanders v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302411, Wilson v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302518, MN Villalobos v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302519, Tassell v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota Case No. 0-1302521, Klotz v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302538, Green v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302539, Elliot v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302541, Gray v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302631, Ray v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302645, Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302659, Martinez v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302669, Sawyers v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302671, Kattinge v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1302961, Taylor v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1303036, Gale v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1303038, Gurdo v. Organon USA, Inc. et al D. Minnesota, Case No. 0-1303040, STURGEON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1303906, WILLIAMS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1304176, WILHELMI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1304181, BRANCH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1305347, LEWIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1305685, BUCHANAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2-1306001, Banks v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1-1303932, Saravia v. Organon USA, Inc., et al E.D. New York, Case No. 1-1305527, Chandler v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1301969, Cherie NoelRoberts v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texsas, Case No. 3-1303643, Ellis v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304203, Hodges v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304206, Kirby v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304207, McDaniel v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3-1304208, Hall et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4-1302806, Cooper v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2-1300560. (DJO)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1652 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE in case 4:10CV683 RWS. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/19/13. (ARL)
November 14, 2013 Filing 1651 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-210) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc et al, E.D. North Carolina, Case No. 5:1300700, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02262-RWS, McGuire v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 1:1301596, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02263-RWS, Perry v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301711, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02264-RWS, Szopa v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302918, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02265-RWS, Hoch v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302921, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02266-RWS, Hinkley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302938, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02267-RWS, Perkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301028, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02268-RWS, Crow v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302946, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02269-RWS, Gaskins v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302950, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02270-RWS, Jones v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302960, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02271-RWS, Stachow v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1301673, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02272-RWS, Spence v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302962, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02273-RWS, Richards v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302986, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02274-RWS, Brawn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302988, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02275-RWS, Ellis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302990, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02276-RWS, Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302992, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02277-RWS, Para v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301029, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02279-RWS, Sutton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301030, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02280-RWS, Bright v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301035, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02281-RWS, East v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301036, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02282-RWS, Evans v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301037, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02283-RWS, Edwards v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301038, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02284-RWS, Peterman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301039, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02286-RWS, Flowers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301040, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02285-RWS, Wolff v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301041, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02287-RWS, Self v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301044, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02288-RWS, Bradley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301045, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02291-RWS, Nevins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301046, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02289-RWS, Hamm v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301047, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02292-RWS, Milk v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nevada, Case No. 2:1301886, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02302-RWS, Patterson v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302927, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02317-RWS, Bain v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1302908, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02318-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 11/18/2013 (DLB).
November 13, 2013 Filing 1650 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-210) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964: Stachow v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1301673, McGuire v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 1:1301596, Patterson v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302927, Bain v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1302908, Perry v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301711, Szopa v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302918, Hoch v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302921, Hinkley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302938, Crow v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302946, Gaskins v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302950, Jones v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302960, Spence v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302962, Richards v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302986, Brawn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302988, Ellis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302990, Sanchez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302992, Perkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301028, Para v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301029, Sutton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301030, Bright v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301035, East v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301036, Evans v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301037 Edwards v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301038, Peterman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301039, Flowers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301040, Wolff v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301041, Self v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301044, Bradley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301045, Nevins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301046, Hamm v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1301047, Milk v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nevada, Case No. 2:1301886, Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc et al, E.D. North Carolina, Case No. 5:1300700. (DLB)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1649 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-209) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Samuel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1300589 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02245-RWS.(DLB)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1648 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-209) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964; Samuel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al. N.C. Western Case No. 3:1300589. (DJO)
October 30, 2013 Filing 1647 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-208) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Nelson v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302513, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2172 RWS Tailey v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302522, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2173 RWS Stephens v. Merck & Co, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302523, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2174 RWS Shupe v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302524, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2175 RWS Peiffer v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302534, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2176 RWS Shanette v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302540, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2177 RWS Cortez v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302543, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2178 RWS Boiadjian v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302544, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2179 RWS Moreland v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302660, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2180 RWS Archer v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302670, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2181 RWS Santos v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302673, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2182 RWS Carver v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302723, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2183 RWS Myers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302818, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2184 RWS Giroux v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302826, open as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2185 RWS Hammond v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 2:1300721, opened as EDMO Case No. . 4:13CV2188 RWS McGirr et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Kentucky, Case No. 5:1300346, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2189 RWS, Lienert v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W. D. New York, Case No. 1:1301047. opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2198 RWS. (DJO)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1646 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-208) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Hammond v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 2:1300721, McGirr et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Kentucky, Case No. 5:1300346, Nelson v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302513, Tailey v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302522, Stephens v. Merck &Co, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302523, Shupe v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302524, Peiffer v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302534, Shanette v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302540, Cortez v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302543, Boiadjian v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302544, Moreland v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302660, Archer v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302670, Santos v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302673, Carver v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302723, Myers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302818, Giroux v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302826, Lienert v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W. D. New York, Case No. 1:1301047. (DJO)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1645 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-207) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in:Priest v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 4:1200311, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2136 RWSHascall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1300414, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2137 RWSHudgins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302724, opened as EDMO Case No.4:13CV2138 RWS Reigner v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302725, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2139 RWSVigil v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302726, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2140 RWSPitchell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302788, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2141 RWSBurgos v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302789, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2142 RWSStewart v. Merck &Co, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302790, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2143 RWSSARGENT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305144, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2133 RWSEralie et al v. Organon Biosciences NV et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1302359, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13CV2134 RWSMiles v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 3:1300536, opened as EDMO Case No.. 4:13CV2135 RWS (DJO)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1644 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re (69 in 4:08-cv-00558-RWS) Order,,,, (1637 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS) Order,,,, by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:08-cv-00558-RWS(Geist, Melissa)
October 23, 2013 Filing 1643 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-207) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Priest v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 4:1200311, Hascall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1300414, Hudgins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302724, Reigner v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302725, Vigil v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302726, Pitchell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302788, Burgos v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302789, Stewart v. Merck &Co, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302790, SARGENT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305144, Eralie et al v. Organon Biosciences NV et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1302359, Miles v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Virginia, Case No. 3:1300536. (DJO)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1642 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Arce, et al. v. Organon USA Inc. et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-04218 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02095-RWS. (DLB)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1641 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE DECEMBER 5, 2013, HEARING SESSION ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1640 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Ellen Wright for Plaintiff Tonya Abete. (Wright, Mary)
October 10, 2013 Filing 1639 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-206) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Kelly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 3:1300512, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02016-RWS, Bullock v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1302051, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02017-RWS, Baker v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1302050, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02018-RWS, Moffitt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302675, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02020-RWS, McNamara v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302674, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02021-RWS, Cartmille v. Organon USA,Inc., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302672, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02022-RWS, Wright v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302668, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02023-RWS, O'Brien v. Organon USA, Inc., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302667, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02024-RWS, Luvano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302662, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02025-RWS, Daisey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302658, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02026-RWS, Hawkins v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302644, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02027-RWS, Miller v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302632, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02028-RWS, Larson v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302566, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02030-RWS, MASSEY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1304617, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02031-RWS, Stillion v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 6:1301414, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02032-RWS, Buckholtz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 6:1301413, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02033-RWS, Brigman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W. D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1300424, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02034-RWS, Frazier v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nebraska, Case No. 8:1300301, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02035-RWS, MORETTI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. DL No.2:1305184, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02036-RWS, Kahn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 7:1305573, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02037-RWS, Caro v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1305576, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02038-RWS, Rivera v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1305574, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02039-RWS, CarolloWeber v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:1302109, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02040-RWS, Heebsh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1301717, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02041-RWS, Rose v. Organon USA Inc. et al (TV3), E.D. Tennessee, Case No. 3:1300488, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02052-RWS, Brooks v. Organon USA, Inc. et al (TV1), E.D. Tennessee, Case No. 3:1300489, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02053-RWS, Murry v. Organon Pharmaceutical U S A Inc et al, W.D. Louisiana, Case No. 3:1302424, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02054-RWS, Bailey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302412, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02055-RWS, Eleazer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 2:1304564, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02056-RWS, Ernst v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1300633, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02057-RWS, Burton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Massachusetts, Case No. 1:1311919, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02058-RWS, Cooke v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1300450, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02073-RWS, Sweats v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1300451, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-02074-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 10/11/2013 (DLB). Modified on 10/15/2013 (DLB).
October 9, 2013 Filing 1638 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-206) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Baker v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1302050, Bullock v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1302051, Murry v. Organon Pharmaceutical U S A Inc et al, W.D. Louisiana, Case No. 3:1302424, Bailey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302412, Burton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Massachusetts, Case No. 1:1311919, Larson v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302566, Miller v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302632, Hawkins v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302644, Daisey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302658, Luvano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302662, O'Brien v. Organon USA, Inc., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302667, Wright v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302668, Cartmille v. Organon USA,Inc., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302672, McNamara v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302674, Moffitt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302675, Frazier v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Nebraska, Case No. 8:1300301, MORETTI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. DL No.2:1305184, Eleazer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 2:1304564, Rivera v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1305574, Caro v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1305576, Kahn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 7:1305573, Brigman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W. D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1300424, Heebsh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1301717, Buckholtz v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 6:1301413, Stillion v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 6:1301414, MASSEY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1304617, CarolloWeber v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:1302109, Rose v. Organon USA Inc. et al (TV3), E.D. Tennessee, Case No. 3:1300488, Brooks v. Organon USA, Inc. et al (TV1), E.D. Tennessee, Case No. 3:1300489, Ernst v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1300633, Cooke v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1300450, Sweats v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1300451, Kelly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 3:1300512. (DLB)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1637 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that adversarial litigation in these cases, including all discovery, motions, hearings on motions, and rulings related to any of these cases, shall be held in abeyance until December 31, 2013.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case management conference set on November 6, 2013 is reset and will now be held on January 16, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial date in Prather v. Organon, 4:08 CV 558 RWS, and all of the pre-trial deadlines related to that case are VACATED. The trial in Prather is reset and will now be held on April 7, 2014 at 9:00 a.m.. The final pre-trial conference in this case and a hearing of all motions in limine will be held on March 26-27, 2014 starting each day at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a proposed schedule for the submission of deposition designations, witness and exhibit lists, motions in limine, jury instructions, and other pre-trial submissions no later than October 25, 2013. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/8/13. (ARL)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1636 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER of October 8, 2013 (Census of Claims). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/8/13. (LGK)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1635 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER w/ Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases tranferred in: Desirae Buyak, et al. v. Organon USA Inc., et al., C.A. No. 3:13-03128, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01967-RWS, Talaya Clarke, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 4:13-02290, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01968-RWS. (DJO)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1634 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Desirae Buyak, et al. v. Organon USA Inc., et al., N.D. California Case No. 3:13-03128, Talaya Clarke, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California Case No. 4:13-02290. (DLB)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1633 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-205) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Kolb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302558, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01941-RWSGray v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302547, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01942-RWS Ernat v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302546, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01943-RWS Bloxsom v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302545, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01944-RWS De La Rosa v. Organon USA, Inc., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302542, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01945-RWS LukacsNagy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No.0:1302535, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01946-RWS, Phillips v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302532, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01947-RWS, Ross v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302527, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01948-RWS, Scarpa v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No.0:1302525, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01949-RWS, Bruns v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302516, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01950-RWS, Todd v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302412, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01951-RWS, Beilke v. Organon USA, Inc. et al. W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300888, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01952-RWS, COURSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305515, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01955-RWS, LY et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305516, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01954-RWS, HEISEY et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305521 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01953-RWS, Beasley et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 4:1304178, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01966-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 10/2/2013 (DJO).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1632 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-205) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Beasley et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 4:1304178, Todd v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302412, Bruns v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302516, Scarpa v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No.0:1302525, Ross v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302527, Phillips v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302532, LukacsNagy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No.0:1302535, De La Rosa v. Organon USA, Inc., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302542, Bloxsom v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302545, Ernat v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302546, Gray v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302547, Kolb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302558, Beilke v. Organon USA, Inc. et al. W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300888, COURSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305515,LY et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305516,HEISEY et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1305521. (DJO)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1631 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1630 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Request To Terminate CM/ECF Notices For Attorney James R. Kimmey ;attorney/firm James R. Kimmey by Plaintiff Tamara Willis. (Kimmey, James) filed by Tamara Willis - GRANTED Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/1/13. (LAH)
September 30, 2013 Filing 1630 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Request To Terminate CM/ECF Notices For Attorney James R. Kimmey ;attorney/firm James R. Kimmey by Plaintiff Tamara Willis. (Kimmey, James)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1629 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-204) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302039, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01854-RWS, Norwood v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302169, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01855-RWS, Wilkins v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302211, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01856-RWS, Niesen v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302244, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01857-RWS, Chambers v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302319, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01858-RWS, Coleman v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302320, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01859-RWS, Johnson v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302323, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01860-RWS Renkoski v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302324, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01861-RWS, WoodHess v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302422, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01862-RWS,, Golightly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302460, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01863-RWS Nalu v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1301380, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01864-RWS, HARMON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302839, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01865-RWS, LIND v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302935, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01866-RWS, WILKINSON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303013, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01867-RWS, LEICHT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303054, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01868-RWS, THOMPSON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303286, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01869-RWS, MORRELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303385, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01870-RWS, MACCIOLI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304406, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01871-RWS, DAVIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304493, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01872-RWS, JOSEY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304587, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01873-RWS, Achon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1301371, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01874-RWS, PENA v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304611, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01875-RWS,LEWIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304737, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01876-RWS, Pryor v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1300425, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01879-RWS, Bergelt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1301834, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01885-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 9/23/2013 (DLB).
