Goebel v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: |
William Goebel |
Defendant: |
Robert Johnston and Catholic Archdiocese of St. Louis |
Case Number: |
4:2009cv00106 |
Filed: |
January 15, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
P.I.: Other Office |
County: |
Adair |
Presiding Judge: |
Mary Ann L. Medler |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 9, 2012 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Archdiocese of St. Louis for summary judgment [Doc. # 107 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant Rev. Robert Johnston for summary judgment [Doc. # 112 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' motions to have facts deemed admitted, legal arguments waived, and for entry of judgment [Doc. # 114 ] and # 115 ]are granted.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/09/2012. (DJO)
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing
80
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion [# 75 ] of the Archdiocese of St. Louis to amend the Court's orders dated August 21, 2009 and October 26, 2009 to certify issues for interlocutory appeal, is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that the Court's orders dated August 21, 2009 [# 59 ] and October 26, 2009 [# 71 ] are each amended to certify the following questions for immediate appeal: 1. Whether the Erie doctrine binds a federal court, sitting in diversity, to a state supreme court's finding that a negligent hiring and/or a negligent supervision claim against a religious organization is not legally viable solely because it is barred by the First Amendment? 2. If not, whether this Court's determination th at such claims do not violate the First Amendment is erroneous? IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in the current action are stayed, pending the outcome of the Archdiocese's application to the Court of Appeals for interlocutory review. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/09/2010; (DJO)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion [#50] of defendant Catholic Archdiocese of St. Louis to dismiss is granted as to Count VI of the amended complaint and is denied as to Count IV and Count V of the amended complaint. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that Count VI of the amended complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim as to defendant Catholic Archdiocese of St. Louis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion [#40] of defendant Catholic Archdiocese of St. Louis to dismiss Counts IV, V, and VI of the original complaint is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 8/21/09. (KXS)
|
January 15, 2009 |
Filing
34
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri, Denying as moot 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catholic Archdiocese of St. Louis. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/15/09. (bkl)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?