February 27, 2012 |
Filing
119
ORDER Jury Trial set for 7/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10N before Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. Pretrial Compliance due by 6/13/2012. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/27/12. (CLA)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
89
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 79 MOTION to Depose parties filed by Jeremiah R. Washington is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 78 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Jeremiah R. Washington is denied without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 4/20/11. (CLA) Copy mailed to petitioner.
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing
65
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 63 , 59 ORDERED that plaintiff's motions relating to the substitution of three of the John Doe defendants [Doc. #59 and #63] are GRANTED insofar as the Court will substitute Unknown Irby, Terry Atchison and Sergeant Dav id Novak for John Does 1-2 and John Doe Sergeant, respectively. TheClerk of the Court shall modify the docket in accordance with this request. ORDERED that due to plaintiff's pauper status, and in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Clerk of Co urt shall effectuate service on Unknown Irby, Terry Atchison and David Novak, correctional officers employed by the State of Missouri, as outlined in the waiver agreement between this Court andthe Office of the Missouri Attorney General. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/15/11. (CEL)
|
October 1, 2010 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to amend his complaint by interlineation [Doc. #41] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time to respond to some unnamed deadline [Doc. #42 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #43] is DENIED, without prejudice, at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide to plaintiff, along with a copy of this Order, a b lank complaint form for the filing of a civil rights complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth above, no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint or fails to comply with the instructions set forth above relating to the filingof the amended complaint, the Court shall dismiss this action without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that upon the filing of the amended complaint,it will be subject to review under 28 U.S.C. § 1915. 43 42 41 ( Response to Court due by 11/1/2010.) Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 10/1/10. cc: copy of complaint mailed to pltff.(CLA)
|
June 17, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Bryan Hoskins Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 10) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for States Provision of Funding for Access to Courts (Doc. No. 17) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Extension of Time (Doc. No. 19) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion Ordering Defendants Attorney to Provide the Court with the Current Contact Information on Defendants John Does 1-4 and John DoeSergeant (Doc. No. 21) is DENIED without prejudice. 10 19 21 17 Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 6/17/10. (CLA)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing
5
ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1915(e)(2)(B): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, as to defendants Unknown Doe, Lynn Calcote, Unknown Phillips, Unknown ONeil, Unknown Wade, Unknown Novak, Jane Doe, and John Doe (Lieutenant), plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 2/12/10. (TRC)
|