A.O. Smith Corporation et al v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
Plaintiff: |
A.O. Smith Corporation and A.O. Smith Enterprises, Ltd. |
Defendant: |
Emerson Electric Co. and Emerson Appliance Solutions |
Counter_defendant: |
A.O. Smith Enterprises, Ltd. |
Counter_claimant: |
Emerson Electric Co. |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv01117 |
Filed: |
June 22, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry I. Adelman |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1346 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 26, 2012 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Request the Court to Address Certain Motions (Docket Nos. 17 and 42) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion of A.O. Smith Enterprises, Limited for Recon sideration Pursuant to Rule 60(B) of this Courts August 5, 2011 Order Dismissing Defendant Emerson Appliance Solutions (Docket No. 17) is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Pleadings to Add Therm- O-Disc, Inc. as a Pa rty (Docket No. 42) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE subject to refiling if deemed necessary by Plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Emerson Electric Co.s Request for a Hearing and Oral Argument on its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docket No. 59) is GRANTED. After consulting with opposing counsel, Defendant Emerson Electric Co.s counsel shall contact chambers regarding available dates for oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 10/26/2012. (KMS)
|
September 21, 2011 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' pleading filed as a "Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 60(B) of This Court's August 5, 2011 Order Dismissing Defendant Emerson Appliance Solutions" in CM-ECF but captioned as a Memorandumof Law in Opposition to Emerson Appliance Solutions' Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 24) is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 9/21/11. (KXS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?