Small Hearts Daycare II, LLC et al v. Quick
Plaintiff: Small Hearts Daycare II, LLC and Walter Coleman
Defendant: Kathy Quick
Case Number: 4:2009cv02132
Filed: December 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration, [Doc. No.191], is denied. 191 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/18/14. (CLA)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER--IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 147 ] is granted. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 01/16/2014. (CLK)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Small Hearts Daycare Center II, LLC and Walter Colemans Motion to Compel Disclosure Against Kathy Quick [ECF No. 136] is GRANTED, and Defendant Quick shall disclose any and all non-redacted no tice(s) of nonrenewal of daycare license issued by her or her predecessor(s) since January 1, 2004. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Small Hearts Daycare Center II, LLC and Walter Colemans request for attorneys fees is DENIED. 136 Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 3/13/13. (CLA)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Kathy Quick's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [ECF No. 90 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Strike [ECF No. 120 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/30/12. (TRC)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that as discovery has been stayed pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss Case [Doc. 90], the trial setting in this matter is vacated to be reset upon ruling on said motion. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/6/12. (CLA)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Small Hearts Daycare Center II, LLC and Walter Colemans Motion for Interim Attorneys Fees Against Kathy Quick in her Official Capacity [ECF No. 44] is DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Oral Argument on Pending Motion for Interim Attorneys Fees Against Kathy Quick in Her Official Capacity [ECF No. 121] is DENIED as moot. 44 121 Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/9/12. (CLA)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: 29 Consent MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Kathy Quick, Plaintiff Small Hearts Daycare II, LLC, Plaintiff Walter Coleman. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/8/10. (TRC)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, [Doc. No. 2], is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the Missouri Department of Health and Senior Services and Kathy Quick and their agents, servants, employe es, and representatives are hereby enjoined and restrained from communicating orally or in writing that Small Hearts Daycare II, LLC is operating without a license or that Walter Coleman is operating Small Hearts Daycare II, LLC without a license, ex cept where such communication is required by law. FURTHER ORDERED that the Missouri Department of Health and Senior Services and Kathy Quick shall, not later than Tuesday, February 2, 2010, mail or otherwise provide a copy of this Order to each of th e individuals, agenciesand other entities whom they previously informed of the denial of Plaintiffs'application for renewal of child care license. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall be allowed to continue to operate as a licensed child-care f acility during the pendency of all administrative proceedings involving the renewal of Plaintiffs' child-care facility license issued on October 22, 2007. FURTHER ORDERED that this Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until February 8, 2010, unless extended by the Court or by agreement of the parties. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/1/10. (CEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Small Hearts Daycare II, LLC et al v. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Small Hearts Daycare II, LLC
Represented By: Rufus J. Tate, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Coleman
Represented By: Rufus J. Tate, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?