Broadcast Music, Inc et al v. MWS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Universal - Songs of Polygram International Inc., Jay-Boy Music Corp., Mix-A-Lot Publishing, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Lion Aire Publishing and Young Money Publishing, Inc.
Defendant: MWS, LLC and Mark D. Winfield
Case Number: 4:2011cv01481
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Terry I. Adelman
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff/Judgment Creditors' Motion toWithdraw Writsof Execution Issued to the Precinct and Jim Edmonds' Space 15 (ECF No. 56 ) is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants/Judgment D ebtors' Verified Objections andMotion to Quash Garnishment Interrogatories, Summons to Garnishee, Notice of Execution and Writ of Execution (ECF No. 55 ) is Denied as Moot as directed to the Precinct and Jim Edmonds' Space 15 and Overruled as directed to MWS, LLC. re: 55 56 49 48 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 1/23/15. (KKS)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded $35,000.00 in statutory damages ($7,000.00 for each of the five infringements), for which Defendants MWS, LLC and Mark D. Winfield are jointly and severally liable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $10,000.00, and costs of $2,098.75, for a total award of $12,098.75. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 6/20/2014. (KMS)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that BMI's Motion to Strike Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 32 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that BMI's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 27 ) is GRANTED in favor of BMI and against Defendants on the issue of liability. The parties shall submit supplemental briefing on the issue of statutory damages and attorney's fees and costs as deemed appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that BMI&# 039;s request for injunctive relief will be granted. Defendants are enjoined from publicly performing any of the musical works in BMI's repertoire unless Defendants execute a licensing agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 29 ) is DENIED. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this samedate.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 8/8/13. (KKS)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or for More Definite Statement (Docket No. 12 ) is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 2/3/12. (KKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc et al v. MWS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal - Songs of Polygram International Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay-Boy Music Corp.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mix-A-Lot Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lion Aire Publishing
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Money Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWS, LLC
Represented By: John J. Pawloski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?