Square, Inc. et al v. REM Holdings 3, LLC
Plaintiff: James McKelvey, Jr. and Square, Inc.
Defendant: REM Holdings 3, LLC and David H. Chervitz
Undetermined: Robert E. Morley, Jr. and Jack Dorsey
Case Number: 4:2010cv02243
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 360. Wed Aug 17 09:08:11 CDT 2016 (Schaefer, Michelle)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER re #359 Joint MOTION to Return Sealed Documents filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr. This matter is before the Court on the parties joint motion for return of sealed filings. To the extent hard copies of sealed documents were filed with or provided to the Court, those hard copies will be destroyed. The motion to destroy the electronic copies of sealed documents filed with the Court is overruled. Those documents will remain on the Court's CM/ECF site under seal. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/16/16. (CSG)
August 15, 2016 Filing 359 Joint MOTION to Return Sealed Documents by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Stewart, Christopher)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Robert E. Morley, Jr., REM Holdings 3, LLC, Square, Inc., Jack Dorsey, and James McKelvey, Jr., by and through their undersigned counsel, have filed a Stipulation for Dismissal to advise the Court that all matters, controversies, and claims made by and between all parties in these consolidated actions, including all counterclaims, have been fully and finally settled and compromised. Accordingly, pursuant to Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 41(a)(1(A)(ii), it is hereby ORDERED that both consolidated matters are dismissed in their entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs, with the exception that this Court's order of March 16, 2011, imposing sanctions remains in effect, in part, as per this Court's separate order of this date. SO ORDERED this 17th day of June, 2016. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/17/16. Associated Cases: 4:10-cv-02243-SNLJ, 4:14-cv-00172-SNLJ(CSG)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #355 Motion to Vacate #355 MOTION to Vacate #55 Order, #36 Memorandum & Order, UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE SANCTIONS. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/17/16. (CSG)
June 16, 2016 Filing 356 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #355 MOTION to Vacate #55 Order,, #36 Memorandum & Order,,, UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE SANCTIONS filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
June 16, 2016 Filing 355 MOTION to Vacate #55 Order,, #36 Memorandum & Order,,, UNOPPOSED MOTION TO VACATE SANCTIONS by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
June 16, 2016 Filing 354 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Consent Order of Dismissal)(Cassady, Jason)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #327 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to exclude in part the testimony of Dr. Daniel Engels (#327) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as described herein. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/11/16. (CSG)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #314 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI filed by Counter Defendant James McKelvey, Jr., Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendant Square, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to exclude in part the testimony of James Malackowski (#314) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/29/16. (CSG)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Counter Defendant James McKelvey, Jr., Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendant Square, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment (#296) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/22/16. (CSG) (Main Document 351 replaced on 4/22/2016 with copy that contains signature and NEF regenerated) (CSG).
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #349 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #155 Case Management Order - Amended, JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/20/16. (CSG)
April 20, 2016 Filing 349 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #155 Case Management Order - Amended,,, JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
March 14, 2016 Filing 348 SEALED DOCUMENT re #342 Surreply to Motion - FILED UNDER SEAL, DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
March 9, 2016 Filing 347 SURREPLY to Motion re #327 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (CSG)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #344 MOTION for Leave to FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Krevitt, Josh) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/9/16. (CSG)
March 8, 2016 Filing 345 SEALED DOCUMENT re #344 MOTION for Leave to FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS - Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Ascher in Support of Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit 1 of Ascher Declaration)(Krevitt, Josh)
March 8, 2016 Filing 344 MOTION for Leave to FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Krevitt, Josh)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #339 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Regarding Dkt. No. 314 by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr., #341 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Plaintiffs Robert E. Morley, Jr. and REM Holdings 3, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Oversized Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTIONS ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/8/16. (CSG)
March 7, 2016 Filing 342 SURREPLY to Motion re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 64, #4 Exhibit 65, #5 Exhibit 66)(Curry, John)
March 7, 2016 Filing 341 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Plaintiffs Robert E. Morley, Jr. and REM Holdings 3, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Oversized Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
March 7, 2016 Filing 340 SEALED DOCUMENT re #339 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Regarding Dkt. No. 314 Ex. A Plaintiffs Robert E. Morley, Jr. and REM Holdings 3, LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of James E. Malackowski by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
March 7, 2016 Filing 339 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Regarding Dkt. No. 314 by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Docket Text ORDER: DTO #336 is VACATED, Doc. 335 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/16. (CSG)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #332 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/16. (CSG)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #335 MOTION for Hearing re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / Request for Oral Argument by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) Modified on 3/3/2016 (LMR). filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/16. (CSG)
March 2, 2016 Filing 335 MOTION for Hearing re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / Request for Oral Argument by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) Modified on 3/3/2016 (LMR).
March 2, 2016 Filing 334 REPLY to Response to Motion re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 COMBINED STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Vincent, #3 Exhibit 301, #4 Exhibit 302, #5 Exhibit 303, #6 Exhibit 304, #7 Exhibit 305, #8 Exhibit 306, #9 Exhibit 307, #10 Exhibit 308, #11 Exhibit 309, #12 Exhibit 310, #13 Exhibit 311, #14 Exhibit 312, #15 Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS, #16 Exhibit 1, #17 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Burke)(Snyder, Orin)
March 2, 2016 Filing 333 REPLY to Response to Motion re #327 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summers Declaration, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Curry, John)
March 2, 2016 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
March 2, 2016 Filing 331 REPLY to Response to Motion re #314 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christine Demana, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I)(Snyder, Orin)
February 26, 2016 Filing 330 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #327 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS - DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Krevitt, Josh)
February 23, 2016 Filing 329 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #314 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Summers Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Curry, John)
February 19, 2016 Filing 328 SEALED DOCUMENT re #327 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stewart Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Curry, John)
February 19, 2016 Filing 327 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. DANIEL ENGELS by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
February 18, 2016 Filing 326 SEALED DOCUMENT re #317 Response to Motion (SEALED), Corrected Declaration of Robert E. Morley, Jr. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #316 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Oversized Memoranda in Support of Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/18/16. (CSG)
February 18, 2016 Filing 324 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #316 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Oversized Memoranda in Support of Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
February 18, 2016 Filing 323 SEALED DOCUMENT re #317 Response to Motion (SEALED), Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment w/ Exhibits 32 to 62 (Part 2 of 2) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45, #15 Exhibit 46, #16 Exhibit 47, #17 Exhibit 48, #18 Exhibit 49, #19 Exhibit 50, #20 Exhibit 51, #21 Exhibit 52, #22 Exhibit 53, #23 Exhibit 54, #24 Exhibit 55, #25 Exhibit 56, #26 Exhibit 57, #27 Exhibit 58, #28 Exhibit 59, #29 Exhibit 60, #30 Exhibit 61, #31 Exhibit 62)(Curry, John)
February 18, 2016 Filing 322 SEALED DOCUMENT re #317 Response to Motion (SEALED), Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment w/ Exhibits 1 to 31 (Part 1 of 2) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31)(Curry, John)
