Ballard v. City of St. Louis et al
Plaintiff: |
(I')sla Ballard |
Defendant: |
Jarrod L. Henderson, Isabella Lovadina, Chris N. Lovelady-Armstrong, Robert E. Ogilvie and Ronald E. Vaughan |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv01553 |
Filed: |
September 7, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Rodney W. Sippel |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
92
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment 73 is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs 42 U.S.C. § 1983 claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law claims in this matter and this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/25/14. (LGK)
|
August 19, 2013 |
Filing
87
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each party may file a supplemental brief on the issue of qualified immunity relating to Ballard's excessive force claim no later than September 27, 2013. Each party may file a response no later th an October 7, 2013. Parties shall properly support any facts asserted in their briefing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the September 9, 2013 trial setting is vacated, and this case will be reset for trial, if necessary, following the Court's ruling on summary judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/19/13. (LAH)
|
September 20, 2012 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff (I)sla Ballard's Motion 38 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/20/12. (LGK)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff (I')sla Ballard motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 2/24/12. (LGK)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant St. Lou is City Police Officers Robert E. Ogilvie, Ronald E. Vaughan, Isabella Lovadina, Chris N. Lovelady- Armstrong, and Jarrod L. Henderson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants Robert E. Ogilvie, Ronald E. Vaug han, Isabella Lovadina, Chris N. Lovelady-Armstrong, and Jarrod L. Henderson shall respond to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants the City of St. Louis or Daniel Isom because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 09/22/2011; (DJO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?