Seubert v. FFE Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
James G. Seubert |
Defendant: |
FFE Transportation Services, Inc. and William James Beaty |
Case Number: |
4:2011cv01651 |
Filed: |
September 22, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 23, 2013 |
Filing
117
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to take, prior to trial, a videotaped deposition of Dr. Richard Coy is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 113.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay Defendants costs attributable to the preparation of the expedited transcript. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/23/2013. (KSH)
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
112
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for reconsideration or clarification is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Doc. No. 110) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be required to pay the experts fe es and expenses associated with any supplemental deposition of the expert, but shall not be required to reimburse Defendants for any attorneys fees or expenses, associated with any such deposition. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/1/2013. (KSH)
|
April 23, 2013 |
Filing
105
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion in limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Doc. No. 74.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion to exclude the evidence described in 1 & 2 is GRANTED, except with respect to lost profits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion to exclude the evidence described in 3 is DENIED, subject to Plaintiffs prompt disclosure of evidence and agreement to pay for Defendants attorneys fees for attending the deposition and additional expert witness fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion to exclude the evidence described in 4 and 5 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for leave to amend his Marked Exhibit List to include the 2011 tax returns of Pride Cleaning & Restoration, Inc., is GRANTED, to the extent Plaintiff complies with the conditions set forth in this Order, and is otherwise DENIED. (Doc. No. 98.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/23/13. (JWJ)
|
March 6, 2013 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for reconsideration of this Courts January 29, 2013 Order denying summary judgment with respect to Plaintiffs claim for lost profits and business income is DENIED. (Doc. No. 74. ) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before March 13, 2013, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to his Rule 26 disclosures clearly stating the amount of lost profits claimed, the basis for the calculation, and identifying all documents supporting that calculation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before March 13, 2013, Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants motions in limine as set forth in Document No. 74, and Defendants shall file their reply if any, not later than March 18, 2013. (Response to Court due by 3/13/2013.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/6/2013. (KSM)
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to compel (Doc. No. 67) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before February 4, 2013, Defendant FFE shall produce all non-privileged documents and photographs prepared by CIA at FFE's direction and as claims adjuster with respect to the accident that is the subject of this lawsuit. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/29/2013. (NCL)
|
December 5, 2012 |
Filing
64
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to strike Notice of Lien (Doc. No. 44) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/5/2012. (KSM)
|
November 9, 2012 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to compel (Doc. No. 56) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall, not later than seven (7) days from the date of this Order, make its corporate representative(s) available for a video-taped deposition at a date, time and location designated by Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees and costs in connection with this motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/9/12. (JWJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?