February 18, 2016 Filing 321 SEALED DOCUMENT re #317 Response to Motion (SEALED), Declaration of James E. Malackowski in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Curry, John)
February 18, 2016 Filing 320 SEALED DOCUMENT re #317 Response to Motion (SEALED), Declaration of Dr. Mark T. Jones in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Curry, John)
February 18, 2016 Filing 319 SEALED DOCUMENT re #317 Response to Motion (SEALED), Declaration of Robert E. Morley, Jr. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
February 17, 2016 Filing 318 SEALED DOCUMENT re #317 Response to Motion (SEALED), Combined Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
February 17, 2016 Filing 317 RESPONSE to Motion re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
February 17, 2016 Filing 316 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Oversized Memoranda in Support of Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
February 12, 2016 Filing 315 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #314 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Demana, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Snyder, Orin)
February 12, 2016 Filing 314 MOTION to Exclude IN PART THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JAMES E. MALACKOWSKI by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this Court's order dated February 2, 2016 is WITHDRAWN as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/10/16. (CSG)
February 9, 2016 Filing 312 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Robert E. Morley, Jr, and REM Holdings 3, LLC re #307 Notice (Other), (JMC)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #310 MOTION for Leave to Plaintiffs Robert E. Morley, Jr. and REM Holdings 3, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Regarding Dkt. No. 307 by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' Surreply)(Curry, John) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/9/2016. (JMC)
February 9, 2016 Filing 310 MOTION for Leave to Plaintiffs Robert E. Morley, Jr. and REM Holdings 3, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Regarding Dkt. No. 307 by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' Surreply)(Curry, John)
February 8, 2016 Filing 309 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. re #307 Notice (Other), #308 Notice (Other), DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO PROPOSED SCHEDULE (Krevitt, Josh)
February 6, 2016 Filing 308 NOTICE Plaintiffs Robert E. Morley, Jr. and REM Holdings 3, LLC's Response to Defendants' Proposed Schedule (Dkt. 307): by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #307 Notice (Other), (Curry, John)
February 5, 2016 Filing 307 NOTICE of DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR TRADE SECRET-RELATED DISCOVERY AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING ON TRADE SECRET ISSUES: by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Krevitt, Josh)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 **WITHDRAWN BY ORDER OF 2/10/16 (DOC. #313)** MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #283 MOTION to Strike #257 Order, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' NOVEMBER 25, 2015 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NUMBER FIVE filed by Counter Defendant James McKelvey, Jr., Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendant Square, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to strike plaintiffs' November 25, 2015 supplemental responses to defendants' Interrogatory No. 5 (#283) is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part as explained herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall submit a proposal forextending the period for discovery related to Trade Secret #2 and for briefing on the Trade Secret aspects of defendants' summary judgment motion no later than February 5, 2016. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/1/16. (CSG) Modified on 2/10/2016 (CSG).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #303 MOTION for Leave to FILE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM, STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS, DECLARATION OF BRIAN ASCHER, AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/26/16. (CSG)
January 26, 2016 Filing 304 SEALED DOCUMENT re #303 MOTION for Leave to FILE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM, STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS, DECLARATION OF BRIAN ASCHER, AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Snyder, Orin)
January 26, 2016 Filing 303 MOTION for Leave to FILE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM, STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS, DECLARATION OF BRIAN ASCHER, AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
January 21, 2016 Filing 302 SEALED DOCUMENT re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / DECLARATION OF BRIAN ASCHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PART 2) EXHIBITS 151 to 300 by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 151, #2 Exhibit 152, #3 Exhibit 153, #4 Exhibit 154, #5 Exhibit 155, #6 Exhibit 156, #7 Exhibit 157, #8 Exhibit 158, #9 Exhibit 159, #10 Exhibit 160, #11 Exhibit 161, #12 Exhibit 162, #13 Exhibit 163, #14 Exhibit 164, #15 Exhibit 165, #16 Form 166, #17 Exhibit 167, #18 Exhibit 168, #19 Exhibit 169, #20 Exhibit 170, #21 Exhibit 171, #22 Exhibit 172, #23 Exhibit 173, #24 Exhibit 174, #25 Exhibit 175, #26 Exhibit 176, #27 Exhibit 177, #28 Exhibit 178, #29 Exhibit 179, #30 Exhibit 180, #31 Exhibit 181, #32 Exhibit 182, #33 Exhibit 183, #34 Exhibit 184, #35 Exhibit 185, #36 Exhibit 186, #37 Exhibit 187, #38 Exhibit 188, #39 Exhibit 189, #40 Exhibit 190, #41 Exhibit 191, #42 Exhibit 192, #43 Exhibit 193, #44 Exhibit 194, #45 Exhibit 195, #46 Exhibit 196, #47 Exhibit 197, #48 Exhibit 198, #49 Exhibit 199, #50 Exhibit 200, #51 Exhibit 201, #52 Exhibit 202, #53 Exhibit 203, #54 Exhibit 204, #55 Exhibit 205, #56 Exhibit 206, #57 Exhibit 207, #58 Exhibit 208, #59 Exhibit 209, #60 Exhibit 210, #61 Exhibit 211, #62 Exhibit 212, #63 Exhibit 213, #64 Exhibit 214, #65 Exhibit 215, #66 Exhibit 216, #67 Exhibit 217, #68 Exhibit 218, #69 Exhibit 219, #70 Exhibit 220, #71 Exhibit 221, #72 Exhibit 222, #73 Exhibit 223, #74 Exhibit 224, #75 Exhibit 225, #76 Exhibit 226, #77 Exhibit 227, #78 Exhibit 228, #79 Exhibit 229, #80 Exhibit 230, #81 Exhibit 231, #82 Exhibit 232, #83 Exhibit 233, #84 Exhibit 234, #85 Exhibit 235, #86 Exhibit 236, #87 Exhibit 237, #88 Exhibit 238, Part 1, #89 Exhibit 238, Part 2, #90 Exhibit 238, Part 3, #91 Exhibit 238, Part 4, #92 Exhibit 238, Part 5, #93 Exhibit 238, Part 6, #94 Exhibit 238, Part 7, #95 Exhibit 239, #96 Exhibit 240, #97 Exhibit 241, #98 Exhibit 242, #99 Exhibit 243, #100 Exhibit 244, #101 Exhibit 245, #102 Exhibit 246, #103 Exhibit 247, #104 Exhibit 248, #105 Exhibit 249, Part 1, #106 Exhibit 249, Part 2, #107 Exhibit 250, #108 Exhibit 251, #109 Exhibit 252, #110 Exhibit 253, #111 Exhibit 254, #112 Exhibit 255, #113 Exhibit 256, #114 Exhibit 257, #115 Exhibit 258, #116 Exhibit 259, #117 Exhibit 260, #118 Exhibit 261, #119 Exhibit 262, #120 Exhibit 263, #121 Exhibit 264, #122 Exhibit 265, #123 Exhibit 266, #124 Exhibit 267, #125 Exhibit 268, #126 Exhibit 269, #127 Exhibit 270, #128 Exhibit 271, #129 Exhibit 272, #130 Exhibit 273, #131 Exhibit 274, #132 Exhibit 275, #133 Exhibit 276, #134 Exhibit 277, #135 Exhibit 278, #136 Exhibit 279, #137 Exhibit 280, #138 Exhibit 281, #139 Exhibit 282, #140 Exhibit 283, #141 Exhibit 284, #142 Exhibit 285, #143 Exhibit 286, #144 Exhibit 287, #145 Exhibit 288, #146 Exhibit 289, #147 Exhibit 290, #148 Exhibit 291, #149 Exhibit 292, #150 Exhibit 293, #151 Exhibit 294, #152 Exhibit 295, #153 Exhibit 296, #154 Exhibit 297, #155 Exhibit 298, #156 Exhibit 299, #157 Exhibit 300)(Snyder, Orin) (Main Document 302 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 65 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 72 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 148 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG).
January 21, 2016 Filing 301 SEALED DOCUMENT re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / DECLARATION OF BRIAN ASCHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT w/ Exhibits 1 to 150 (Part 1) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, Part 1, #87 Exhibit 86, Part 2, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, Part 1, #94 Exhibit 92, Part 2, #95 Exhibit 93, #96 Exhibit 94, #97 Exhibit 95, #98 Exhibit 96, #99 Exhibit 97, #100 Exhibit 98, #101 Exhibit 99, #102 Exhibit 100, #103 Exhibit 101, #104 Exhibit 102, #105 Exhibit 103, #106 Exhibit 104, #107 Exhibit 105, #108 Exhibit 106, #109 Exhibit 107, #110 Exhibit 108, #111 Exhibit 109, #112 Exhibit 110, #113 Exhibit 111, #114 Exhibit 112, #115 Exhibit 113, #116 Exhibit 114, #117 Exhibit 115, #118 Exhibit 116, #119 Exhibit 117, #120 Exhibit 118, #121 Exhibit 119, #122 Exhibit 120, #123 Exhibit 121, #124 Exhibit 122, #125 Exhibit 123, #126 Exhibit 124, #127 Exhibit 125, #128 Exhibit 126, #129 Exhibit 127, #130 Exhibit 128, #131 Exhibit 129, #132 Exhibit 130, #133 Exhibit 131, #134 Exhibit 132, #135 Exhibit 133, #136 Exhibit 134, #137 Exhibit 135, #138 Exhibit 136, #139 Exhibit 137, #140 Exhibit 138, #141 Exhibit 139, #142 Exhibit 140, #143 Exhibit 141, #144 Exhibit 142, #145 Exhibit 143, #146 Exhibit 144, #147 Exhibit 145, #148 Exhibit 146, #149 Exhibit 147, #150 Exhibit 148, #151 Exhibit 149, #152 Exhibit 150)(Snyder, Orin) (Main Document 301 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 14 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 42 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 50 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 70 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 103 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 105 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 107 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 117 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 122 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 123 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG). (Attachment 124 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG).