September 19, 2013 Filing 1628 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-204) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Nalu v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 7:1301380, Achon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1301371, Bergelt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1301834, Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302039, Norwood v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302169, Wilkins v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302211, Niesen v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302244, Chambers v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302319, Coleman v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302320, Johnson v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302323, Renkoski v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302324, WoodHess v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302422, Golightly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302460, HARMON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302839, LIND v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302935, WILKINSON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303013, LEICHT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303054, THOMPSON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303286, MORRELL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303385, MACCIOLI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304406, DAVIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304493, JOSEY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304587, PENA v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304611, LEWIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304737, Pryor v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1300425. (DLB)
September 17, 2013 Filing 1627 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-203) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Nowicki v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300936, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01830-RWS, Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Rhode Island, Case No. 1:1300602, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01831-RWS, Mack v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1305901, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01832-RWS. (DLB)
September 17, 2013 Filing 1626 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-203) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Mack v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1305901,Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Rhode Island, Case No. 1:1300602,Nowicki v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300936. (DLB)
September 13, 2013 Filing 1625 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-202) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: BARHAM v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1300717, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01800-RWS, Denton v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300914, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01801-RWS, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. D. Texas, Case No. 4:1302281, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01802-RWS, Perkins v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300461, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01803-RWS, Clarke v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:302321, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01804-RWS, Lavey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302322, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01805-RWS, Huntsinger v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Arkansas, Case No. 5:1305173, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01806-RWS, Muhammad v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1303887, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01807-RWS, West v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1300632, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01808-RWS, SUTTONTORRES et al v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304626, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01809-RWS, Evans v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 6:1300245, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01810-RWS, Macklin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1305472, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01811-RWS, Snorton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300763, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01812-RWS, Luera v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 3:300247, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01822-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 9/16/2013 (DLB).
September 11, 2013 Filing 1624 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-202) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Huntsinger v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Arkansas, Case No. 5:1305173, Muhammad v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1303887, Macklin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1305472, Snorton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300763, Perkins v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300461, Clarke v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:302321, Lavey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302322, SUTTONTORRES et al v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304626, BARHAM v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1300717, West v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1300632, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S. D. Texas, Case No. 4:1302281, Luera v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 3:300247, Evans v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 6:1300245, Denton v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300914. (DLB)
September 6, 2013 Filing 1623 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-201) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Starkey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302213, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01751-RWS Butler v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302215, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01752-RWS Roberts v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302287, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01753-RWS Harris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300819, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01754-RWS.Navarrette v. Oragon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1301199, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01755-RWS. (DLB)
September 5, 2013 Filing 1622 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-201) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. - Navarrette v. Oragon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1301199, Starkey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302213, Butler v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302215, Roberts v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302287, Harris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300819. (DLB)
September 3, 2013 Filing 1621 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-200) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Williams v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 4:1302189, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01719-RWS, Kempf v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. California, Case No. 1:1301238, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01720-RWS, Margaret Gonzalez v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305767, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01721-RWS, Margaret Gonzalez v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305767, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01721-RWS, Kinney v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 9:1380703, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01722-RWS, Marcia Barnes v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305761, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01723-RWS, Donica Doroski v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305763, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01724-RWS, Arturo Iturbe v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305759, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01725-RWS, Carbaugh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 6:1301412, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01726-RWS, Christine Esparza v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 8:1301203, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01727-RWS, Heppler v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302212, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01728-RWS, CUMMINS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303064, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01729-RWS, GERST v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303065, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01730-RWS, STEWART v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303069, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01731-RWS, Collier v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Massachusetts, Case No. 1:1311923, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01732-RWS, Suzan McFadden v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305756, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01734-RWS, Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1303680, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01744-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 9/4/2013 (DLB).
August 29, 2013 Filing 1620 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-200) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Suzan McFadden v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305756, Arturo Iturbe v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305759, Marcia Barnes v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305761, Donica Doroski v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305763, Margaret Gonzalez v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305767, Christine Esparza v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 8:1301203, Kempf v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. California, Case No. 1:1301238, Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1303680, Kinney v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 9:1380703, Collier v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Massachusetts, Case No. 1:1311923, Heppler v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302212, CUMMINS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303064, GERST v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303065, STEWART v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303069, Carbaugh v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 6:1301412, Williams v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 4:1302189(DLB) (Main Document 1620 replaced on 8/29/2013) (DLB).
August 23, 2013 Filing 1619 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-199) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Robinson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300816, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01665-RWS, Blum v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302333, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01666-RWS, Spencer et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1303604, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01667-RWS, LAWSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. Carolina, Case No. 1:1300650, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01685-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 8/27/2013 (DLB).
August 22, 2013 Filing 1618 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-199) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Spencer et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1303604, Blum v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 1:1302333, LAWSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, M.D. Carolina, Case No. 1:1300650, Robinson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300816.(DLB)
August 19, 2013 Filing 1617 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-198) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: CANNON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303678, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01613-RWS, DEMUTH et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304189, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01614-RWS, BAGSBY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304195, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01615-RWS Gessner et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 1:1300754, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01616-RWS, Crawford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois Case No. 3:1300555, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01618-RWS, VanPatten v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1302552, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01619-RWS, Amado Perez et al v. Merck and Company, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305556, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01620-RWS, Crawford v. Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1304707, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01621-RWS, Carroll v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301669, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01622-RWS, Mericle v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301871, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01623-RWS, Vargas v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302017, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01624-RWS, Roe v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302020, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01625-RWS, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302038, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01626-RWS, Stanton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302040, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01627-RWS, Howe v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302075, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01628-RWSBroadway v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 5:1300497, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01629-RWS, Moore v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1300170, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01632-RWS, Powell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1300377, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01633-RWS, Walton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300052, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01645-RWS, Quinones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1300538, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01648-RWS, Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1301886, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01649-RWS.(DLB)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 ORDER re 4:08CV558 RWS. Jury Trial set for 1/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Please see Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/19/13. (ARL)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1615 ORDER REINSTATING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panels conditional transfer order designated as CTO-198 filed on August 8, 2013, is REINSTATED insofar as it relates to this action. Anderson, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-03599 (DLB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2013: #1 Corrected Conditional Transfer Order) (DLB).
August 16, 2013 Filing 1614 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-198) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Amado Perez et al v. Merck and Company, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1305556, Anderson et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1303599, Quinones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1300538, Richardson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1301886, Walton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300052, Crawford v. Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 1:1304707, Crawford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois Case No. 3:1300555, Carroll v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301669, Mericle v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301871, Vargas v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302017, Roe v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302020, Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302038, Stanton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302040, Howe v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302075, CANNON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303678, DEMUTH et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304189, BAGSBY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1304195, Moore v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 1:1300170, Powell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. North Carolina, Case No. 3:1300377, Broadway v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 5:1300497, VanPatten v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1302552, Gessner et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 1:13(DLB)
August 15, 2013 Filing 1613 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1606 Scheduling Order,,,, by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
August 8, 2013 Filing 1612 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-197) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Howse v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301965, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01536-RWS. Farman v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301974, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01537-RWS. Peka v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302016, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01538-RWS. Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302018, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01539-RWS. Urban v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300724, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01540-RWS. (DLB)
August 8, 2013 Filing 1611 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-197) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Miller v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Alabama, Case No. 1:1300525, Stephanie Zdumkiewcz v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1304784, Reyes et al v. Organon USA, Inc., N.D. California, Case No. 4:1303428, Howse v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301965, Farman v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301974, Peka v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302016, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1302018, Urban v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300724. (DLB)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1610 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Juanita Burton v. Organon USA Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-01535, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01522-RWS, Nikole Grove, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-02138, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01523-RWS, Amy Wiltsey, et al. v. Organon USA Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-02144, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01524-RWS. (DLB)
August 6, 2013 Filing 1609 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. w/Schedule A attached. Nikole Grove, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-02138, Amy Wiltsey, et al. v. Organon USA Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-02144, Juanita Burton v. Organon USA Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-01535. (DLB)
August 1, 2013 Filing 1608 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-196) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: JUNIOR v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303904, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01495-RWS, Beery v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300657, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01496-RWS, Mayes v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300658, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01497-RWS, Franklin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia Case No. 1:1302199, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01498-RWS,Barham v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 3:1300402, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01499-RWS, PROBO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1300836, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01500-RWS.(DLB)
July 31, 2013 Filing 1607 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-196) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Franklin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia Case No. 1:1302199, Beery v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300657, Mayes v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300658, JUNIOR v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, New Jersey, Case No. 2:1303904, PROBO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1300836, Barham v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 3:1300402. (DLB)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1606 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that adversarial litigation in these cases, including all discovery, motions, hearings on motions, and rulings in any of these cases, shall be held in abeyance until October 21, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case management conference set on August 5, 2013 is reset and will now be held on November 6, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial date in Prather v. Organon, 4:08 CV 558 RWS, and all of the pre-trial deadlines related to that case are VACATED. The trial in Prather is reset and will now be held on January 27, 2014. The final pre-trial conference in this case and a hearing of all motions in limine will be held on January 14-15, 2014 starting each day at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a proposed schedule for the submission of deposition designations, witness and exhibit lists, motions in limine, jury instructions, and other pre- trial submissions no later than August 16, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are ordered to maintain regular and frequent contact with the mediator who will report the status of any negotiations to the Court.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/30/13. (LGK)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1605 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1604 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Hartnett Gladney Hetterman, L.L.C./James R. Kimmey by Plaintiff Tamara Willis. (Kimmey, James) filed by Tamara Willis ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/30/13. (LGK)
July 29, 2013 Filing 1604 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Hartnett Gladney Hetterman, L.L.C./James R. Kimmey by Plaintiff Tamara Willis. (Kimmey, James)
July 23, 2013 Filing 1603 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-195) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Case transferred in: Cruz v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301713, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01433-RWS. (DLB)
July 23, 2013 Filing 1602 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-195) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Cruz v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301713. (DLB)
