Jones v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: |
Eugene Kenneth Jones |
Defendant: |
Marvin Johnson, Diana Bellenger, Amanda Falcon, Jerry Bingham, Michael Layden, John Bain, Steve Larkins, Patricia Cornell, Noel Mason and Randy Hartrup |
Case Number: |
4:2009cv00118 |
Filed: |
January 15, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
St. Francois |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry E. Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 7, 2014 |
Filing
109
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 84 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, (Doc. No. 84), is granted as to Plaintiff's access to the courts claim and denied as to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment cruel and unusual punishment claim. FURTHER ORDERED that judgment will be entered at the conclusion of all matters pending herein.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 1/7/14. (CEL)
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing
54
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.50 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an appellate proceeding. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 1/13/10. (CLA)
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing
47
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's pro se motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal 45 is STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall not submit any future pro se pleadings, motions, or other papers while he is represented by counsel in this action. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 12/10/09. (copy of order mailed to Plaintiff)(TRC)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing
38
OPINION, MEMORANDUM ORDER re: 17 Plaintiff's claims against defendants Bingham, Layden, Bain, Cornell, Mason and Hartrup fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; therefore, these claims will be dismissed. As a result, the only cl aims still pending in this action are those against defendants Marvin Johnson, Diana Bollinger, Amanda Falcon, Steve Larkins. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [doc. #17] is granted in part, and denied in part. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 11/18/09. (CSR)
|
February 3, 2009 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pltff.'s 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, defts. shall reply to pltff.'s claims with the time provided by the applicable provisions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/3/09. (CLA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?