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #295 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED MEMORANDA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/21/16. (MRS)
January 21, 2016 Filing 299 SEALED DOCUMENT re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Main Document 299 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG).
January 21, 2016 Filing 298 SEALED DOCUMENT re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DECLARATION OF DANIEL ENGELS (FILED UNDER SEAL) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2016: #1 Exhibit A) (CSG).
January 21, 2016 Filing 297 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Main Document 297 replaced on 1/29/2016) (CSG).
January 20, 2016 Filing 296 MOTION for Summary Judgment / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
January 20, 2016 Filing 295 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED MEMORANDA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
January 19, 2016 Filing 294 REPLY to Response to Motion re #283 MOTION to Strike #257 Order,, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' NOVEMBER 25, 2015 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NUMBER FIVE filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert A. Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Krevitt, Josh)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #292 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hervey Mark Lyon. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 54606) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/12/16. (CSG)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re Memorandum and Order (doc. #285). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/11/16. (CSG)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #289 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #270 Memorandum & Order, by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/11/16. (CSG)
January 8, 2016 Filing 289 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #270 Memorandum & Order,,,, by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
January 7, 2016 Filing 292 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Hervey Mark Lyon. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 54606) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG)
January 6, 2016 Filing 288 RESPONSE to Motion re #283 MOTION to Strike #257 Order,, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' NOVEMBER 25, 2015 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NUMBER FIVE filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart)(Curry, John)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that trial is set for two weeks starting on June 13, 2016. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2016 in Eastern Division - St. Louis before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/6/16. (CSG)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #276 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel (#276) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as described herein.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/4/16. (MRS)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 285. Mon Jan 4 16:25:32 CST 2016 (Schaefer, Michelle)
December 30, 2015 Filing 284 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #283 MOTION to Strike #257 Order,, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' NOVEMBER 25, 2015 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NUMBER FIVE filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decalration of Robert A. Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Krevitt, Josh)
December 30, 2015 Filing 283 MOTION to Strike #257 Order,, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' NOVEMBER 25, 2015 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NUMBER FIVE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Krevitt, Josh)
December 29, 2015 Filing 282 NOTICE Response to Defendants' Notice Regarding Court Order [Dkt. 270]: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #281 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Curry, John)
December 28, 2015 Filing 281 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. re #270 Memorandum & Order,,,, Defendants' Notice Regarding Court Order (Dkt. 270) (Snyder, Orin)
December 28, 2015 Filing 280 REPLY to Response to Motion re #276 MOTION to Compel filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A)(Curry, John)
December 17, 2015 Filing 279 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #276 MOTION to Compel filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Demana, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Snyder, Orin)
December 16, 2015 Filing 287 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Frankel, Leonard J. Date of Conference: 12/10/15. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(CSG)
December 14, 2015 Filing 278 NOTICE Compliance: by Defendant David H. Chervitz, Appellant David H. Chervitz re #269 Memorandum & Order,,,, (Tobben, Daniel)
December 7, 2015 Filing 277 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #276 MOTION to Compel filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Curry, John)
December 7, 2015 Filing 276 MOTION to Compel by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
December 7, 2015 Filing 275 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #274 Order,, (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER..This matter is before the Court on the plaintiffs in camera submission of documents. Those documents were delivered to chambers on November 25, 2015.Each of the documents was originally withheld pursuant to the attorney-client privilege and listed on a privilege log. The Court holds that all but one of those documents were properly withheld. The document represented by Log Entries 78 and 351 shall be produced, with attorney-client communications history redacted, to defendants no later than December 7, 2015. Should plaintiffs seek amendment or reconsideration of this Order, plaintiffs may file such a motion no later than December 2, 2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/30/15. (MRS)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 274. Mon Nov 30 15:02:26 CST 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
November 25, 2015 Filing 273 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S ORDER: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #269 Memorandum & Order,,,, (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 20, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. re #266 Memorandum & Order,,, DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS ORDER (Dkt. 266) (Snyder, Orin)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' IN CAMERA SUBMISSION. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/18/15. (CSG)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr., #264 Cross MOTION to Amend/Correct #155 Case Management Order - Amended, #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER / DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Counter Defendant James McKelvey, Jr., Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendant Square, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties' cross motions to amend the case management order (#261, #264) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in the memorandum. (ADR Completion Deadline due by 12/18/2015, ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 1/4/2016, Discovery Completion due by 11/25/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2016, Non-Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2016.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/18/15. (CSG)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #226 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr., #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM filed by Counter Defendant James McKelvey, Jr., Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendant Square, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to compel (#192) is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall comply with the terms of this memorandum regarding production of redacted documents no later than seven days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall produce in camera within seven days the documents withheld on the basis of attorney-client privilege that do not include an attorney as a recipient or sender. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for a protective order (#226) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as discussed herein. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/18/15. (CSG)
November 10, 2015 Filing 268 REPLY to Response to Motion re #264 Cross MOTION to Amend/Correct #155 Case Management Order - Amended,,, #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER / DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Ascher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Snyder, Orin)
November 6, 2015 Filing 267 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 Cross MOTION to Amend/Correct #155 Case Management Order - Amended,,, #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER / DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PROPOSED EXPERT DEADLINE filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A)(Cassady, Jason)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #168 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel (#168) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall produce in camera the 25 documents to which defendants refer at page 6 of their response memorandum (#177) within seven days. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that with respect to plaintiffs' Interrogatories 4, 5, and 24, defendants should provide the information plaintiffs seek or explain to the Court why it is not feasible within fourteen days. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/6/15. (CSG)
November 6, 2015 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, #264 Cross MOTION to Amend/Correct #155 Case Management Order - Amended,,, #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER / DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER / MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO MODIFY filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Ascher)(Snyder, Orin)
November 6, 2015 Filing 264 Cross MOTION to Amend/Correct #155 Case Management Order - Amended,,, #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER / DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin)
November 4, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. re #259 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Snyder, Orin)
November 3, 2015 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
November 3, 2015 Filing 261 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Cassady, Jason)
November 3, 2015 Filing 260 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S ORDER [DKT. NO. 257]: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #257 Order,, (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 2, 2015 Filing 259 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL (DKT. NO. 192): by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER denying #189 Motion to Compel; denying #227 Sealed Motion ; denying #250 Motion for Hearing; granting #253 Sealed Motion . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to file surreply (#253) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to compel discovery under the crime-fraud exception (#189) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to strike declaration of Orin Snyder (#227) is DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendant's motion for hearing (#250) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/30/15. (CSG)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER re #150 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc., #141 MOTION to Compel filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel (#141) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant' motion to compel (#150) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall submit a final supplement that answers the questions set forth in this memorandum by November 3, 2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/27/15. (CSG)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #254 MOTION FOR HEARING by PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC REQUESTING TELEPHONIC HEARING REGARDING EXPERT REPORT DEADLINES: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC (Curry, John) Modified on 10/26/2015 (CSG). filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTION ORDERED DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/26/15. (CSG)
October 26, 2015 Filing 255 RESPONSE TO MOTION/NOTICE (doc. #254) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. re #254 Notice (Other), RESPONSE TO NOTICE REQUESTING TELEPHONIC HEARING REGARDING EXPERT REPORT DEADLINES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin) Modified on 10/26/2015 (CSG).
October 23, 2015 Filing 254 MOTION FOR HEARING by PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC REQUESTING TELEPHONIC HEARING REGARDING EXPERT REPORT DEADLINES: by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC (Curry, John) Modified on 10/26/2015 (CSG).