July 19, 2013 Filing 1601 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-194) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: LINDLE v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1301031, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01373-RWS, ANGEL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1301120, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01374-RWS, BARRETT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1301309, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01375-RWS, ORMSBY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1303060, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01376-RWS, BRANDON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1303061, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01377-RWS, Schey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1: 1302084, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01378-RWS, Freymiller v. Organon USA, Inc., S.D. Texas, Case No. 4: 1301609, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01379-RWS,Towb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300527, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01380-RWS, Martin v. Organon USA,Inc, et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:301639, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01381-RWS, Frazier v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300462, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01382-RWS, Newton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300840, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01383-RWS, McCarty v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300959, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01384-RWS, Faircloth v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300961, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01385-RWS, Perry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301193, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01386-RWS, Haff v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301262, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01387-RWS, Crawley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301263, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01388-RWS, Colon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301264, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01389-RWS, Carter v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301267, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01390-RWS, Gray v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:301272, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01391-RWS, Mize v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301273, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01392-RWS, Hunt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301275, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01393-RWS, Knight v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301282, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01394-RWS, Donohue v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301283, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01395-RWS, Hallman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301284, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01396-RWS, Winston v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301285, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01397-RWS, Licitra v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301302, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01398-RWS, Gardin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301385, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01399-RWS, Gray v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301714, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01400-RWS, CARTER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 2:1300216, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01401-RWS. (DLB)
July 16, 2013 Filing 1600 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-194) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Martin v. Organon USA,Inc, et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:301639, Towb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300527, CARTER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 2:1300216, Frazier v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300462, Newton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300840, McCarty v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300959, Faircloth v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300961, Perry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301193, Haff v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301262, Crawley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301263, Colon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301264, Carter v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301267, Gray v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:301272, Mize v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301273, Hunt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301275, Knight v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301282, Donohue v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301283, Hallman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301284, Winston v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301285, Licitra v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301302, Gardin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0: 1301385, Gray v. Organon USA, Inc. et al., D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301714, LINDLE v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1301031, ANGEL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1301120, BARRETT v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1301309, ORMSBY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1303060, BRANDON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1303061, Schey v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1: 1302084, Freymiller v. Organon USA, Inc., S.D. Texas, Case No. 4: 1301609. (DLB)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1599 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: (4:08cv558RWS) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Organon's motion for summary judgment directed to plaintiff's punitive damages claim (Doc. #24 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/12/13. (ARL)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1598 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: (4:08cv558RWS) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Organon's motion for summary judgment Doc. #30 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Organons motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, as to Counts I (Strict Products LiabilityDefective Manufacturing) and as to the portions of Count VIII (Negligence) of Prathers Amended Complaint that address defective manufacturing, and GRANTED as to Count XI (Successor Liability Against Defendant Merck) of Prather's Amended Complaint, as it applies to those derivative claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Organon's motion for summary judgment is DENIED as to Counts II, III, IV, V, VII, VIII, IX, X, and XI. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/12/13. (ARL)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1597 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1593 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Keisha Beatty-Barnes. (Kraft, Kristine) filed by Diane M. Agresta, Keisha Beatty-Barnes, AMBER BOCK ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/12/13. (LGK)
July 12, 2013 Filing 1596 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1575 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority In Support Of Pending Summary Judgment Motions filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Keisha Beatty-Barnes. (Kraft, Kristine)
July 11, 2013 Filing 1595 TRANSFER ORDER (received 7/9/2013) with Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. Cases transferred in: Amber J. Wilson, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-00705, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01321-RWS, Brandi Tucker, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-00728, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01322-RWS, Anna Acquaviva, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:13-01035, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01323-RWS, Sandra Kathleen Caesar, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California,C.A. No. 2:13-01149, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01324-RWS, Michelle Shanaya Benson, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:13-01195, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01327-RWS. (DLB)
July 11, 2013 Filing 1594 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-193) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Tune v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Mississippi, Case No. 4:1300083, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01306-RWS Morrissey v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301496, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01307-RWS Carlucci v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301497, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01308-RWS Barry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301503, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01309-RWS Suggs v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301504, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01311-RWS Edson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301505, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01312-RWS Adebanjo v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301668, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01313-RWS Barron v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301670, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01314-RWS Wambaja v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301700, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01315-RWS GOODMAN v. ORGANON USA INC et al, M.D. Georgia, Case No. 5:1300041, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01317-RWS DicksonThrall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Idaho, Case No. 2:1300225, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01318-RWS August v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301481, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01319-RWS Polansky v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1303448, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01320-RWS Voshell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 3:1300989, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01332-RWS. (DLB)
July 11, 2013 Filing 1593 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Keisha Beatty-Barnes. (Kraft, Kristine)
July 10, 2013 Filing 1592 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-193) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. GOODMAN v. ORGANON USA INC et al, M.D. Georgia, Case No. 5:1300041, August v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301481, DicksonThrall v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Idaho, Case No. 2:1300225, Morrissey v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301496, Carlucci v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301497, Barry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301503, Suggs v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301504, Edson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301505, Adebanjo v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301668, Barron v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301670, Wambaja v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301700, Tune v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Mississippi, Case No. 4:1300083, Polansky v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1303448, Voshell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 3:1300989. (DLB)
July 9, 2013 Filing 1591 CORRECT TRANSFER ORDER (received 7/9/2013) with Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. Anna Acquaviva, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:13-01035, Sandra Kathleen Caesar, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California,C.A. No. 2:13-01149, Michelle Shanaya Benson, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:13-01195, Amber J. Wilson, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-00705, Brandi Tucker, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-00728. (DLB)
June 28, 2013 Filing 1590 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #1589 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kristine)
June 28, 2013 Filing 1589 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Kraft, Kristine)
June 26, 2013 Filing 1588 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-192) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Willis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300496, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01218-RWS, Valigorsky v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301397, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01219-RWS, Bowen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301398, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01220-RWS, Callahan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301413, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01221-RWS, LehmanPatterson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301414, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01222-RWS, Claycomb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Kentucky, Case No. 3:1300508, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01230-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 6/27/2013 (DLB).
June 26, 2013 Filing 1587 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-192) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. Willis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300496, Claycomb v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Kentucky, Case No. 3:1300508, Valigorsky v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301397, Bowen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301398, Callahan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301413, LehmanPatterson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301414. (DLB)
June 21, 2013 Filing 1586 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-191) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: McMahon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. California, Case No. 3:1301305, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01177-RWS, Hovis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300515, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01178-RWS, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300516, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01179-RWS, Terry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300517, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01180-RWS, Britton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Michigan, Case No. 1:1300082, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01181-RWS.(DLB)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1585 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference set in this matter on August 20, 2013 is reset and will now be held on August 5, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than August 1, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing of Defendants' motion for summary judgment in Prather v. Organon, 4:08 CV 558 RWS will also be held on August 5, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446- 155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 1:15 p.m. so the conference may start promptly at 1:30 p.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/20/13. (LAH)
June 20, 2013 Filing 1584 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-191) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 1964. McMahon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. California, Case No. 3:1301305, Hovis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300515, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300516, Terry v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300517, Britton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Michigan, Case No. 1:1300082. (DLB)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference set in this matter on June 21, 2013 is reset and will now be held on August 20, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than August 16, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:45 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:00 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel (LAH)
June 14, 2013 Filing 1582 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-190) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Holloway v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301276, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01120-RWS, Arnold v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301277, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01121-RWS, Mack v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301278, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01122-RWS, Peterson v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 2:1301015, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01123-RWS, Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 1:1300373, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01124-RWS, Newman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300969, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01125-RWS, Coatney v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301226, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01126-RWS, Lyles v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301276, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01127-RWS, Wallace v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301277, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01128-RWS, McGee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301286, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01129-RWS, Howell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300335, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01130-RWS, QUALLS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300862, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01131-RWS, THURMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302926, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01132-RWS, ALLEN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302932, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01133-RWS, SEAL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302933, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01134-RWS, Swanson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Tennessee, Case No. 3:1300196, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01135-RWS, Wightman v. Merck &Company, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1301333, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01141-RWS, Henry v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Connecticut, Case No. 3:1300730, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01145-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 6/17/2013 (DLB).
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss three cases ( (4:12-cv-01262-RWS, 4:12-cv-01611-RWS, 4:12-cv-01868-RWS) based on the Plaintiff's failure to provide fact sheets [#1571 ] is GRANTED. The ruling of this motion has been filed in the individual cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 06/13/2013. (CBL)
June 13, 2013 Filing 1580 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-190) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Henry v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Connecticut, Case No. 3:1300730, Holloway v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301276, Arnold v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301277, Mack v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1301278, Howell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1300335, Peterson v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 2:1301015, Newman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300969, Coatney v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301226, Lyles v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301276, Wallace v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301277, McGee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301286, QUALLS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300862 THURMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302926, ALLEN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302932, SEAL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1302933, Swanson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Tennessee, Case No. 3:1300196, Wightman v. Merck &Company, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1301333, Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 1:1300373. (DLB) (Main Document 1580 replaced on 6/13/2013) (DLB). Modified on 6/13/2013 (DLB).
June 12, 2013 Filing 1579 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-189) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Disotell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 2:1302902, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01113-RWS. (DLB)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1576 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1575 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority In Support Of Pending Summary Judgment Motions by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kristine) filed by Diane M. Agresta, TANAYA BROWN, AMBER BOCK ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/12/13. (LGK)
June 12, 2013 Filing 1577 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-189) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Disotell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 2:1302902. (DLB)
June 11, 2013 Filing 1576 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1575 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority In Support Of Pending Summary Judgment Motions by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kristine)
June 7, 2013 Filing 1575 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority In Support Of Pending Summary Judgment Motions by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cassetta, Richard)
June 7, 2013 Filing 1574 TRANSFER ORDER with Schedule A regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. Beatrice Burgueno, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:12-10883, Catalina Chinchilla, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:13-00039, Porshe Smith, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 2:13-00130, Elizabeth Vasquez, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 5:13-00055, Judy Hackett, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., C.D. California, C.A. No. 5:13-00077, Mirna Gonzalez, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:12-06161, Aimee Axelrod, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 4:13-00117. (DLB) ORDER DELETED FROM CASE AS SENT IN ERROR BY THE PANEL.
May 31, 2013 Filing 1573 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-188) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Obregon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301194, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01040-RWS, Adams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300919, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01041-RWS, Ridenour v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Indiana, Case No. 1:1300154, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-01051-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 6/3/2013 (DLB).
