Williams v. Boesing et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Defendant: Bryan Boesing, Joni Light, Larry Cornell, Kenneth Hovis, Lisa Jones, John Doe, Missouri Department of Corrections, Uknown Newberry, Patricia Cornell, Robert Wallace, Allen D. Luebbers and Larry Crawford
Case Number: 4:2009cv00753
Filed: May 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION,MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 79 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 79], is GRANTED. A separate judgment is entered this same date on all claims. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 4/24/12. (CEL)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order without Notice or Preliminary Injunction, [Doc. No. 49 ], is stricken from this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file this pleading as an initial pleading in a new case, and assign the case by random assignment. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 8/15/11. (TRC)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION MEMORANDUM & ORDER re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bryan Boesing, Defendant Uknown Newberry. The Complaint against Defendant Boesing in his official capacity is dismissed. Plaintiffs Complaint fails to state a claim for vio lations of his Fourteenth Amendment Due Process rights based on §§ 217.405 and 217.010 RSMo. Plaintiffs Complaint also fails to state a cause of action based on Defendants alleged failure to follow prison regulations. Plaintiffs Complaint, however withstands Defendants 12(b) (6) challenge in all other respects. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal, [Doc. No. 10], is granted in part and denied in part. See Order for further details. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 04/15/2010. (CBL)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1915(e)(2)(B): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, as to defendants Joni Light, Larry Cornell, Kenneth Hovis, Lisa Jones, John Doe, Missouri Department of Corrections, Patricia Cornell, Robert Wallace, Allen Lue bbers, and Larry Crawford, plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Party Larry Crawford; John Doe; Kenneth Hovis; Lisa Jones; Joni Light; Allen D. Luebbers; Missouri Department of Corrections; Robert Wallace; Larry Cornell and Patricia Cornell terminated. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/14/09. (TRC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Boesing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Boesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hovis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Newberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen D. Luebbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?