October 20, 2015 Filing 253 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR., AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Surreply, #2 Declaration of John F. Summers, #3 Exhibit 1 to Summers Declaration)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 20, 2015 Filing 252 REPLY to Response to Motion re #227 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
October 20, 2015 Filing 251 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM -- PLAINTIFFS' AND THIRD PARTIES' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSS-MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C Part 1, #5 Exhibit C Part 2, #6 Exhibit C Part 3)(Curry, John)
October 16, 2015 Filing 250 MOTION for Hearing re #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION, #227 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER , #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #246 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/13/2015. (JMC)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #243 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/13/2015. (JMC)
October 13, 2015 Filing 247 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM / DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christine Demana, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Orin Snyder, #6 Exhibit 1 to 7, #7 Exhibit 8 to 20, #8 Exhibit 21 to 28, #9 Exhibit 29 to 35)(Snyder, Orin)
October 12, 2015 Filing 246 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
October 12, 2015 Filing 245 RESPONSE to Motion re #227 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER / DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Ascher, #2 Exhibit 1)(Snyder, Orin)
October 12, 2015 Filing 244 REPLY to Response to Motion re #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Orin Snyder, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Avi Weitzman, #9 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin)
October 12, 2015 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 242 SEALED DOCUMENT re #235 Notice (Other) Notice of Supplement to Response to Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kingston, Jennifer)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #240 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Case Management Order by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/2/15. Discovery deadlines modified as proposed.(MRS)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 241. Fri Oct 2 10:47:05 CDT 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
October 1, 2015 Filing 240 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct to Modify the Case Management Order by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
September 28, 2015 Filing 239 SEALED DOCUMENT re #235 Notice (Other) Response to Plaintiffs' Notice by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian C. Ascher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Snyder, Orin)
September 25, 2015 Filing 238 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. re #237 Sealed Document, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian C. Ascher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Snyder, Orin) Modified on 9/28/2015 (LMR).
September 25, 2015 Filing 237 SEALED DOCUMENT re #168 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING STATUS OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL (DKT. NO. 168) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McManis Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 24, 2015 Filing 236 SEALED DOCUMENT re #235 Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER S. STEWART IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Curry, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 235 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #141 MOTION to Compel (Curry, John)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #233 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION, #227 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER , #226 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion, #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/23/15. (CSG)
September 22, 2015 Filing 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION, #227 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER , #226 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion,,, #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 21, 2015 Filing 232 SEALED DOCUMENT re #224 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion,,,,,,,, PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR., AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S NOTICE OF CORRECTED DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR MAUREEN ARMOUR by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Armour Declaration)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #223 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/21/15. (CSG)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #221 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/21/15. (CSG)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #218 MOTION to Supplement #193 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED), #190 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED), by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/21/15. (CSG)
September 21, 2015 Filing 228 SEALED DOCUMENT re #224 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion,,,,,,,, DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR MAUREEN ARMOUR by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Armour Declaration)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2015 Filing 227 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 McManis Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2015 Filing 226 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM AND CROSS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stewart Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Curry, John) Modified on 11/16/2015 (CSG).
September 18, 2015 Filing 225 NOTICE by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC JOINT NOTICE REGARDING STATUS OF PATENTS (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2015 Filing 224 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Summers Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 69a, #72 Exhibit 70, #73 Exhibit 71, #74 Exhibit 72, #75 Exhibit 73, #76 Exhibit 74, #77 Exhibit 75, #78 Exhibit 76, #79 Exhibit 77, #80 Exhibit 78, #81 Exhibit 79, #82 Exhibit 80, #83 Exhibit 81 Part 1 of 2, #84 Exhibit 81 Part 2 of 2, #85 Exhibit 82, #86 Exhibit 83, #87 Exhibit 84, #88 Exhibit 85, #89 Exhibit 86, #90 Affidavit Curry Declaration, #91 Affidavit Morley Declaration, #92 Affidavit Causevic Declaration, #93 Affidavit Baebler Declaration, #94 Exhibit A to Baebler Declaration)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2015 Filing 223 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
September 18, 2015 Filing 222 NOTICE REGARDING STATUS OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL (JOINT NOTICE): by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. re #150 Cross MOTION to Compel , #141 MOTION to Compel (Snyder, Orin)
September 18, 2015 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2015 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM filed by Appellant David H. Chervitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Written Objections)(Huck, Richard)
September 17, 2015 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #218 MOTION to Supplement #193 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,, #190 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,,,,,,,, DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Snyder, Orin)
September 17, 2015 Filing 218 MOTION to Supplement #193 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,, #190 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,,,,,,,, by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #216 MOTION for Extension #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM of: Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery [Dkt. 192] as it Relates to David Chervitz, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Defendant David H. Chervitz, Appellant David H. Chervitz. (Huck, Richard) filed by David H. Chervitz ; MOTIONS ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/14/15. (CSG)
September 11, 2015 Filing 216 MOTION for Extension #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM of: Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery [Dkt. 192] as it Relates to David Chervitz, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Defendant David H. Chervitz, Appellant David H. Chervitz. (Huck, Richard)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER: By agreement of counsel, parties shall submit to the court: 1) a summary of the status of all patents in question -- within seven days; 2) a status report on the cross motions to compel (#s 141, 150) regarding Morley plaintiffs' trade secret allegations and related issues -- within seven days; and 3) a status report on the Morley plaintiffs' motion to compel (#168) and the extent to which the stipulation (#181) filed moots the controversy -- within 14 days. In addition, this Court's referral of the case to mediation is extended from September 18, 2015 to November 18, 2015. (ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/18/2015, ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/2/2015.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/11/15. (CSG)
September 10, 2015 Filing 214 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel G. Tobben for Defendant David H. Chervitz, Appellant David H. Chervitz. (Tobben, Daniel)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #210 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/10/15. (CSG)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to lift stay (#145) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/10/15. (CSG)
September 10, 2015 Filing 211 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #210 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Ascher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Snyder, Orin)
September 10, 2015 Filing 210 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY CUTOFF by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #208 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION, #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/9/15. (CSG)
September 8, 2015 Filing 208 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION, #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #206 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeana Bisnar Maute. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100, receipt number 52145) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/8/15. (CSG)
September 8, 2015 Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeana Bisnar Maute. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100, receipt number 52145) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 207. Tue Sep 8 15:57:45 CDT 2015 (Gould, Cathy)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #175 MOTION for Relief PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND TO CEASE VEXATIOUS LITIGATION CONDUCT filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr. motion is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/4/15. (MRS)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #202 MOTION to Amend/Correct #190 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,,,,,,,, / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/4/15. (MRS)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 205. Fri Sep 4 13:40:51 CDT 2015 (Schaefer, Michelle)
September 3, 2015 Filing 203 CORRECTED DECLARATION re #202 MOTION to Amend/Correct #190 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,,,,,,,, / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD E, #190 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,,,,,,,, Exhbit A to the Motion to Correct the Declaration of Orin Snyder #202 by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) Modified on 9/4/2015 (MRS).
September 3, 2015 Filing 202 MOTION to Amend/Correct #190 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,,,,,,,, / DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED DECLARATION OF ORIN SNYDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 3, 2015 Filing 201 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard F. Huck, III for Defendant David H. Chervitz, Appellant David H. Chervitz. (Huck, Richard)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #195 MOTION to Amend/Correct #187 Response to Motion (SEALED),, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Krevitt, Josh) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/3/15. (CSG)
September 3, 2015 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #178 MOTION to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution / DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO ADJOURN ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Krevitt, Josh)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #191 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/2/15. (CSG)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #180 MOTION for Hearing PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR IN-PERSON HEARING by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr. ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED IN PART. Telephone conference set for September 11, 2015 at 10:30am central time. Counsel for plaintiffs will circulate a call-in number for all participants. (Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2015 10:30 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/2/15. (CSG)
September 1, 2015 Filing 196 RESPONSE to Motion re #175 MOTION for Relief PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND TO CEASE VEXATIOUS LITIGATION CONDUCT, #195 MOTION to Amend/Correct #187 Response to Motion (SEALED),, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONA L CONDUCT filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Krevitt, Josh)
September 1, 2015 Filing 195 MOTION to Amend/Correct #187 Response to Motion (SEALED),, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Krevitt, Josh)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #188 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/1/15. (CSG)
September 1, 2015 Filing 193 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Orin Snyder, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1a, #4 Exhibit 1b, #5 Exhibit 1c, #6 Exhibit 1d, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 2a, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32)(Snyder, Orin)
September 1, 2015 Filing 192 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 1, 2015 Filing 191 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS AND THIRD PARTIES DAVID CHERVITZ AND WILLIAM CUNNINGHAM by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
September 1, 2015 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Orin Snyder, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Exhibit 105, #107 Exhibit 106, #108 Exhibit 107, #109 Exhibit 108, #110 Exhibit 109, #111 Exhibit 110, #112 Exhibit 111, #113 Exhibit 112)(Snyder, Orin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/4/2015) (MRS).