May 31, 2013 Filing 1572 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (8 in 4:12-cv-01611-RWS, 1571 in 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 8 in 4:12-cv-01868-RWS, 8 in 4:12-cv-01262-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to Provide Plaintiff's Fact Sheet filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melissa A. Geist In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:12-cv-01262-RWS, 4:12-cv-01611-RWS, 4:12-cv-01868-RWS(Geist, Melissa)
May 31, 2013 Filing 1571 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to Provide Plaintiff's Fact Sheet by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS, 4:12-cv-01262-RWS, 4:12-cv-01611-RWS, 4:12-cv-01868-RWS(Geist, Melissa)
May 30, 2013 Filing 1570 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-188) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Ridenour v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Indiana, Case No. 1:1300154, Adams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300919, Obregon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301194.(DLB)
May 23, 2013 Filing 1569 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-187) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300960, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00985-RWS, Bingham v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300963, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00986-RWS, Watkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300968, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00987-RWS, Jarvis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301048, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00988-RWS, Dieters v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301073, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00989-RWS, Bond v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301075, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00990-RWS, Louisiana v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301076, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00991-RWS, Sypniewski v. Merk &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:13 -1093, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00992-RWS, ROMELIEN v. ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1300991, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00993-RWS. (DLB)
May 22, 2013 Filing 1568 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-187) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Davis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300960, Bingham v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300963, Watkins v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300968, Jarvis v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301048, Dieters v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301073, Bond v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301075, Louisiana v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1301076, Sypniewski v. Merk &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:13 01093, ROMELIEN v. ORGANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1300991. (DLB)
May 17, 2013 Filing 1567 TRANSCRIPT proceedings of Status Hearing held on 5/15/2013 before Judge Rodney Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Telephone number 3142447966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2013. (RAK)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1566 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on June 21, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than June 19, 2013 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than June 18, 2013, the parties shall submit a written proposal on the following issues:...see order...IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States...see order.... Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/16/13. (LGK)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to compel #1548 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants have a continuing obligation to supplement their answers to interrogatories and shall supplement their answers every sixty days from todays date. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/15/2013. (RAK)
May 15, 2013 Filing 1564 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-186) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: HENSBERRY et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207662, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00920-RWS, DOMNITZ et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300299, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00921-RWS, LIMBU et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300506, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00922-RWS, MCDONOUGH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300823, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00923-RWS, Arias v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1302304, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00924-RWS, Ayala v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301380, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00925-RWS, Mukhni v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301238, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00926-RWS, Kramer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300666, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00927-RWS, Massman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300667, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00928-RWS, Jones v Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300671, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00929-RWS, Green v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300673, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00930-RWS, Holguin v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301237, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00931-RWS, Cuthbertson et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1301964, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00932-RWS, English v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301381, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00933-RWS, Gordy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1300618, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00934-RWS, Enagbare v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1302322, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00941-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 5/16/2013 (DLB).
May 15, 2013 Filing 1563 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel: Status Conference held on 5/15/2013. Order to follow. Next status conference set for 6/21/13 t 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. (Court Reporter:Shannon White.) (FTR Gold: No.) (LGK)
May 14, 2013 Filing 1562 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-186) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Cuthbertson et al v. Organon USA Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1301964, Gordy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 6:1300618, Enagbare v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1302322, Kramer v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300666, Massman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300667, Jones v Organon USA, Inc., et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300671, Green v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300673, HENSBERRY et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207662, DOMNITZ et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300299, LIMBU et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300506, MCDONOUGH v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300823, Arias v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. New York, Case No. 1:1302304, Holguin v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301237, Mukhni v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301238, Ayala v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301380, English v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1301381. (DLB)
May 13, 2013 Filing 1561 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-185) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Grady v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300905, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00841-RWS, Cooper v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300915, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00842-RWS, Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300916, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00843-RWS, Blount v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300917, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00844-RWS, Baldwin et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1301720, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00847-RWS. (DLB)
May 13, 2013 Filing 1560 MOTION for Hearing re #1555 MOTION for Hearing re #1554 Conditional Transfer Order,, #1536 Conditional Transfer Order,,,, by Plaintiffs Katrina Frances Baldwin, Beatrice Burgueno, Geovanna Davis, Mandy DeGroote, Jacqueline Friar, Mirna Gonzalez, Sarah Gutierrez-Anderson, Jasmine Herrara, Kinberly Kelly, Linda Messick, Marlin Messick, Elisabeth Mora, Alfonso Reyes, Phoebe Seaton. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion And Request To Add To May 15, 2013 Status Conference Agenda)(Mohsenzadegan, Shireen)
May 10, 2013 Filing 1559 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1551 Order, #1514 Order,,,, Memorandum of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Pursuant to This Court's March 8, 2013 Order and April 26, 2013 Order by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kraft, Kristine)
May 10, 2013 Filing 1558 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1544 Scheduling Order,,, Plaintiffs' Agenda for May 15, 2013 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Kraft, Kristine)
May 10, 2013 Filing 1557 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1551 Order, #1514 Order,,,, Defendants' Memorandum Regarding Issues That Continue to Need to be Coordinated by the Court and a Proposed Schedule by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
May 10, 2013 Filing 1556 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1544 Scheduling Order,,, Defendants' Proposed Agenda for May 15, 2013 In-Person Status Conference by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
May 10, 2013 Filing 1555 MOTION for Hearing re #1554 Conditional Transfer Order,, #1536 Conditional Transfer Order,,,, by Plaintiffs Katrina Frances Baldwin, Beatrice Burgueno, Beatrice Burgueno, Geovanna Davis, Mandy DeGroote, Jacqueline Friar, Mirna Gonzalez, Mirna Gonzalez, Mirna Gonzalez, Sarah Gutierrez-Anderson, Jasmine Herrara, Kinberly Kelly, Linda Messick, Marlin Messick, Elisabeth Mora, Alfonso Reyes, Phoebe Seaton. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mohsenzadegan, Shireen)
May 2, 2013 Filing 1554 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-185) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Baldwin et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. California, Case No. 3:1301720, Grady v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300905, Cooper v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300915, Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300916, Blount v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300917. (DLB)
April 30, 2013 Filing 1553 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-184) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Hjelmen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300883, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00828-RWS, Bridge v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 2:1300965, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00829-RWS. (DLB)
April 30, 2013 Filing 1552 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-184) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Hjelmen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300883, Bridge v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 2:1300965. (DLB)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1551 ORDER re #1550 Notice (Other), filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/26/13. (LGK)
April 26, 2013 Filing 1550 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Stipulated [Proposed] Order Regarding Parties' Joint Submission as to Issues Appropriate for Resolution by the MDL Court) (Geist, Melissa)
April 23, 2013 Filing 1549 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #1548 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Virginia Fritch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Kristine)
April 23, 2013 Filing 1548 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Virginia Fritch. (Kraft, Kristine)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1547 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-183) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Dove v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 6:1306183, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00772-RWS. (DLB)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1546 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-183) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Dove v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 6:1306183.(DLB)
April 17, 2013 Filing 1545 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-182) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: ETHRIDGE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206578, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00722-RWS, NUNEZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207462, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00723-RWS, Sparrell et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Idaho, Case No. 1:1300112, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00724-RWS, WYBLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207825, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00725-RWS, CHAGNON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207826, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00726-RWS, THOMPSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300396, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00727-RWS, Hudson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300735, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00728-RWS, Padilla v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D Texas, Case No. 3:1301007, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00729-RWS.Jeffries v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D Texas, Case No. 3:1301006, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00730-RWS, BILCIK v. ORGANON USA INC et al, M.D Georgia, Case No. 5:1300089, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00731-RWS, Jackson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300820, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00732-RWS, Stuckey et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:1300584, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00733-RWS, Morris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300321, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00741-RWS, Jasheway v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300322, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00742-RWS, Bradford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300323, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00743-RWS, Heuser v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinios, Case No. 1:1301772, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00744-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 4/18/2013 (DLB).
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1544 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference is set in this matter on May 15, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than May 10, 2012.Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:45 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:00 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by backgroundnoise.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/17/13. (LGK)
April 16, 2013 Filing 1543 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-182) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. BILCIK v. ORGANON USA INC et al, M.D Georgia, Case No. 5:1300089, Jackson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300820, Sparrell et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Idaho, Case No. 1:1300112, Heuser v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinios, Case No. 1:1301772, Stuckey et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:1300584, Hudson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300735, Morris v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300321, Jasheway v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300322, Bradford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300323, ETHRIDGE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206578, NUNEZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207462, WYBLE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207825, CHAGNON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207826, THOMPSON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1300396, Jeffries v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D Texas, Case No. 3:1301006, Padilla v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D Texas, Case No. 3:1301007.(DLB)
April 11, 2013 Filing 1542 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-181) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Snyder v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300672, D. Minnesota, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00680-RWS, Stanley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Texas, Case No. 6:1300271, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00700-RWS. Modified on 4/15/2013 (DLB).
April 10, 2013 Filing 1541 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-181) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Snyder v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300672, Stanley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Texas, Case No. 6:1300271. (DLB)
April 8, 2013 Filing 1540 MOTION for Hearing re #1536 Conditional Transfer Order,,,, by Plaintiffs Aimee Axelrod, Beatrice Burgueno, Catalina Chinchilla, Mirna Gonzalez, Judy Hackett, Porshe Smith, Elizabeth Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support)(Shkolnik, Hunter)
April 4, 2013 Filing 1539 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-180) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Bittner v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300662, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00640-RWS, Cook v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300663, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00641-RWS, Gomez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300665, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00642-RWS, Capitano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300670, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00643-RWS, Renda et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1305198, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00644-RWS. (DLB)
April 4, 2013 Filing 1538 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1514 Order,,,, by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
April 3, 2013 Filing 1537 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-180) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Bittner v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300662, Cook v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300663, Gomez v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300665, Capitano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300670, Renda et al v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1305198.(DLB)
April 3, 2013 Filing 1536 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Beatrice Burgueno, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:12-10883, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00628-RWS, Catalina Chinchilla, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:13-00039, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00630-RWS, Elizabeth Vasquez, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 5:13-00055, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00631-RWS, Judy Hackett, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 5:13-00077, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00632-RWS, Porshe Smith, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:13-00130, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00633-RWS, Mirna Gonzalez, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Northern District of California, C.A. No. 4:12-06161, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00634-RWS, Aimee Axelrod, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Northern District of California, C.A. No. 4:13-00117, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00635-RWS. (DLB)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1535 ORDER Amending March 25, 2013 Order regarding the parties' meeting and confer obligations as to pretrial scheduling. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/2/2013. (RAK)
April 2, 2013 Filing 1534 TRANSFER ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Cari H. Hayes v. McKesson Corporation, et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-00816 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00612-RWS. (DLB)
April 1, 2013 Filing 1533 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, these actions are transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Rodney W. Sippel for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Beatrice Burgueno, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:12-10883, Catalina Chinchilla, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:13-00039, Porshe Smith, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:13-00130, Elizabeth Vasquez, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 5:13-00055, Judy Hackett, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Central District of California, C.A. No. 5:13-00077, Mirna Gonzalez, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Northern District of California, C.A. No. 4:12-06161, Aimee Axelrod, et al. v. Organon USA, Inc., et al., Northern District of California, C.A. No. 4:13-00117. (DLB)
April 1, 2013 Filing 1532 NOTICE Stipulated [Proposed] Order Amending March 25, 2013 Order Regarding the Parties' Meet and Confer Obligations as to Pre-Trial Scheduling: by Defendants Merck and Co Inc, Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Geist, Melissa)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel re: Cari H. Hayes v. McKesson Corporation, et al., N.D. California, C.A. No. 3:13-00816 - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the action is transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (DLB)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1530 ORDER re #1529 STIPULATED ORDER AMENDING 3/8/13 ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' MEET AND CONFER OBLIGATIONS AS TO PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. SO ORDERED Response to Court due by 4/1/2013.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/21/13. (LGK)
March 22, 2013 Filing 1529 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Stipulated [Proposed] Order Amending March 8, 2013 Order Regarding the Parties' Meet and Confer Obligations as to Pre-Trial Scheduling) (Geist, Melissa)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1528 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Organon's motion to exclude testimony regarding opinion that NuvaRing should be taken off the market [Doc. 1305] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/22/13. (LGK)
March 22, 2013 Filing 1527 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-179) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Dietrich v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300427, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00530-RWS, Myers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300514, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00531-RWS. (DLB)
March 22, 2013 Filing 1526 NOTICE Apperance and Designation of Lead Counsel for Jody Rudman: by Plaintiff Jennifer Spence (Rudman, Jody)
March 22, 2013 Filing 1525 NOTICE Apperance and Designation of Lead Counsel for Joe Kendall: by Plaintiff Jennifer Spence (Kendall, Joe)
March 20, 2013 Filing 1524 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-179) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Dietrich v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300427, Myers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300514. (DLB)
March 19, 2013 Filing 1523 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-178) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Charlie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300256, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00512-RWS, Raymond v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300426, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00513-RWS, Carrasco v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300463, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00514-RWS. (DLB)
March 18, 2013 Filing 1522 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-178) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Charlie v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300256, Raymond v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300426, Carrasco v. Merck &Co., Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300463. (DLB)
March 15, 2013 Filing 1521 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-177) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Boggs v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300191, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00483-RWS, Neier v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300192, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00484-RWS MooreWardCox v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 6:1303075, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00485-RWS, Sorensen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300153, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00486-RWS, Joubert Hayes v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300209, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00487-RWS, Story v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300219, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00488-RWS, Hoagenson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300221, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00489-RWS, Hartman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300223, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00490-RWS, McCoy v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300253, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00491-RWS, BeattyBarnes v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300570, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00492-RWS.ABEL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207000, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00493-RWS, BARRIOSNUEVO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207034, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00494-RWS No.CHERRY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207187, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00495-RWS. Williams v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1203830, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00496-RWS, LENZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1201890, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00497-RWS, Hazel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300029, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00511-RWS, Spada v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1300618, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00518-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 3/19/2013 (DLB).
