Dykes v. Murphy et al
Plaintiff: |
Harold Stephen Dykes |
Defendant: |
Brian Murphy, Douglas Montgomery, John Prier and Mark Memharck |
Case Number: |
4:2009cv01062 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Mississippi |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry E. Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 20, 2010 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $24.25 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. ( Response to Court due by 8/19/2010.) Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/20/2010. (CBL)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing
32
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [Doc. #31] is HELD IN ABEYANCE until plaintiff submits a certified prisoner account statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file a ce rtified copy of his prisoner account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of his notice of appeal on June 24, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to submit a certified copy of his prisoner account statement within thirty days from the date of this order, the Court will order him to pay the full $455 filing and docketing fees for filing an appeal. Response to Court due by 7/28/2010. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 6/28/10. (CLA)
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing
24
OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, 12 is GRANTED. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 6/3/10. (TRC)
|
July 14, 2009 |
Filing
6
OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $18.82 within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that theremittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/14/09. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/14/09. (TRC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?