August 31, 2015 Filing 189 MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
August 31, 2015 Filing 188 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation / DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY UNDER THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin)
August 27, 2015 Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re #175 MOTION for Relief PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND TO CEASE VEXATIOUS LITIGATION CONDUCT filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert A. Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Kingston, Jennifer)
August 27, 2015 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re #168 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Curry, John)
August 26, 2015 Filing 185 REPLY to Response to Motion re #180 MOTION for Hearing PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR IN-PERSON HEARING filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 25, 2015 Filing 184 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Michael H. Musich (Musich, Michael)
August 24, 2015 Filing 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re #180 MOTION for Hearing PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR IN-PERSON HEARING filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kingston, Jennifer)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER re #181 Stipulation and Proposed Order concerning plaintiffs; motion to compel, filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/24/15. (CSG)
August 20, 2015 Filing 181 STIPULATION re #168 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL And Proposed Order by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
August 20, 2015 Filing 180 MOTION for Hearing PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR IN-PERSON HEARING by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 20, 2015 Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re #178 MOTION to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ADJOURN ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 19, 2015 Filing 178 MOTION to Continue Alternative Dispute Resolution by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
August 17, 2015 Filing 177 RESPONSE to Motion re #168 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian Ascher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Kingston, Jennifer)
August 16, 2015 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #175 MOTION for Relief PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND TO CEASE VEXATIOUS LITIGATION CONDUCT filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Curry, John)
August 16, 2015 Filing 175 MOTION for Relief PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO ORDER DEFENSE COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AND TO CEASE VEXATIOUS LITIGATION CONDUCT by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #173 MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Designate Neutral by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/13/15. (CSG)
August 12, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Designate Neutral by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
August 11, 2015 Filing 172 SURREPLY to Motion re #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(CSG)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #170 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit of Robert Vincent, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Kingston, Jennifer) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/11/15. (CSG)
August 10, 2015 Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of Robert Vincent, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Kingston, Jennifer)
August 7, 2015 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #168 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Curry, John)
August 7, 2015 Filing 168 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
August 6, 2015 Filing 167 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1)(Kingston, Jennifer)
August 1, 2015 Filing 165 REPLY re #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT - PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIFT STAY filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 8/3/2015 (CSG).
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Vincent. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc., #160 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian C. Ascher. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc., #159 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Avi Weitzman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100, receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc., #162 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christine Demana. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTIONS ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/31/15. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #158 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #152 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR., AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr. ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/31/15. (CSG)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 164. Fri Jul 31 15:39:29 CDT 2015 (Gould, Cathy)
July 30, 2015 Receipt 4644051445 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of BRIAN ASCHER (CCAM)
July 30, 2015 Receipt 4644051445 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of CHRISTINE DEMANA (CCAM)
July 30, 2015 Receipt 4644051445 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of ROBERT VINCE (CCAM)
July 30, 2015 Receipt: $ 100.00, receipt number 4644051445 Pro Hac Vice for Avi Weitzman. (BAK)
July 30, 2015 Filing 158 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #152 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR., AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Curry, John) Modified on 7/8/2015 (CSG). filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; ORDERED: Order granting motion to lift stay (#154) is withdrawn pending completion of briefing. ***Unterm Document #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/29/15. (CSG)
July 29, 2015 Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christine Demana. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG)
July 29, 2015 Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Vincent. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG)
July 29, 2015 Filing 160 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian C. Ascher. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG)
July 29, 2015 Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Avi Weitzman. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100, receipt number 51445) by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG)
July 27, 2015 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 Cross MOTION to Compel , #141 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 23, 2015 ***REMARK - the jury trial in this case will be held in the Eastern Division in St. Louis, Missouri in Courtroom 3N, not in Cape Girardeau, Missouri as indicated in docket text of Amended Case Management Order (doc. #155). (CSG)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Edward L. Dowd, Jr. ADR Completion Deadline due by 9/18/2015. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 10/2/2015. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 8/11/2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/22/15. (CSG)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: #153 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr. is GRANTED. (Discovery Completion due by 11/12/2015, Non-Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2015, Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2015, Jury Trial set for 6/13/2016 01:30 PM in Eastern Division - Courtroom 3N before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr., Pretrial Compliance due by 5/24/2016, Motion in Limine due by 6/3/2016.) This case shall be referred to alternative dispute resolution on July 22. 2015, and that reference shall terminate on September 18. 2015. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/22/15. (CSG) Modified on 7/23/2015 (CSG).
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 **WITHDRAWN BY DTO DATED 7/29/15** Docket Text ORDER: Re: #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Curry, John) Modified on 7/8/2015 (CSG). filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/22/15. (CSG) Modified on 8/3/2015 (CSG).
July 21, 2015 Filing 153 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 20, 2015 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert Vincent, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Kingston, Jennifer)
July 15, 2015 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #141 MOTION to Compel , #150 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Christine Demana, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Kingston, Jennifer)
July 15, 2015 Filing 150 Cross MOTION to Compel by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Stephen Stewart. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644050945) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimants REM Holdings 3, LLC, REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC, Robert E. Morley, Jr.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/8/15. (CSG)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #144 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #141 MOTION to Compel by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Jack Dorsey, Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/8/15. (CSG)
July 8, 2015 Filing 146 DECLARATION filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT . (Curry, John)
July 8, 2015 Filing 145 MOTION to Lift Stay PLAINTIFFS ROBERT E. MORLEY, JR. AND REM HOLDINGS 3, LLC'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Curry, John) Modified on 7/8/2015 (CSG).
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 149. Wed Jul 8 13:57:27 CDT 2015 (Gould, Cathy)
July 7, 2015 Filing 144 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #141 MOTION to Compel by Consolidated Filer Defendant Jack Dorsey, Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer) Modified on 7/8/2015 (CSG).
July 6, 2015 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Stephen Stewart. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644050945) by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimants REM Holdings 3, LLC, REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(CSG)
July 6, 2015 Receipt 4644050945 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of CHRISTOPHER S, STEWART (CCAM)
June 30, 2015 Filing 143 SEALED DOCUMENT re #141 MOTION to Compel Sealed Declaration of Austin Curry in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Curry, John)
June 30, 2015 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #141 MOTION to Compel filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
June 30, 2015 Filing 141 MOTION to Compel by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:(49 in 4:14-cv-00172-SNLJ) MOTION to Stay Patent Claims filed by Defendant James McKelvey, Jr., Defendant Jack Dorsey, Defendant Square, Inc. motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Square's motion to stay (#49) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts 4, 10, and 11 are STAYED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, in light of this Court's consolidation of 4:10cv2243 and 4:14cv172, the parties shall file all documents in case number 4:10cv2243. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/2/15. Associated Cases: 4:10-cv-02243-SNLJ, 4:14-cv-00172-SNLJ(CSG)
December 5, 2014 Filing 139 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. CORRECTED JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 4, 2014 Filing 138 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert E. Morley, Jr, Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 13, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE Withdrawal as Attorney for Plaintiffs: by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc. Associated Cases: 4:10-cv-02243-SNLJ, 4:14-cv-00172-SNLJ(Kahn, Michael)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #126 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate with Civil Case No. 14-CV-00172 Consolidate with higher case number 4:14-cv-00172 filed by Plaintiff James McKelvey, Jr., Plaintiff Square, Inc.; motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (#126) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 4:14-cv-172 CDP shall be consolidated with this case, No. 4:10-cv-2243 SNLJ. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that although Case No. 4:10-cv-2243 is presently stayed, such stay does not apply to the claims brought in Case No. 4:14-cv-172. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/16/14. (CSG)
May 1, 2014 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #126 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate with Civil Case No. 14-CV-00172 Consolidate with higher case number 4:14-cv-00172 filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
May 1, 2014 Filing 134 STATUS REPORT FILED JOINTLY by REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
April 23, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF AUTHORITY CONTRARY TO ITS RESPONSE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE [DKT. NO. 132]: by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC re #132 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 21, 2014 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #126 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate with Civil Case No. 14-CV-00172 Consolidate with higher case number 4:14-cv-00172 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH CIVIL CASE NO. 14-CV-00172 filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 15, 2014 Filing 131 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason Scott McManis for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (McManis, Jason)
April 15, 2014 Filing 130 ENTRY of Appearance by John A. Curry for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Curry, John)
April 15, 2014 Filing 129 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Cassady, Jason)
April 15, 2014 Filing 128 ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley W. Caldwell for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 11, 2014 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #126 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate with Civil Case No. 14-CV-00172 Consolidate with higher case number 4:14-cv-00172 filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Kingston, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2014: #5 Exhibit E) (MRS).