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1520 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1518 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation (Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Reply Memoranda in Further Support of Motions for Summary Judgment In Excess of This Court's Page Limit) by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS et al.(Geist, Melissa) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED, New page limit will be set at 20 pages.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/14/2013. (RAK)
March 14, 2013 Filing 1519 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-177) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. BeattyBarnes v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300570, Hazel v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1300029, Spada v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1300618, Sorensen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300153, Joubert Hayes v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300209, Story v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300219, Hoagenson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300221, Hartman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300223, McCoy v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300253, Boggs v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300191, Neier v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 4:1300192, MooreWardCox v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Missouri, Case No. 6:1303075, ABEL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207000, BARRIOSNUEVO v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207034, SAVAGE v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207120, No.CHERRY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207187, LENZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1201890, Williams v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1203830. (DLB) Modified on 3/14/2013 (DLB).
March 13, 2013 Filing 1518 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation (Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Reply Memoranda in Further Support of Motions for Summary Judgment In Excess of This Court's Page Limit) by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. Associated Cases: 4:08-md-01964-RWS et al.(Geist, Melissa)
March 12, 2013 Filing 1517 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-176) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: WEBSTER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al., W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1300254 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00459-RWS. (DLB)
March 12, 2013 Filing 1516 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-176) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. WEBSTER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al., W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1300254. (DLB)
March 8, 2013 Filing 1515 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie J. McKey for Plaintiff Jennifer Spence. (KXS)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1514 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the first bellwether trial is now set on October 21, 2013. The specific case to be tried will be identified at a future date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than March 25, 2013, the parties shall confer and file a propose pretrial and motion in limine schedule. The parties shall also file, no later than March 25, 2013, proposed dates for a potential hearing of the pending summary judgment motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a proposed supplemental expert deposition schedule no later than March 25, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a proposed supplemental document production schedule no later than March 25, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than April 26, 2013, the parties shall file a joint memorandum advising the Court whether any issuesappropriate for resolution by this MDL Court remain and, if so, an explanation of what these issues are and a proposed schedule for the completion of these issues. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/8/2013. (RAK)
March 7, 2013 Filing 1513 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-174) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Renchen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300425, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00420-RWS. (DLB)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference set in this matter on March 8, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South will now start one-half hour earlier at 10:30 a.m. Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter theparticipant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/7/13. (ARL)
March 6, 2013 Filing 1511 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1463 Order,,,, (Proposed Agenda for March 8, 2013 In-Person Status Conference) by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
March 6, 2013 Filing 1510 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-173) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Dina Fox v. Merck and Co Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 8:1300283, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00416-RWS. (DLB)
March 6, 2013 Filing 1509 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1463 Order,,,, Plaintiffs' Agenda for March 8, 2013 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, TANAYA BROWN, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
March 6, 2013 Filing 1508 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-174) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Renchen v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300425. (DLB)
March 5, 2013 Filing 1507 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-171) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: HILL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206061, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00406-RWS. (DLB)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Organon's motion to exclude testimony related to "bursts" or "high variability" in NuvaRing's estrogen delivery [Doc. #1309 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/5/13. (ARL)
March 5, 2013 Filing 1505 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-173) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Dina Fox v. Merck and Co Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 8:1300283. (DLB)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude opinions that hormone "counterbalance" or surrogate markers can assess the risk of VTE in the use of hormonal contraceptives [Doc. #1307 ] is DENIED.Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/4/13. (ARL)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' motions to exclude testimony of Defendants' experts Dr. Titia Mulders and Dr. Hans Rekers [Doc. #s #1313 & #1311 ] are DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART as stated above. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/4/13. (See Memorandum and Order for full details.)(ARL)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1502 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude Plaintiffs' expert Dr. Suzanne Parisian [Doc. #1299 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/4/13. (ARL)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1501 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to exclude the testimony of Defendants' expert witness David Grimes [Doc. #1315 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/4/13. (ARL)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1500 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Organon's motion to exclude the expert testimony of Dr. Tischkau (Doc. #1297 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/4/13. (ARL)
February 27, 2013 Filing 1499 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-171) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. HILL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206061. (DLB)
February 22, 2013 Filing 1498 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Miyares v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1300859, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00341-RWS,Abete v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 6:1300137, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00342-RWS Bergeron v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300297, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00343-RWS Chandler v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300298, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00344-RWS. (DLB)
February 21, 2013 Filing 1497 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Bergeron v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300297, Chandler v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300298, Abete v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 6:1300137, Miyares v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1300859. (DLB)
February 21, 2013 Filing 1496 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-169) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Cooley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 6:1301034, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00325-RWS, FOSTER v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203435, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00326-RWS, HAMMACK v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207730, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00327-RWS, HeldHusong v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. North Carolina, Case No. 5:1200800, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00328-RWS, Reddix v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 5:1300018, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00329-RWS, Karen Nutkiewicz v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1300645, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00331-RWS, Spieth v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1300292, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00333-RWS, RADOSTI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E. D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1206676, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00330-RWS, MorrisMallard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:1203048, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00332-RWS, Hyatt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1205044, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00340-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 2/22/2013 (DLB).
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1495 ORDER in 4:09cv341 RWS re: Stipulation of Dismissal Only of Count XVI "Punitive Damages" Claim of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/20/13. (ARL)
February 20, 2013 Filing 1494 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-168) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Okrzynski v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1300033, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00279-RWS. (DLB)
February 20, 2013 Filing 1493 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-169) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Karen Nutkiewicz v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1300645, Spieth v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1300292, Cooley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 6:1301034, FOSTER v. ORGANON USA, INC., et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203435, HAMMACK v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207730, HeldHusong v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. North Carolina, Case No. 5:1200800, Reddix v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 5:1300018, RADOSTI v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E. D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1206676, MorrisMallard v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Tennessee, Case No. 2:1203048, Hyatt v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1205044.(DLB)
February 19, 2013 Filing 1492 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Beth S. Guthrie, Chuck Guthrie Of Plaintiffs, Beth Guthrie And Chuck Guthries, Responses In Opposition Of Defendants Motions For Summary Judgment And Case-Specific Daubert Motion in 4:09-cv-01217 (Alvarez, Alex)
February 18, 2013 Filing 1491 NOTICE by Plaintiff Marianne Prather Notice of Plaintiff Marianne Prather's Responses in Opposition of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Case-Specific Daubert Motion (Kraft, Kristine)
February 14, 2013 Filing 1490 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-168) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Okrzynski v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1300033. (DLB)
February 12, 2013 Filing 1488 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-167) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Eifert v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300222, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00265-RWS, Roman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300224, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00266-RWS, Cauthen v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 0:1300222, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00267-RWS. (DLB)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE in Case 4:12CV2311 RWS.. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/11/13. (ARL)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1484 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Suzanne Parisian, MD by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Kraft, Kristine) filed by Diane M. Agresta, TANAYA BROWN, AMBER BOCK ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/11/13. (LGK)
February 11, 2013 Filing 1486 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-167) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Eifert v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300222, Roman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300224,Cauthen v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 0:1300222. (DLB)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1485 SURREPLY to Motion re #1299 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' "FDA Expert" Suzanne Parisian, M.D. filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kraft, Kristine)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1484 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Suzanne Parisian, MD by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN. (Kraft, Kristine)
February 7, 2013 Filing 1483 STIPULATION (Stipulated [Proposed] Order of Dismissal With Prejudice) by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
January 31, 2013 Filing 1482 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-166) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: SMITH v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207787, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00202-RWS, Johnson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300016, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00203-RWS. (DLB)
January 31, 2013 Filing 1481 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-166) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. SMITH v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1207787 Johnson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 2:1300016. (DLB)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration [#1476] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/30/13. (LAH)
January 28, 2013 Filing 1479 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1476 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1475 Memorandum & Order,, Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order of January 24, 2013 Regarding Supplemental Expert Discovery filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
January 25, 2013 Filing 1478 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-165) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Bernard v. McKesson Corporation et al, N.D. California, Case No. 4:1206444, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00180-RWS. (DLB)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have leave to file a sur- reply to Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs FDA Expert Suzanne Parisian, M.D. Doc. #1447 . Plaintiffs are directed to respond to the declaration of Susan Alpert, Ph.D., M.D. Plaintiffs shall file a response no later than February 9, 2013. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/25/2013. (RAK)
January 24, 2013 Filing 1476 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1475 Memorandum & Order,, Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider the Court's Order of January 24, 2013 Regarding Supplemental Expert Discovery by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for supplemental expert discovery #1428 is GRANTED. Counsel shall submit supplemental expert reports simultaneously no later than February 28, 2013. The supplementation of the reports shall be limited to the new data not available to the experts when they created their original reports. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the supplemental depositions of those experts who provided supplemental reports shall be completed by April 1, 2013. Plaintiffs experts shall be deposed first. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/24/2013. (RAK)
January 24, 2013 Filing 1474 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-165) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. 4:1206444 Bernard v. McKesson Corporation et al, N.D. California, Case No. 4:1206444. (DLB)
January 24, 2013 Filing 1473 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-163) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: McGuire v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300036, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00152-RWS, GATLING v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203990, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00153-RWS, REED et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204462, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00154-RWS, WAGGONER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204554, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00155-RWS, COTTON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204621, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00156-RWS, DAVIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204918, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00157-RWS, PAYNE et al v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1205631, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00158-RWS, HACKWORTH et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1205859, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00159-RWS, CLARK et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206382, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00160-RWS, FRIDAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206625, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00161-RWS, GOODMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206707, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00162-RWS. (DLB)
January 23, 2013 Filing 1472 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-163) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. McGuire v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300036, GATLING v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203990, REED et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204462, WAGGONER v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204554, COTTON et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204621, DAVIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1204918, PAYNE et al v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1205631, HACKWORTH et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1205859, CLARK et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206382, FRIDAY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206625, GOODMAN v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206707. (DLB)
January 17, 2013 Filing 1471 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-161) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Valerio v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203193, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00112-RWS, Burns v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300034, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00113-RWS. (DLB)
January 17, 2013 Filing 1470 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-160) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Williams v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1203829, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00105-RWS. (DLB)
January 17, 2013 Filing 1469 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-161) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Valerio v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203193, Burns v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1300034. (DLB)
January 16, 2013 Filing 1468 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-159) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: GREENWOOD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206112, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00088-RWS, ROSS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206815, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00089-RWS, Cooper v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1204051, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00090-RWS, Chaney v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1204248, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00091-RWS, Welborn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 3:1200168, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00092-RWS, Lietzke v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1202639, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00093-RWS, Postley v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1203827, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00094-RWS, Freeman v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 4:1200762, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00095-RWS, Thomas v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1202851, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00096-RWS, Ashworth v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Rhode Island, Case No. 1:1200682, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00097-RWS, AdamsWilliams v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 0:1262302, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00101-RWS, Borda v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 1:1224206, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00102-RWS, WASHINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1206506, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00103-RWS, 4:13-cv-00151-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 1/17/2013 (DLB). Modified on 1/24/2013 (DLB).
