May 8, 2014 |
Filing
151
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed motion to stay execution of costs pending appeal 150 is granted, and this Court's May 1, 2014 Order awarding costs is stayed during the pendency of appeal without any supersedeas bond being required.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/8/14. (LGK)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
148
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for review of costs [# 145 ] is granted in part as set out above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Bill of Costs entered on April 9, 2014 [# 143 ] is vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat the Clerk of Court shall tax the following costs in favor of defendants and against plaintiff Chavis Van & Storage of Myrtle Beach, Inc. only: Deposition costs $18,296.55 ESI-related costs $4,500.00 Total taxable costs $22,796.55. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/1/14. (KJS)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing
146
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration # 144 is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants may file any opposition to plaintiffs' motion for review of costs by April 21, 2014. No reply brief is permitted. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/14/14. (ARL)
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing
142
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for attorneys fees 129 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for bill of costs 128 is granted, and the Clerk of the Court shall tax costs in the amount sought by defendants.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for hearing 139 is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/9/14. (JWD)
|
February 27, 2014 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted, and plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed with prejudice. A separate Judgment will issue this same date. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/27/14. (ARL)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief as set out above by February 14, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall file its reply brief as set out above by February 24, 2014. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/4/14. (KXS)
|
January 24, 2014 |
Filing
112
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Finally, if not clear by this Memorandum and Order, the parties shall file nothing else in this case under seal unless specifically granted leave to do so. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file their rev ised submission in opposition to summary judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, January 27, 2014. No extensions of time will be permitted, and failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in the Court striking the plaintiffs sealed opposition and considering the pending motion for summary judgment unopposed. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1/24/14. (LAH)
|
April 2, 2013 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re Plaintiffs' motion to compel 81 DENIED, with exceptions. Please see Memorandum and Order for full details. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/2/13. (ARL)
|
November 13, 2012 |
Filing
70
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: After careful consideration, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel # 65 is denied, and plaintiffs are specifically warned that they and their counsel will be sanctioned if they file another motion to compel without first using sincere, good faith efforts to resolve every topic raised in the motion to compel. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/13/12. (ARL)
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss [#28] is granted in part and denied in part, and Counts II-VIII only of plaintiffs complaint are dismissed. The motion to dismiss is denied as to Count I. This case will be set for a scheduling conference by separate Order.RODNEY W. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 1/9/2012. (RAK)
|
September 23, 2011 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 conference currently set for October 3, 2011 is reset for Friday, October 7, 2011 at 2 p.m. in the chambers of the undersigned. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 9/23/11. (LAH)
|