April 11, 2014 Filing 126 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate with Civil Case No. 14-CV-00172 Consolidate with higher case number 4:14-cv-00172 by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Orin S. Snyder. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4276179) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate)(Snyder, Orin) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/11/14. (CSG)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Josh A. Krevitt. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4273253) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate)(Krevitt, Josh) filed by James McKelvey, Jr., Square, Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/10/14. (CSG)
April 10, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Orin S. Snyder. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4276179) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate)(Snyder, Orin)
April 9, 2014 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Josh A. Krevitt. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-4273253) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate)(Krevitt, Josh)
April 4, 2014 Filing 121 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer S. Kingston for Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Kingston, Jennifer)
April 4, 2014 Filing 120 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward L. Dowd, Jr for Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc., Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Jr, Square, Inc.. (Dowd, Edward)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the clerk shall re-title the instant motion (#110) as Objection or Opposition to Exhibits A and B of Joint Status Report on the docket sheet. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report as to the procedural posture of this case no later than May 1, 2014. Status Report due by 5/1/2014.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/14. (MRS)
March 7, 2014 Filing 118 SUPPLEMENTAL re #109 Status Report REM Holdings 3, LLC's Supplemental Memorandum to Update the Court Regarding the Status of Exhibits A and B which are Attached to the Joint Status Report by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Decision on Petitions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Decision on Petitions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Concurrent Proceeding)(Helfrey, David)
January 21, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Michael A. Kahn (Kahn, Michael)
November 19, 2013 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION to Strike Reply in Support of its Objection or Opposition to Exhibits A and B of Joint Status Report and for Appropriate Relief filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
November 12, 2013 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #110 MOTION to Strike Opposition to REM Holdings 3, LLC's Objection or Opposition to Exhibits A and B of Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #113 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Laurel A. Kilgour/Goodwin Procter LLP by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kilgour, Laurel) filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/7/13. (MRS)
November 6, 2013 Filing 113 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Laurel A. Kilgour/Goodwin Procter LLP by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kilgour, Laurel)
October 31, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE Filing Withdrawal of Counsel: by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC (Geraci, Carl)
October 31, 2013 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM re #110 Motion to Strike in Support of Its Objection or Opposition to Exhibits A and B of Joint Status Report by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 part 2, #6 Exhibit 5 part 1, #7 Exhibit 5 part 2, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Helfrey, David) Modified on 11/7/2013 (MRS).
October 31, 2013 Filing 110 OBJECTION OR OPPOSITION TO Exhibits A and B of Joint Status Report : by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC (Helfrey, David) Modified on 11/7/2013 (MRS). Modified on 3/13/2014 (MRS).
September 17, 2013 Filing 109 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Square Declarations_729 Reexam, #2 Exhibit B - Square Declarations_248 Reexam)(Wilson, Erica)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Docket Text ORDER: THE PARTIES ARE HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT WITH THE COURT WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER ( Status Report due by 9/17/2013.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/3/13. (MRS)
January 22, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Erica D. Wilson (Wilson, Erica)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #88 Notice of Appeal filed by David H. Chervitz, USCA Appeal #: 2011-1529. The motion to dismiss is granted. Each side shall bear its own costs.(CSG)
October 17, 2011 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Accordingly, the Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit is granted, and the case is stayed. Defendant is granted leave to file a motion to lift the stay when the PTO completes its inter partes reexamination and before any appeal is taken. Defendant's request for limited discovery is denied. All other pending motions are denied as moot, without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/17/11. (LAH)
August 22, 2011 Filing 104 Initial Notification and or Briefing Schedule from Federal Circuit for #88 Notice of Appeal filed by David H. Chervitz Federal Circuit Appeal Number: 2011-1529 (RAK)
August 10, 2011 Filing 103 SURREPLY to Motion re #70 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office DEFENDANTS AMENDED SUR-REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OF MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION #94 filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Supplemental Declaration of Bruce Baebler)(Cunningham, William)
August 8, 2011 Filing 102 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #101 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Sur-Reply by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Amended Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit A- Suppl. Declaration)(Cunningham, William) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. on 8/8/11. (ARL)
August 5, 2011 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Sur-Reply by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Amended Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit A- Suppl. Declaration)(Cunningham, William)
August 3, 2011 Filing 100 SURREPLY to Motion re #70 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counterclaim Plaintiff REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(ARL)
August 3, 2011 Filing 99 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #98 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to D/E 94 by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit A- to Sur-Reply)(Cunningham, William) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. on 8/3/11. (ARL)
August 3, 2011 ***REMARK - printed docket sheet, Notice of Appeal (NOA), Order re: NOA, and Notification of NOA and NOA Supplement and mailed to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit on 8/2/2011. (JMW)(due to miscommunication, NOA was originally forwarded to US Court of Appeals.)
August 2, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to D/E 94 by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit A- to Sur-Reply)(Cunningham, William)
July 27, 2011 Filing 97 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc. re #94 Reply Reply Declaration of Laurel A. Kilgour in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - statisitics ED Mo, #2 Exhibit M - Fed Cir statistics, #3 Exhibit N - Allied Erecting v Genesis Equip, #4 Exhibit O - ATT Intell Prop v TiVo, #5 Exhibit P - Emsat Advanced v T-Mobile, #6 Exhibit Q - Esco Corp v Berkeley Forge & Tool, #7 Exhibit R - Firepass Holdings v Airbus Ams, #8 Exhibit S - Fujitsu v Nanya Tech, #9 Exhibit T - Generac v Kohler, #10 Exhibit U - Lifeline Techs v Archer Daniels, #11 Exhibit V - Odom v Microsoft, #12 Exhibit W - Ruckus Wireless v NetGear)(Wilson, Erica)
July 27, 2011 Filing 96 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc. re #94 Reply Declaration of Paul Davis in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wilson, Erica)
July 27, 2011 Filing 95 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc. re #94 Reply Declaration of James McKelvey in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Square Adds Encryption to Mobile Card Reader)(Wilson, Erica)
July 27, 2011 Filing 94 REPLY re #70 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
July 21, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE CERTIFICATE THAT THERE IS NO TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL: by Defendant David H. Chervitz (Musich, Michael)
July 21, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Michael H. Musich (Musich, Michael)
July 18, 2011 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Venuto Lt re Publication of Appln 050710, #2 Exhibit B - Square 1.6B Value, #3 Exhibit C- Baebler Declaration re Opp to Mtn to Stay, #4 Exhibit D - MPEP 2600 Inter Partes Reexam Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - 729 Office action mailed 07-01-2011, #6 Exhibit F - 248 Office action mailed 07-01-2011, #7 Exhibit G - 394 Office action mailed 07-01-2011, #8 Exhibit H - Reexamination_operational_statistic_through_FY2011Q2_(2)., #9 Exhibit I - Appeals from the Central Reexamination Unit II, #10 Exhibit J - Visa-bulletin-mobile-best-practices-04272011, #11 Exhibit K - Visa Global Summit)(Cunningham, William) (Main Document 91 replaced on 7/20/2011) (BAK).
July 14, 2011 Filing 90 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT regarding #88 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 07/12/2011 by Defendant David H. Chervitz. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(JMW)
July 13, 2011 Filing 89 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael H. Musich for Defendant David H. Chervitz. (Musich, Michael)
July 12, 2011 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Appellant David H. Chervitz. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0865-2836208.