January 15, 2013 Filing 1467 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-158) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Charles v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203155, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00068-RWS, Simpson v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203157, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00069-RWS, Fonseca v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203158, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00070-RWS, Straessley v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203160, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00071-RWS, Thorp v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203191, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00072-RWS, McNeil v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203192, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00073-RWS, Dettman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203194, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00074-RWS. (DLB)
January 15, 2013 Filing 1466 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-160) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Williams v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1203829. (DLB)
January 14, 2013 Filing 1465 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-159) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Freeman v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 4:1200762, Beatrice Burgueno et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1210883, Lietzke v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, M.D. Florida, Case No. 8:1202639, AdamsWilliams v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 0:1262302, Borda v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, S.D. Florida, Case No. 1:1224206, Cooper v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1204051, Chaney v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 1:1204248, Welborn v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Georgia, Case No. 3:1200168, GREENWOOD v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206112, ROSS et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1206815, WASHINGTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1206506, Ashworth v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Rhode Island, Case No. 1:1200682, Postley v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1203827, Thomas v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1202851, Smith v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. West Viriginia, Case No. 2:1208724. (DLB)
January 11, 2013 Filing 1464 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-158) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Charles v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203155, Simpson v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203157, Fonseca v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203158, Straessley v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203160, Thorp v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203191, McNeil v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203192, Dettman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203194. (DLB)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' consent motion to cancel the status conference set on January 10, 2013 and to reset the conference for an in person setting [#1462] is GRANTED. The status conference is now set to be held on March 8, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16 South. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than March 6, 2013. Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:45 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 11:00 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/9/13. (LAH)
January 8, 2013 Filing 1462 MOTION for Extension of: Plaintiffs' Motion to Reset Status Conference Scheduled for January 10, 2013 by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, TANAYA BROWN, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
January 4, 2013 Filing 1461 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-157) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Tracy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203159, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:13-cv-00013-RWS.(DLB)
January 4, 2013 Filing 1460 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-157) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Tracy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203159. (DLB)
December 28, 2012 Filing 1459 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-156) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Murff v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203121 opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02391-RWS. (DLB)
December 28, 2012 Filing 1458 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-156) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Murff v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203121. (DLB)
December 27, 2012 Filing 1457 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-154) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Lemler v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Indiana, Case No. 3:1200763, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02380-RWS, Stevens v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203076 3:1200763, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02381-RWS. (DLB)
December 26, 2012 Filing 1456 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-154) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Lemler v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Indiana, Case No. 3:1200763, Stevens v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1203076. (DLB)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties joint stipulation to extend the Daubert and summary judgment briefing schedule #1444 is GRANTED. Responses to any case specific Daubert motions and motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than February 18, 2013. Replies to these motions shall be filed no later than March 18, 2013.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/20/12. (LGK)
December 18, 2012 Filing 1454 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-153) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Bruce v.Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 3:1202198, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02339-RWS. (DLB)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1442 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Replies in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Strauss, Stephen) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc., #1439 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine) filed by Diane M. Agresta, Allison Brooks, AMBER BOCK ; ORDERED BOTH MOTIONS GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/17/12. (LGK)
December 17, 2012 Filing 1452 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-153) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Bruce v.Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Oregon, Case No. 3:1202198. (DLB)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1451 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1307 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions that Hormone "Counterbalance" or Surrogate Markers Can Assess the Risk of VTE in the Use of Hormonal Contraceptives filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M Geist, #2 Exhibit Amended E, #3 Exhibit Amended H, #4 Exhibit U, #5 Exhibit V)(Strauss, Stephen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1450 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1309 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony Related to "Bursts" or "High Variability" in NuvaRing's Estrogen Delivery filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M Geist, #2 Exhibit AA, #3 Exhibit BB, #4 Exhibit CC, #5 Exhibit DD, #6 Exhibit EE, #7 Exhibit FF, #8 Exhibit GG, #9 Exhibit HH, #10 Exhibit II, #11 Exhibit JJ, #12 Exhibit KK)(Strauss, Stephen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1449 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1305 SEALED MOTION (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony Regarding Opinion That NuvaRing Should Be Taken Off The Market) filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M Geist, #2 Exhibit Q)(Strauss, Stephen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1448 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1297 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Shelley Ann Tischkau, Ph.D filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M Geist, #2 Exhibit Amended A, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K)(Strauss, Stephen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1447 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1299 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' "FDA Expert" Suzanne Parisian, M.D. filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Alpert Declaration, #2 Affidavit Declaration of M Geist, #3 Exhibit N)(Strauss, Stephen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1446 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1313 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Titia Mulders Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Titia Mulders filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Kraft, Kristine)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1445 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1315 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness David Grimes Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness David Grimes, M.D. filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Kraft, Kristine)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1444 STIPULATION re #1427 Order, Joint Stipulation for Modification of the Daubert and Summary Judgment Motion Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1443 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-152) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Ray v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202758, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02308-RWS, Howell v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 1:1200087, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02309-RWS, Maguire v Schering Corp et al, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 3: 203062, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02310-RWS, HILL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1201775, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02311-RWS,Taylor et al v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1209301, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02312-RWS, Stumph v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1209110, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02313-RWS Dunne v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1200395, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02314-RWS, BLAKED v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1206007, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02315-RWS, Brown v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, District of Colorado, Case No. 1:1202991, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02329-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 12/17/2012 (DLB).
December 14, 2012 Filing 1442 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Replies in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Strauss, Stephen)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1441 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard P. Cassetta for Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1440 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1311 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Hans Rekers Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Hans Rekers filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Kraft, Kristine)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1439 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
December 14, 2012 Filing 1438 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1428 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Expert Discovery (Reply Memorandum In Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Expert Discovery) filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 1437 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-152) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Brown v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, District of Colorado, Case No. 1:1202991, Stumph v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1209110, Taylor et al v. Organon USA, Inc et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1209301, Shephard v. WalMart Stores East LP, N.D. Indiana, Case No. 1:1200087, Howell v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 1:1200087, Maguire v Schering Corp et al, N.D. Iowa, Case No. 3: 203062, Ray v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202758, HILL v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1201775, BLAKED v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1206007, Dunne v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, W.D. Texas, Case No. 3:1200395. (DLB)
December 11, 2012 Filing 1436 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-151) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: McCormack v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202960, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02280-RWS, Barksdale v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202961, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02281-RWS, Jackson v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202962, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02282-RWS, Bultman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202966, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02283-RWS, McHugh v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202967, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02284-RWS, Brownlee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202969, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02285-RWS, Cox v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202970, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02286-RWS. (DLB)
December 10, 2012 Filing 1435 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-151) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. McCormack v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202960, Barksdale v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202961, Jackson v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202962, Bultman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202966, McHugh v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202967, Brownlee v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202969, Cox v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202970. (DLB)
December 7, 2012 Filing 1434 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-150) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Sarah P Lemmerman v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1209379, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02270-RWS, Sorenson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 1:1201149, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02271-RWS, JOHNSTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:1200272, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02272-RWS, Schur v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1203408, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02273-RWS. (DLB)
December 7, 2012 Filing 1433 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1428 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Expert Discovery Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Expert Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
December 5, 2012 Filing 1432 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-150) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Sarah P Lemmerman v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1209379, JOHNSTON v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 1:1200272, Schur v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1203408, Sorenson v. Organon USA Inc et al, E.D. Wisconsin, Case No. 1:1201149. (DLB)
November 30, 2012 Filing 1431 STIPULATION regarding Defendants' Supplemental Production of Documents by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks, KAZAN CLARK. (Kraft, Kristine)
November 28, 2012 Filing 1430 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Oldenburg v. Organon USA, et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 1:1201095, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02209-RWS. (DLB)
November 27, 2012 Filing 1429 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #1428 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Expert Discovery filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
November 27, 2012 Filing 1428 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Expert Discovery by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa A. Geist in Support of Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Expert Discovery)(Geist, Melissa)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition briefs to the pending summary judgment motions and to the pending case-specific Daubert motions shall be filed no later than January 21, 2013. Reply briefs shall be filed no later than February 21, 2013. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/27/2012. (RAK)
November 27, 2012 Filing 1426 TRANSCRIPT proceedings of Motion and Status Teleconference held on 11/20/12 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Telephone number 314-244-7966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2013. (ARL)
November 27, 2012 Filing 1425 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Oldenburg v. Organon USA, et al, W.D. New York, Case No. 1:1201095. (DLB)
November 26, 2012 Filing 1424 STIPULATION Order Regarding the Daubert and Summary Judgment Motion Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks, KAZAN CLARK. (Kraft, Kristine)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' reply briefs for all generic expert Daubert motions shall be filed no later than December 14, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than November 30, 2012, the parties shall submit a proposed amended schedule for the filing of response and reply briefs addressing the pending summary judgment motions and case-specific Daubert motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed order setting deadlines for Defendants' supplementation of their document production and answers to interrogatories no later than November 30, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a brief of its oral motion regarding the supplementation of expert reports no later than November 26, 2012. Plaintiffs shall file their response brief no later than December 7, 2012. Defendants reply brief shall be filed no later than December 14, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the first bellwether trial is now set on July 8, 2013. The specific case to be tried will be identified at a future date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status teleconference is set in this matter on January 10, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than January 8, 2013. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call.ct. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/20/12. (LGK)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to exclude the testimony of Kishore Udipi, PH.D. #1295 is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/20/12. (LGK)
November 16, 2012 Filing 1421 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1360 Order, Plaintiffs' Agenda for November 20, 2012 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, KAZAN CLARK, Kristine Diaz. (Kraft, Kristine)
November 16, 2012 Filing 1420 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1360 Order, DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED AGENDA FOR NOVEMBER 20, 2012 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
November 15, 2012 Filing 1419 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-148) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Esquibel v. Organon USA Incorporated et al, D. Arizona, Case No. 4:1200767, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02130-RWS, Hensley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 6:1201370, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02133-RWS, Schmid v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202492, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02131-RWS, Morrison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202541, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02132-RWS, Robinson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1202216, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02134-RWS. (DLB)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1418 ORDER OF DISMISSAL in 4:12CV281 RWS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss #14 is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/15/12. (ARL)
November 14, 2012 Filing 1417 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-148) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Esquibel v. Organon USA Incorporated et al, D. Arizona, Case No. 4:1200767, Hensley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Kansas, Case No. 6:1201370, Schmid v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202492, Morrison v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202541, Robinson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1202216. (DLB)
November 13, 2012 Filing 1416 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202734, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02118-RWS, Douglas v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202757, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02119-RWS, Boya v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202759, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02120-RWS. (DLB)
November 13, 2012 Filing 1415 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202734, Douglas v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202757, Boya v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202759. (DLB)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 ORDER REGARDING THE DAUBERT AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE (see order for specifics) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/8/12. (LAH)
November 7, 2012 Filing 1413 NOTICE Stipulated (Proposed) Order Regarding the Daubert and Summary Judgment Motion Briefing Schedule: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. re #1392 Order, (Geist, Melissa)
November 6, 2012 Filing 1412 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 5:1201458, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02061-RWS. (DLB)
November 5, 2012 Filing 1411 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. New York, Case No. 5:1201458. (DLB)
November 2, 2012 Filing 1410 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Notice of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) (Geist, Melissa)
November 2, 2012 Filing 1409 NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Yoo, Thomas)
November 2, 2012 Filing 1408 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Beth S. Guthrie, Chuck Guthrie Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and/or Limit Testimony of Defense Expert, Charles Eby, M.D., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Case No. 4:09-cv-01217, Guthrie, et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al. (Alvarez, Alex)
November 2, 2012 Filing 1407 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN RICHART, M.D. (Yoo, Thomas)
