Ladd
Plaintiff: |
Abu Bakr Ladd |
Defendant: |
City of St. Louis, Missouri, State of Missouri, St. Louis Board of Police Commissioners, Jeffrey Pickering, Scott McKelvey, Paul M. Nocchiero, Joseph Lehman, Jack Huelsmann, Daniel Isom, David Heath, Joseph Mokwa and Luke J. Adler |
Case Number: |
4:2010cv02219 |
Filed: |
November 29, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
160
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed by Defendants David Heath, Jack Huelsmann, Daniel Isom, Joseph Lehman, Joseph Mokwa, and Paul Nocchiero is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 150 .) All claims against all parties having been resolved, a separate Judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 25, 2015. (BRP)
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
144
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to alter, amend, or vacate the judgment in this matter is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: (Doc. No. 136 .) a. Plaintiff has alleged a claim for conspiracy by t he SLMPD Defendants in their individual capacities to violate his First Amendment rights by denying him access to the courts. The prior judgment entered herein is hereby amended to reflect this determination and this action shall proceed on the Fi rst Amendment claim alone. b. All other grounds for reconsideration lack merit and, to the extent that it resolves all other pending claims, the remainder of the prior judgment shall stand. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, in light of this Order, that Defendant's Motion for Bill of Costs (Doc. No. 134 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/2/2014. (NEB)
|
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings with respect to Plaintiffs third amended complaint is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 108.) re: 108 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Jack Huelsmann, Defendant Joseph Lehman, Defendant Paul Nocchiero, Defendant David Heath, Defendant Joseph Mokwa, Defendant Daniel W. Isom Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/2/14. (JWJ)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
97
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's second amended complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Doc. No. 89.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the references in Count I of Pl aintiff's second amended complaint to claims arising under "42 U.S.C. §§ 1985(3), 1986, 1988, Title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 and other federal laws" shall be stricken as Plaintiff's alleged claims under those s tatutes were previously dismissed with prejudice for the reasons set forth in the Court's March 31, 2012 Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count II of Plaintiff's second amended complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice f or failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted as set forth in the Court's March 31, 2012 Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's demands for declaratory and injunctive relief under 42 U.S.C. § § 1981, 1985(3), 1986, 1988, Title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 and other federal laws in Count IV of Plaintiff's second amended complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice. To the extent that Plaintiff alleges claims for declaratory and i njunctive relief under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and against the Defendants in their individual capacities, such claims for relief remain......SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DTEAILS. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/14/2012.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/7/2012. (NCL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?