July 11, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE by Appellant David H. Chervitz Notice of Determination of Missouri Disciplinary Committee on Court's Referral Regarding David H. Chervitz (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Musich, Michael)
July 7, 2011 Filing 86 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed; Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay ;Proposed extension date 07/18/2011 by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC - GRANTED Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/7/11. (LAH)
July 6, 2011 Filing 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed; Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay ;Proposed extension date 07/18/2011 by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
July 6, 2011 Filing 84 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss :DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LGK)
July 6, 2011 Filing 83 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #80 MOTION for Leave to FILE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT, # 2 Exhibit A To Corrected Memo- Therasnese, Inc. v. Becton et al., # 3 Exhibit B to Corrected Memo- MPEP section 605.07 re joint inventors)(Cunningham, William) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/6/11. (LGK)
July 5, 2011 Filing 82 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #74 MOTION to Dismiss :DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT, #78 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Affirmative Defenses, #76 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XI, XII, XII(2), XVI and XVII of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint UNOPPOSED by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael) filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/5/11. (LGK)
July 1, 2011 Filing 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #74 MOTION to Dismiss :DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT, #78 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Affirmative Defenses, #76 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XI, XII, XII(2), XVI and XVII of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint UNOPPOSED by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
July 1, 2011 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to FILE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT, #2 Exhibit A To Corrected Memo- Therasnese, Inc. v. Becton et al., #3 Exhibit B to Corrected Memo- MPEP section 605.07 re joint inventors)(Cunningham, William)
June 30, 2011 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #78 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
June 30, 2011 Filing 78 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Affirmative Defenses by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
June 30, 2011 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #76 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XI, XII, XII(2), XVI and XVII of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
June 30, 2011 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts XI, XII, XII(2), XVI and XVII of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
June 30, 2011 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss :DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Therasense, Inc. v. Becton et al., #2 Exhibit B- MPEP section 605.07 re Joint Inventors)(Cunningham, William)
June 30, 2011 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss :DEFENDANT'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Cunningham, William)
June 28, 2011 Filing 73 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counts I-IX of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David) filed by REM Holdings 3, LLC - GRANTED Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/28/11. (LAH)
June 27, 2011 Filing 72 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc. re #70 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, #71 Memorandum in Support of Motion : Declaration of Laurel A. Kilgour in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Request for Examination of U.S. Patent No. 7,810,729, #2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Request for Examination of U.S. Patent No. 7,896,248, #3 Exhibit C - Order Granting Request for Examination of U.S. Patent No. 7,918,394, #4 Exhibit D - Reexamination Filing Data, #5 Exhibit E - Section 2686.04 (Manual of Patent Examining Procedure), #6 Exhibit F - Emhart Indus., Inc. v. Sankyo Seiki Mfg. Co., #7 Exhibit G - 1st Tech., LLC v. Digital Gaming Solutions S.A., #8 Exhibit H - Inteplast Grp., Ltd. v. Coroplast, Inc., #9 Exhibit I - Lifeline Techs., Inc. v. Archer Daniels Midland Co., #10 Exhibit J - Watlow Elec. Mfg. Co. v. Ogden Mfg. Co., #11 Exhibit K - Middleton, Inc. v. Minn. Mining & Mfg.)(Wilson, Erica)
June 27, 2011 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #70 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
June 27, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit by The U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
June 27, 2011 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counts I-IX of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
June 27, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counts I-IX of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
June 13, 2011 Filing 66 AMENDED COMPLAINT : Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC Amendment to 65 Docket Text Order,,, #1 Complaint, Jury demand, : Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey. Related document: 65 Docket Text Order,,, #1 Complaint, filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent '729, #2 Exhibit 2 - Patent '248, #3 Exhibit 3 - Patent '394, #4 Exhibit 4 - Davis letter 10-21-10, #5 Exhibit 5 - Reexam of '729, #6 Exhibit 6 - Reexam of '248, #7 Exhibit 7 - Reexam of '394)(Wilson, Erica)
June 13, 2011 Filing 65 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #63 MOTION for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint with Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Square, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1-Patent '729 to First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2-Patent '248 to First Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3-Patent '394 to First Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4-Davis letter 10-21-10 to First Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 5-Reexam of '729 Patent to First Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6-Reexam of '248 Patent to First Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 7-Reexam of '394 Patent to First Amended Complaint)(Wilson, Erica) filed by Square, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/13/11. (ARL)
June 10, 2011 Filing 64 ANSWER to Counterclaim : Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendant's First Amended Counterclaims Against Plaintiffs Square, Inc. and James McKelvey by James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Reexam of 729 patent, #2 Exhibit B-Reexam of 248 patent., #3 Exhibit C-Reexam of 394 patent.)(Wilson, Erica)
June 10, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint with Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-Patent '729 to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-Patent '248 to First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3-Patent '394 to First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4-Davis letter 10-21-10 to First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5-Reexam of '729 Patent to First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6-Reexam of '248 Patent to First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 7-Reexam of '394 Patent to First Amended Complaint)(Wilson, Erica)
June 8, 2011 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION to Clarify #55 Order,, filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
June 3, 2011 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #58 MOTION to Clarify #55 Order,, -- Plaintiffs' Response to REM Holdings 3, LLC's Motion to Clarify or Modify the Court's May 19, 2011 Order filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
June 3, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Clarify #55 Order,, and Supporting Memorandum of Law -- Plaintiffs' Opposition to David Chervitz's Motion to Modify, Clarify or Correct the Court's May 19, 2011 Order filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: This case is before the Court on "David Chervitz's Motion and Supporting Memorandum of Law to Modify, Clarify or Correct the Courts May 19, 2011 Order," #57 , and REM Holdings 3, LLC's Motion to Clarify or Modify the Courts May 19, 2011 Order, #58 . Both motions are granted. This Court's Memorandum and Order of May 19, 2011, #55 , is amended so that the sanctions of attorney's fees and costs are awarded against counsel David Chervitz, ratherthan defendant, and that the imposition of sanctions is designated a final judgment as to all claims between plaintiffs and Chervitz. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. on 5/27/11. (ARL)
May 26, 2011 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #58 MOTION to Clarify #55 Order,, filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
May 26, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION to Clarify #55 Order,, by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
May 26, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION to Clarify #55 Order,, and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Court Order March 16, 2011, #2 Exhibit B. Court Order May 19, 2011)(Musich, Michael)
May 24, 2011 Filing 56 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint amended form filer filed by James McKelvey, Square, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Helfrey, David)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - Finally, this Court finds that an award of attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $15,000 (which is only half of the $30,000 claimed by plaintiff) is fair and reasonable. This amount is not punitive in nature and simply reimburses plaintiffs in part for the expense of prosecuting the motion to disqualify. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that defendant's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. It is further ordered that attorney's fees and costs are awarded in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $15,000, and that said sum shall be paid by defendant to plaintiff within 21 days of this order. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/19/11. (LAH)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - This case is before the Court on defendant's "Motion for Leave to Amend Its Answer and to Add Additional Counterclaims," #41, to which plaintiffs have filed a "Memorandum in Opposition," #46, and defendant, in turn, a "Reply," # 49. This Court agrees with defendant that this case was only recently filed, no discovery has taken place, and no case management order has been filed under Rule 16, and as such, plaintiffs will not be unduly prejudiced. Under these circumstances, leave to amend should be freely given. Rule 15 (a)(2). In addition, the new infringement counterclaims proposed by defendant appear to be a compulsory counterclaim under Rule 13(a).Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/19/11. (LAH)
April 25, 2011 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Memorandum & Order,,, with Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Musich, Michael)
April 25, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Michael H. Musich (Musich, Michael)
April 21, 2011 Filing 51 ENTRY of Appearance by McPherson Dorsett Moore for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Moore, McPherson)
April 21, 2011 Filing 50 ENTRY of Appearance by William B. Cunningham, Jr for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Cunningham, William)
April 20, 2011 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer and to Add Additional Counterclaims Against Plaintiffs filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Helfrey, David)
April 18, 2011 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Memorandum & Order,,, with Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
April 13, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Erica D. Wilson (Wilson, Erica)
April 13, 2011 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer and to Add Additional Counterclaims Against Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
April 11, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Reconsideration re #36 Memorandum & Order,,, with Memorandum in Support by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Musich, Michael)
April 11, 2011 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael H. Musich for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Musich, Michael)
April 6, 2011 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Geraci, Carl)
April 6, 2011 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #41 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer and to Add Additional Counterclaims Against Plaintiffs filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
April 6, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Amend Answer and to Add Additional Counterclaims Against Plaintiffs by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
April 6, 2011 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by David B.B. Helfrey for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Helfrey, David)
April 6, 2011 Filing 39 SEALED DOCUMENT re #36 Memorandum & Order,,, 38 Docket Text Order, Application for Court-Ordered Attorneys Fees and Costs by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Kahn in Support of Court-Ordered Attorneys Fees and Costs, #2 Exhibit A to Kahn Declaration, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Erica Wilson in Support of Court-Ordered Attorneys Fees and Costs, #4 Exhibit 1 to Wilson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Wilson Declaration)(Kahn, Michael)
April 4, 2011 Filing 38 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #37 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Application for Court-Ordered Attorneys Fees and Costs, Including Supporting Declarations) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael) filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. on 4/4/11. (ARL)
April 1, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Application for Court-Ordered Attorneys Fees and Costs, Including Supporting Declarations) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to disqualify David H. Chervitz from representing defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC in this case is GRANTED for violation of Missouri Supreme Court Rules 4-1.9(a) and 4-3.7. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant is granted 21 days to hire new counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that sanctions will be imposed against David H. Chervitz for the reasonable attorneys fees and costs incurred by plaintiffs to present this motion, and plaintiffs are granted 21 days to submit an affidavit in support of those fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall forward this order and memorandum to the Office of Chief Disciplinary Counsel of the Supreme Court of Missouri for its further consideration. Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/16/11. (LGK) Modified on 6/17/2016 (CSG) - SEE ORDER OF 6/17/16 (doc. #357) - This Court grants the motion to vacate sanctions only to the extent of the imposition of the $15,000 monetary sanction, and this Court denies the motion to vacate to the extent that it applies to the disqualification of Mr. Chervitz.