November 2, 2012 Filing 1406 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. Notice of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Geist, Melissa)
November 2, 2012 Filing 1405 NOTICE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN RICHART, M.D.: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Yoo, Thomas)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1404 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. Notice of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Geist, Melissa)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1403 NOTICE of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Directed to Punitive Damages Claims in Case No. 4:09-cv-01217, Guthrie, et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al.: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc. (Strauss, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1402 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc. (Notice of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) (Geist, Melissa)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1401 NOTICE of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Case No. 4:08-cv-01318, Winder, et al v. Organon USA, Inc., et al.: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon USA, Inc. (Strauss, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1400 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-145) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: MURPHY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, District of Columbia, Case No. 1:1201710, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02035-RWS, Fair v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D Virginia, Case No. 3:1200733, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02036-RWS, House v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1205907, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-02037-RWS (DLB)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1399 NOTICE of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Directed to Punitive Damages Claims in Case No. 4:08-cv-0558, Prather v. Organon USA, Inc., et al.: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc. (Strauss, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1398 NOTICE by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon, Inc. NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Geist, Melissa)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1397 NOTICE of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon USA, Inc. in Case No. 4:10-cv-0177, Allen v. Organon, et al. (Strauss, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 Filing 1396 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-145) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. MURPHY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, District of Columbia, Case No. 1:1201710, Fair v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D Virginia, Case No. 3:1200733, House v. Organon USA Inc et al, W.D. Washington, Case No. 3:1205907. (DLB)
October 31, 2012 Filing 1395 NOTICE Corrected Notice of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment: by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon USA, Inc., Schering-Plough Corporation (Strauss, Stephen)
October 31, 2012 Filing 1394 NOTICE Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Case No. 4:08-cv-1403: by Defendants Akzo Nobel NV, Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon USA, Inc., Schering-Plough Corporation (Strauss, Stephen)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1391 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Memoranda in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment in Excess of This Court's Page Limit by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/31/12. (ARL)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to file any case specific Daubert motions and motions for summary judgment addressing the eight final trial pool cases shall be extended by two days. These motions shall be filed no later than November 1, 2012. Response briefs shall be filed no later than December 19, 2012. Reply briefs shall be filed no later than January 10, 2013. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/30/12. (LAH)
October 30, 2012 Filing 1391 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Memoranda in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment in Excess of This Court's Page Limit by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motions to file Daubert motions under seal [s 1282, 1284, 1286] are DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall unseal all the documents filed in support or opposition of all the Daubert motions filed in this matter.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/25/12. (LGK)
October 19, 2012 Filing 1389 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-144) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Charley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202542, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01897-RWS, D'Amore v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202543, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01898-RWS, Medrano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202544, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01899-RWS. (DLB)
October 19, 2012 Filing 1388 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-144) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Charley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202542, D'Amore v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202543, Medrano v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202544. (DLB)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1387 DOCUMENT re #1381 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54G, #2 Exhibit 54H, #3 Exhibit 54I, #4 Exhibit 54J, #5 Exhibit 54K, #6 Exhibit 54L, #7 Exhibit 55, #8 Exhibit 56)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1386 DOCUMENT re #1381 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54A, #2 Exhibit 54B, #3 Exhibit 54C, #4 Exhibit 54D, #5 Exhibit 54E, #6 Exhibit 54F)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1385 DOCUMENT re #1381 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11A, #2 Exhibit 11B, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit 32)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1384 DOCUMENT re #1381 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10F, #2 Exhibit 10G, #3 Exhibit 10H, #4 Exhibit 10I, #5 Exhibit 10J, #6 Exhibit 10K)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1383 DOCUMENT re #1381 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10A, #7 Exhibit 10B, #8 Exhibit 10C, #9 Exhibit 10D, #10 Exhibit 10E)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1382 DOCUMENT re #1380 Response in Opposition to Motion,, to Exclude Testimony of Shelley Ann Tischkau, Ph.D. by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 25A, #5 Exhibit 25B, #6 Exhibit 25C, #7 Exhibit 25D, #8 Exhibit 25E, #9 Exhibit 25F, #10 Exhibit 25G, #11 Exhibit 25H, #12 Exhibit 25I, #13 Exhibit 25J, #14 Exhibit 25K, #15 Exhibit 25L, #16 Exhibit 26, #17 Exhibit 27)(Denton, Roger)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1381 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1309 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Related to "Bursts" or "High Variability" in NuvaRing's Estrogen Delivery filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21A, #11 Exhibit 21B, #12 Exhibit 22, #13 Exhibit 23, #14 Exhibit 25, #15 Exhibit 26, #16 Exhibit 27, #17 Exhibit 28, #18 Exhibit 29, #19 Exhibit 30, #20 Exhibit 31, #21 Exhibit 33, #22 Exhibit 34, #23 Exhibit 35, #24 Exhibit 36, #25 Exhibit 37, #26 Exhibit 38, #27 Exhibit 39, #28 Exhibit 40, #29 Exhibit 41, #30 Exhibit 42, #31 Exhibit 43, #32 Exhibit 44, #33 Exhibit 45, #34 Exhibit 46, #35 Exhibit 47, #36 Exhibit 48, #37 Exhibit 49, #38 Exhibit 50, #39 Exhibit 51, #40 Exhibit 52, #41 Exhibit 53)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1380 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1297 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Shelley Ann Tischkau, Ph.D filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit 22, #20 Exhibit 23, #21 Exhibit 24)(Denton, Roger)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1379 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1307 MOTION to Exclude Opinions that Hormone "Counterbalance" or Surrogate Markers Can Assess the Risk of VTE in the Use of Hormonal Contraceptives filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Denton, Roger)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1378 DOCUMENT re #1377 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1377 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1305 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony Regarding Opinion That NuvaRing Should Be Taken Off The Market filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1376 DOCUMENT re #1375 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8A, #4 Exhibit 8B)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1375 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1299 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' "FDA Expert" Suzanne Parisian, M.D. filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10)(Kraft, Kristine)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1374 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1311 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Hans Rekers filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Geist, Melissa)
October 16, 2012 Filing 1373 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1313 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Titia Mulders filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Geist, Melissa)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1369 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Responses In Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts and Testimony Regarding General Topics in Excess of this Court's Page Limit Pursuant to Local Rule 7-4.01(D) by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Kraft, Kristine) filed by Diane M. Agresta, Crystal Bush, Angela Buffum, AMBER BOCK ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/16/12. (ARL)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1368 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Memoranda in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Experts by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/16/12. (ARL)
October 15, 2012 Filing 1370 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1315 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness David Grimes Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness David Grimes, M.D. filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Geist, Melissa)
October 15, 2012 Filing 1369 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Responses In Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts and Testimony Regarding General Topics in Excess of this Court's Page Limit Pursuant to Local Rule 7-4.01(D) by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, Crystal Bush. (Kraft, Kristine)
October 15, 2012 Filing 1368 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Memoranda in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Experts by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
October 15, 2012 Filing 1367 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-143) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: BOTTOMS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 3:1200129, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01856-RWS, Stough v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1201895, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01857-RWS, Burton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 2:1200661, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01858-RWS, ISAAC v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203240, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01859-RWS, TURPIN et al v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203303, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01860-RWS, PALLE et al v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203999, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01861-RWS, Stojan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201993, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01862-RWS, Holgate v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202117, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01863-RWS, Smedley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202140, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01864-RWS, Macioch v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202485, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01865-RWS, Piatt v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202486, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01866-RWS, Hirtzel v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202487, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01867-RWS, Olivares v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202488, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01868-RWS, Levi v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202489, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01869-RWS, Zarella v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202490, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01870-RWS, Schoenrock v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202491, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01871-RWS, Ferguson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202493, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01872-RWS Carthon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1201896, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01873-RWS, Nicole Hennessey et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 5:1201444, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01878-RWS. (DLB) Modified on 10/16/2012 (DLB).
October 12, 2012 Filing 1366 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-143) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Nicole Hennessey et al v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 5:1201444, BOTTOMS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, S.D. Indiana, Case No. 3:1200129, Stojan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201993, Holgate v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202117, Smedley v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202140, Macioch v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202485, Piatt v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202486, Hirtzel v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202487, Olivares v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202488, Levi v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202489, Zarella v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202490, Schoenrock v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202491, Ferguson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202493, ISAAC v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203240, TURPIN et al v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203303, PALLE et al v. ORGANON USA INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203999, Stough v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1201895, Carthon v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 1:1201896, Burton v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 2:1200661. (DLB)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiff's claimsagainst the non-diverse defendants: Betty Jean Kerr, Peoples Health Centers, Yvonne Treece, M.D., and Sherrill M. Jackson, PNP are REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/11/12. (LAH)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to sever the claims in this matter [# 4] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in this matter, no later than October 26, 2012, limiting her claims to those against the Organon Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to remand her severed claims against the non-diverse defendants: Betty Jean Kerr, Peoples Health Centers, Yvonne Treece, M.D., and Sherrill M. Jackson, PNP [#11] is GRANTED. After remand, Plaintiff shall file an amended petition in state court removing the claims asserted against the Organon Defendants. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/11/12. (LAH)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to drop and dismiss the claims of Plaintiffs based on misjoinder [#15] is GRANTED. The dismissal order for these Plaintiffs will be entered on November 9, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Angela Postley shall file an amended complaint in this Court, with allegations specific to her claims only, no later than November 9, 2012. This case will then be transferred to the Northern District Of Iowa. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dropped Plaintiffs have until November 9, 2012 to file new complaints, in a venue that is proper for each Plaintiff. The dropped Plaintiffs who file a new lawsuit by that date will be deemed to have an ongoing action in this Court for all purposes during the time period between today's date and the filing of their new complaints. For purposes of the application of statutes of limitations, laches, or other time bar laws, the filing date of a newly filed action pursuant to this Order will be deemed to relate back to the date that the dropped Plaintiff originally filed her complaint in this Court, insofar as the new complaint alleges only the claims alleged in the original complaint and joins only the defendants named (or fewer) in the original complaint or the successors of such original defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dropped Plaintiffs will be dismissed from this lawsuit without prejudice on November 9, 2012 whether or not they have filed a new lawsuit as directed by this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a notice in this case by November9, 2012 listing the court name and case number, if any, where a new lawsuit was filed for each Plaintiff besides Postley.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/10/12. (LAH)
October 9, 2012 Filing 1362 TRANSCRIPT proceedings of Status Conference Via Telephone held on October 4, 2012 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White. (RAK)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for a protective order #1171 and Plaintiffs' motion to compel Samy Suissa to produce documents #1222 are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/4/12. (ARL)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status teleconference is set in this matter on November 20, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than November 16, 2012. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/4/12. (ARL)
October 4, 2012 Filing 1359 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-142) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1200239, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01801-RWS, Monnin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, Case No. 3:1200240 3:1200239, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01802-RWS. (DLB)
October 4, 2012 Filing 1358 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-142) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Johnson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1200239, Monnin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, Case No. 3:1200240. (DLB)
October 2, 2012 Filing 1357 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1334 Order,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Submission of Agenda for October 4, 2012 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Angela Buffum, KAZAN CLARK. (Kraft, Kristine)
September 27, 2012 Filing 1356 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-141) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Lee v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202340, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01750-RWS, NIXON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1201278, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01751-RWS, Klein v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1201338, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01752-RWS.(DLB)
September 27, 2012 Filing 1355 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-141) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Klein v. Organon USA Inc et al, C.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1201338, Lee v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202340, NIXON v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, W.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1201278. (DLB)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference in this matter set on October 4, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. shall be conducted as a teleconference. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/26/12. (LGK)
September 24, 2012 Filing 1353 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-140) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Case transferred in: Haverstick v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1200406, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01716-RWS. (DLB)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1352 ENTRY of Appearance by Lee J. Hollis for Plaintiff Evonda Page. (Hollis, Lee)
September 21, 2012 Filing 1351 ENTRY of Appearance by Lee J. Hollis for Plaintiff Keisha Huffman. (Hollis, Lee)
September 20, 2012 Filing 1350 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-140) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Haverstick v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Iowa, Case No. 4:1200406.(DLB)
September 19, 2012 Filing 1349 ENTRY of Appearance by Lee J. Hollis for Plaintiffs Shantarias Johnson, De-Kisha Jones, Sheryl Alexander, Denise Green, Melanie Barnett, Beverly Henson. (Hollis, Lee)
September 18, 2012 Filing 1348 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-139) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Johnson v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 2:1202802, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01690-RWS, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1200912, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01691-RWS, Alexander v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201222, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01686-RWS, Green v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201544, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01688-RWS, Shanklin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202139, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01689-RWS, FONTANEZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1202853, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01682-RWS, KELLEY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203086, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01683-RWS, MAKLAD et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203117, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01684-RWS, DRAKE v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203280, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01685-RWS, Barnett v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:1200351, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01692-RWS, Henson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:1200352, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01693-RWS, Huffman v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, M.D. Alabama, Case No. 3:1200747, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01702-RWS, Green v. Organon USA Incorporated et al, D. Arizona, Case No. 2:1201742, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01703-RWS.(DLB) Modified on 9/20/2012 (DLB).
