October 16, 2012 |
Filing
85
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Following a hearing and for the reasons stated on the record, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to file under seal # 83 is granted, and the Clerk of the Court shall place documents # 79 and # 82 under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the amended motion to approve settlement # 82 is granted, and the Court will enter the proposed Judgment and place it in the Court file under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for settlement approval # 79 is denied as moot. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal of this action with prejudice within ten (10) days of the date of this Order.( Dismissal Paper(s) due by 10/26/2012.) Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/16/12. (ARL)
|
September 20, 2012 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to refer this case to alternative dispute resolution 70 is granted, and this case is re-referred to mediation, effective today, for a second round of mediation with mediator B rendan Ryan, with mediation to be completed by October 20, 2012. No second Order Referring this Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution will issue, but the mediator should still file a compliance report. All other deadlines, including the trial date and the pretrial submission deadlines, remain the same.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/20/12. (LGK)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
66
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion for summary judgment # 61 is granted, and plaintiffs claims against defendant Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. only are dismissed. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/6/2012. (RAK)
|
April 23, 2012 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for summaryjudgment # 56 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Penske shall provide any outstanding discovery it agreed to produce in plaintiffs Exhibit 3 in opposition to summary judgment [# 58 -3] within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 4/23/12. (ARL)
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for sanctions # 52 is denied, and the Court's January 23, 2012 Memorandum and Order is vacated only to the extent that it requires defendants to respond without objection. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 1/31/12. (ARL)
|
January 24, 2012 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 49 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Plaintiff K. W., Plaintiff Portia Whitmore, Plaintiff Luther Whitmore motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 1/24/12. (LGK)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel 48 is granted, and defendants shall provide written responses to plaintiffs' discovery requests, in writing, under oath, and without objection, and produce any documents required by these discovery requests, by Thursday, January 26, 2012 at noon.. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 1/23/12. (LGK)
|
November 2, 2011 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss [#28] is denied. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 11/2/11. (LAH)
|
August 12, 2011 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiffs having failed to file a stipulation in support of their motion for remand, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for remand [#13] is denied for the reasons stated in my July 29, 2011 Memorandum and Order. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 8/12/2011. (RAK)
|
July 29, 2011 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs may file a stipulation in conformity with this Memorandum and Order by August 5, 2011. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 7/29/11. (LAH)
|
July 27, 2011 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file a reply brief in support of remand in accordance with this Memorandum and Order by July 29, 2011, or the motion will be deemed abandoned and will be denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amendedcomplaint in conformity with the proposed amended complaint attached as Exhibit A to theirmotion for remand # 13 . The amended complaint shall be filed by Friday, July 29, 2011. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 7/27/11. (ARL)
|