March 16, 2011 ***REMARK - A copy of the memorandum and order was mailed to the Office of the Chief Disciplinary Counsel, 3335 American Avenue, Jefferson City, MO 65109 (LGK)
February 24, 2011 Filing 35 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #34 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extension of Dates to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica) filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey - GRANTED Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/24/11. (LAH)
February 23, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extension of Dates to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
February 15, 2011 Filing 33 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: PTRACK 2 - STANDARD Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/10/2011. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/17/2011 11:00 AM by Telephone before Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/15/11. (LGK)
February 10, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE Corrected Certificate of Service: by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc. re #31 Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED), Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED), Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED), Reply to Response to Motion (SEALED) (Wilson, Erica)
February 10, 2011 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Supplement #20 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify , #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify MOTION to Supplement #20 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify , #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify MOTION to Supplement #20 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify , #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify filed by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
February 9, 2011 Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #29 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Disqualify by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica) filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey - GRANTED Signed by Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/9/11. (LAH)
February 9, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Disqualify by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Wilson, Erica)
February 9, 2011 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Geoffrey G. Gerber for Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Gerber, Geoffrey)
February 1, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc. re #25 Answer to Counterclaim Certificate of Service (Wilson, Erica)
January 31, 2011 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Supplement #20 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify , #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify MOTION to Supplement #20 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify , #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify MOTION to Supplement #20 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify , #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify David H. Chervitz filed by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC, Counter Claimant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chervitz, David)
January 31, 2011 Filing 25 PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER to Counterclaim Against Square, Inc. and James McKelvey by James McKelvey, Square, Inc..(Wilson, Erica)
January 26, 2011 Filing 24 CJRA ORDER (jgw). Judge Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman termed. Case reassigned to Judge Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings (KXS)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Memorandum and Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify David H. Chervitz as Attorney for Defendant REM Holdings, LLC and Motion for Sanctions (Docket No. 19) is GRANTED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 1/21/2011. (NDT)
January 20, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to Disqualify David Chervitz as Attorney for Defendant filed by James McKelvey, Square, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit J to Declaration of James McKelvey, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Kahn, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Erica Wilson, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Erica Wilson-Correspondence dated December 21, 2919, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Erica Wilson-January 7, 2011 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Erica Wilson-January 7, 2011 Correspondence, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Erica Wilson-MPEP 2004)(Kahn, Michael) Modified on 1/21/2011 (KXS).
January 20, 2011 Filing 20 SEALED MEMORANDUM in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify filed by Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James McKelvey in Support of Motion to Disqualify, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Email Dated May 4, 2009, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Email Dated, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Invoice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Canceled Check, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-Email Dated May 18, 2009, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F-Email dated June 7, 2009, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G-Email dated June 9, 2009, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H-Email dated June 11, 2009, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I-Email dated June 12, 2009, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K-Email dated May 14, 2009, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L-Email dated June 29, 2009, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M-Email dated June 10, 2009)(Kahn, Michael) Modified on 1/21/2011 (KXS).
January 20, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion by Counter Defendants James McKelvey, Square, Inc., Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
January 20, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Michael A. Kahn (Kahn, Michael)
January 7, 2011 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Chervitz, David)
January 7, 2011 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff James McKelvey, Square, Inc. by REM Holdings 3, LLC.(Chervitz, David)
January 7, 2011 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by David H. Chervitz for Defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC. (Chervitz, David)
December 22, 2010 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kahn, Michael)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint (Docket No. 12) is GRANTED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 12/22/2010. (NDT)
December 21, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Filed on behalf of Defendant by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. mailed to parties not notified electronically Mon Dec 20 10:40:36 CST 2010 (Stamm, Katie)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motions of Erica D. Wilson (Docket No. 9) and Laurel A. Kilgour (Docket No. 10) for Admission Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 12/17/2010. (NDT)
December 15, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laurel Kilgour (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (KXS)
December 15, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Erica Wilson (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (KXS)
December 15, 2010 Receipt 4644018600 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Erica D. Wilson (CCAM)
December 15, 2010 Receipt 4644018601 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Laurel A. Kilgour (CCAM)
December 10, 2010 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT re 7 Docket Text Order Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the Summons Returned Executed (Docket No. 5) is GRANTED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 12/7/2010. (NDT)
December 3, 2010 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT re #5 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Summons Returned Executed) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael) (RETURN OF SERVICE IS NOT SIGNED AND SEALED BY THE CLERK; ATTORNEY WILL HAVE SUMMONS RE-SERVED AND WILL REFILE CORRECTLY) Modified on 12/6/2010 (KXS).
December 3, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (Summons Returned Executed) by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
December 2, 2010 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kahn, Michael)
December 2, 2010 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
December 2, 2010 Case Opening Notification, 1 summons issued @ 21 days. Consents to Magistrate to be filed by all parties., Disclosure of Corporate Interest to be filed by all corporations.. Judge Assigned: Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman. (DLT)
December 1, 2010 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT re #1 Complaint, Summons by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
December 1, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs James McKelvey, Square, Inc. Process Server: Absolute Delivery Service (Kahn, Michael)
December 1, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Correction of Inventorship On U.S. Patent No. 7,810,729 against defendant REM Holdings 3, LLC with receipt number 0865-2521225, in the amount of $350 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Square, Inc., James McKelvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: '729 Patent, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: 10-21-10 Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Summons Redacted)(Kahn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Square, Inc. et al v. REM Holdings 3, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McKelvey, Jr.
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: Michael A. Kahn
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd, Jr.
Represented By: Erica D. Wilson
Represented By: Robert A. Vincent
Represented By: Geoffrey G. Gerber
Represented By: Jennifer S. Kingston
Represented By: Jeana Bisnar Maute
Represented By: Christine L. Demana
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Avi Weitzman
Represented By: Laurel Kilgour
Represented By: Orin S. Snyder
Represented By: Brian C. Ascher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Square, Inc.
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: Michael A. Kahn
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd, Jr.
Represented By: Erica D. Wilson
Represented By: Robert A. Vincent
Represented By: Geoffrey G. Gerber
Represented By: Jennifer S. Kingston
Represented By: Jeana Bisnar Maute
Represented By: Christine L. Demana
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Avi Weitzman
Represented By: Laurel Kilgour
Represented By: Orin S. Snyder
Represented By: Brian C. Ascher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Robert E. Morley, Jr.
Represented By: William B. Cunningham, Jr.
Represented By: McPherson Dorsett Moore
Represented By: Christopher S. Stewart
Represented By: David B.B. Helfrey
Represented By: John A. Curry
Represented By: Bradley W. Caldwell
Represented By: Jason Dodd Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jack Dorsey
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: Edward L. Dowd, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. Vincent
Represented By: Jennifer S. Kingston
Represented By: Michael A. Kahn
Represented By: Jeana Bisnar Maute
Represented By: Christine L. Demana
Represented By: Hervey Mark Lyon
Represented By: Avi Weitzman
Represented By: Orin S. Snyder
Represented By: Brian C. Ascher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REM Holdings 3, LLC
Represented By: Jason Scott McManis
Represented By: William B. Cunningham, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Dodd Cassady
Represented By: McPherson Dorsett Moore
Represented By: Christopher S. Stewart
Represented By: David B.B. Helfrey
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: John A. Curry
Represented By: Bradley W. Caldwell
Represented By: Michael H. Musich
Represented By: David H. Chervitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Chervitz
Represented By: Richard F. Huck, III
Represented By: Daniel G. Tobben
Represented By: Michael H. Musich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?