September 17, 2012 Filing 1347 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-139) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Huffman v. Organon USA, Inc., et al, M.D. Alabama, Case No. 3:1200747, McElroy v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 2:1202539, Johnson v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 2:1202802, Green v. Organon USA Incorporated et al, D. Arizona, Case No. 2:1201742, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Illinois, Case No. 3:1200912, Alexander v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201222, Green v. Organon USA, Inc, et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201544, Shanklin v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202139, FONTANEZ v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1202853, KELLEY v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203086, MAKLAD et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203117, DRAKE v. ORGANON USA, INC et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1203280, Barnett v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:1200351, Henson v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, E.D. Oklahoma, Case No. 6:1200352. (DLB)
September 7, 2012 Filing 1346 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-138) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Cases transferred in: Cortese v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202103, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01607-RWSFiedler v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202111, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01608-RWS Bell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202112, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01609-RWS Jeudy v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202113, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01610-RWS Edlbreck v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202114, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01611-RWS Goodrich v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202115, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01612-RWS Black v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202116, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01613-RWS Gesch v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202118, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01614-RWS. (DLB)
September 7, 2012 Filing 1345 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-138) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Cortese v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202103, Fiedler v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202111, Bell v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202112, Jeudy v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202113, Edlbreck v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202114, Goodrich v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202115, Black v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202116, Gesch v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1202118. (DLB)
September 6, 2012 Filing 1344 TRANSCRIPT proceedings of Motion and Status Hearing held on 8/23/2012 before Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon White, Telephone number 3142447966. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2012. (RAK)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defts' motions to file Daubert motions under seal [#'s 1282, 1284, 1286] are GRANTED IN PART. The Clerk of Court shall unseal only Pltfs. and Defts. Daubert motions and memorandums in support [#'s 1295, 1296, 1297, 1298, 1299, 1300, 1305, 1306, 1307, 1308, 1309, 1310, 1311, 1312, 1313, 1314, 1315, and 1316]. The exhibits to these motions shall remain under seal pending further review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pltfs' motion to strike defts' memorandums in further support of defts' motions to file documents under seal #1323 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/5/12. (LGK)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1342 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-137) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the anel. Case transferred in: Farrell v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201030, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01588-RWS. (DLB)
September 5, 2012 Filing 1341 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-137) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Farrell v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201030. (DLB)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1340 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1336 Response to Court Order Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Court Order Regarding Documents to be Unsealed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1339 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1335 Response to Court Order, Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Court Order Regarding Documents to be Maintained Under Seal by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks. (Kraft, Kristine)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1338 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-136) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Youmans v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:12 01989, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01537-RWS, York v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201990, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01538-RWS, Walker v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201991, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01539-RWS, McClellan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201992, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01540-RWS, Hinsch v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201994, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01541-RWS, Delcoro v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201995, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01542-RWS, Amendola v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0 1201996, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01543-RWS. (DLB)
August 28, 2012 Filing 1337 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-136) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Youmans v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:12 01989, York v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201990, Walker v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201991, McClellan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201992, Hinsch v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201994, Delcoro v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201995, Amendola v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0 1201996.(DLB)
August 27, 2012 Filing 1336 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENTS TO BE UNSEALED by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
August 27, 2012 Filing 1335 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENTS TO BE MAINTAINED UNDER SEAL by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 1334. Copy of Order #1334 sent to all non-registered ECF parties. Thu Aug 23 17:06:27 CDT 2012 (Luisetti, Andrea)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 ORDER: A status conference and hearing was held today, at which various issues were addressed. Based on the discussions and rulings at the conference the following is ordered: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any case specific Daubert motions and motions for summary judgment addressing the eight final trial pool cases shall be filed no later than October 31, 2012. Response briefs shall be filed no later than December 15, 2012. Reply briefs shall be filed no later than January 7, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that response briefs to the pending non-case specific Daubert motions shall be filed no later than October 16, 2012. Reply briefs shall be filed no later than November 6, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the first bellwether trial is set on May 6, 2013. Thespecific case to be tried will be identified at a future date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Prather v. Organon, 4:08CV558 RWS will be one of the first three cases tried in this District. At a future date, Defendants and Plaintiffs shall each select one of the remaining trial pool cases as the second and third case to proceed to trial. Defendants have agreed to waive Lexecon venue issues regarding these two cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to compel Sammy Suissa PH.D. to produce documents #1222 is DENIED. No later than September 3, 2012, Plaintiffs may file a motion to compel based on Suissa's deposition as discussed in today's conference. In addition, Plaintiffs may seek discovery of compensation Suissa received from Organon, or its successors, and their affiliates for any services provided to those entities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a list of documents in their pending Daubert motions that they seek to remain sealed, and shall file a list of any documents in Plaintiffs' pending Daubert motions which Defendants seek to remain sealed, no later than August 27, 2012. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' lists no later than August 28, 2012.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set on October 4, 2012 at10:30 a.m. The Court will address issues submitted by the parties in an agenda filed no later than October 2, 2012. Counsel who wish to monitor the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-888-684-8852 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 215-446-0155). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 6905106. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1111 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference will be activated at 10:15 a.m. so the conference may start promptly at 10:30 a.m. Counsel monitoring the conference must mute their phones so the proceeding is not interrupted by background noise. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/23/12. (ARL)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1333 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-135) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Case transferred in: Page v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 4:1202214, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01513-RWS. (DLB)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1332 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-135) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Page v. Organon USA Inc et al, D. South Carolina, Case No. 4:1202214. (DLB)
August 21, 2012 Filing 1331 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #1275 Order, Plaintiffs' Submission of Agenda for August 23, 2012 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, KAZAN CLARK, DEBORAH GRIMMEL. (Kraft, Kristine)
August 21, 2012 Filing 1330 MEMORANDUM (Proposed Agenda for August 23, 2012 Case Management Conference) by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1281 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Shelly Ann Tischkau, Ph.D. by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/21/2012. (RAK)
August 16, 2012 Filing 1328 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-134) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Stokes v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201540, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01468-RWS, Holland v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201541, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01469-RWS, Duncan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. California, Case No. 3:1201555, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01470-RWS, Bah v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201542, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01471-RWS, Abrizenski v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201864, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01472-RWS, Gault v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 2:1202134, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01473-RWS, Kelly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1201902, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01474-RWS, LEWIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1202327, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01475-RWS, HAGAN et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1202336, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01476-RWS, Volkman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1201759, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01477-RWS, Scott v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1201798, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01483-RWS, HARTSOCK v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1203618, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01484-RWS,Romak v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 2:1200606, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01496-RWS and Seyller vs. N.V. Organon et al., N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1205520, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01497-RWS .(DLB) Modified on 8/21/2012 (DLB).
August 14, 2012 Filing 1327 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-134) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Gault v. Organon USA Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 2:1202134, Duncan v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. California, Case No. 3:1201555, Scott v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Colorado, Case No. 1:1201798, Seyller vs. N.V. Organon et al., N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1205520, Stokes v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201540, Holland v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201541, Bah v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201542, Abrizenski v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201864, LEWIS v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, D. New Jersey, Case No. 2:1202327, HAGAN et al v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, New Jersey, Case No. 2: 1202336, Volkman v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, N.D. Ohio, Case No. 3:1201759, Romak v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Ohio, Case No. 2:1200606, HARTSOCK v. ORGANON USA, INC. et al, E.D. Pennsylvania, Case No. 2:1203618, Kelly v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, S.D. Texas, Case No. 4:1201902. (DLB)
August 9, 2012 Filing 1326 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-133) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Cases transferred in: Krane v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201830, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01411-RWS, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201836, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01412-RWS, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201837, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01413-RWS, French v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201838, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01414-RWS, Pitts v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201839, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01415-RWS, Sievers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201840, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01416-RWS, Saia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201842, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01417-RWS, Rutherford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201843, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01418-RWS, Luros v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201844, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01419-RWS, Hodges v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201845, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01420-RWS, Crawford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201846, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01421-RWS, Carr v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201848, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:12-cv-01422-RWS. (DLB)
August 9, 2012 Filing 1325 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1323 MOTION to Strike #1303 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1301 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1302 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Memorandum In Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal) filed by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa)
August 9, 2012 Filing 1324 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-133) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. MDL No. 1964 in re: NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation. Krane v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201830, Jones v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201836, Williams v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201837, French v. Organon USA, Inc et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201838, Pitts v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201839, Sievers v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201840, Saia v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201842, Rutherford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201843, Luros v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201844, Hodges v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201845, Crawford v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201846, Carr v. Organon USA, Inc. et al, D. Minnesota, Case No. 0:1201848. (DLB)
August 7, 2012 Filing 1323 MOTION to Strike #1303 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1301 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1302 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, KATY FITZSIMMONS. (Kraft, Kristine)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 STIPULATED ORDER Amending June 19, 2012 Order Regarding The Parties' Daubert Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/6/12. (LAH)
August 6, 2012 Filing 1321 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Daniel E. Phillips ;substituted for:Stacey Tjon Bossart by Plaintiff Kari Hatfield. (Miller, Mike)
August 6, 2012 Filing 1320 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Daniel E. Phillips ;substituted for:Stacey Tjon Bossart by Plaintiff Heather Davis. (Miller, Mike)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1285 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum in Support of their Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Kishore Udipi, Ph.D. in Excess of this Court's Page Limit by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/6/2012. (RAK)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1283 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' "FDA Expert" Suzanne Parisian, M.D. In Excess of This Court's Page Limit by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/6/2012. (RAK)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #1304 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation (Motion for Leave to File Defendants' Memoranda in Support of Their Daubert Motions in Excess of this Court's Page Limit) by Defendants Merck & Co., Inc., Organon International, Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc.. (Geist, Melissa) filed by Merck & Co., Inc., Organon Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. LLC, Organon USA, Inc., Organon International, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/6/2012. (RAK)
August 3, 2012 Filing 1316 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #1315 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness David Grimes filed by Plaintiffs Diane M. Agresta, AMBER BOCK, Allison Brooks, KAZAN CLARK. #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Kraft, Kristine)
August 3, 2012