Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri v. Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.
Plaintiff: Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.
Case Number: 4:2010cv01230
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: David D. Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. 79 is DENIED. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 6/19/12. (LAH)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Thompson Coburn LLP's Motion to Quash the Subpoena Directed to Ms. Sara Kotthoff and for Protective Order [ECF No. 98] is GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are prohibited from taking the deposition of Ms. Kotthoff on March 29, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a conference is scheduled for April 2, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. The conference will be held by telephone with Defendants initiating the call. The phone number for Judge Ross's chambers is (314) 244-7560. At the conference, counsel will be expected to discuss rescheduling Ms. Kotthoff's deposition.. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 3/28/12. (LGK)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.s motion for leave to supplement the record is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 65)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.s motionto dismiss Counts I, II, and III is DENIED. (Doc. No. 41) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Defendants Wachovia Bank, N.A., n/k/a Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; and Wachovia Securities, LLC to dismiss Counts V and VI is DENIED. (Doc. No. 44) Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/2/11. (JWJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri v. Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri
Represented By: John Gianoulakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N. A.
Represented By: Adam S. Hochschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?