Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Edcon Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Interior Music Corporation, Bocephus Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Shirley Eikhard USA Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Lost Boys Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Suffer in Silence Music, Sams Jammin Music, Universal-Songs Of Polygram International, Inc. and Mix-A-Lot Publishing, Inc.
Defendant: Edcon Enterprises, LLC and Edward A Pupillo
Case Number: 4:2011cv01950
Filed: November 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Courts August 1, 2012 Memorandum and Order 70 is modified for the limited purpose of granting Defendants Motion to Waive Jury Trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Strike Plain tiffs Witness for Failure to Disclose 78 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded $5,950 in statutory damages ($850 for each of the seven infringements), for which Defendants Edcon Enterprises, LLC, d/b/a/ Grand Slam Bar and Grill, and Edward A. Pupillo, are jointly and severally liable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $12,000.00, and costs of $2,194.24, for a total award of $14,194.24. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/14/2012. (RAK)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue the September 7, 2012 Hearing 74 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a new date for a hearing on damages within seven (7) days of the date of this order.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/5/12. (LGK)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 35 is GRANTED in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants on the issue of liability. The Motion remains pending to allow the parties an opportunity to s ubmit supplemental briefing on the issues of statutory damages and attorneys fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted seven (7) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to supplement their briefing on the issues of sta tutory damages and attorney's fees and costs. Defendants are granted seven (7) to reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the jury trial setting of August 20, 2012 is vacated and Defendants' Motion to Waive Jury Trial 41 is DENIED as moot. IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants' Opposition and Certain Exhibits Submitted by Defendants in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment 48 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for a hearing on damages on September 7, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12 N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/1/12. (LAH)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted 33 is GRANTED as to Third-Party Defendant Daniel T. Sims and DENIED as to Third-Party Defe ndant Complete Music, Inc. Daniel T. Sims is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Defendants' alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement 33 is GRANTED as to Third-Party Defendant Complete Music, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Third-Party Plaintiffs shall have ten (10) days, up to and including July 23, 2012, to file an amended third-party complaint in support of their claims for respondeat superior, indemnity and/or contribution.. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 7/13/12. (LGK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Edcon Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edcon Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Bartelo J. Pupillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A Pupillo
Represented By: Bartelo J. Pupillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corporation
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Eikhard USA Music
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lost Boys Music
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suffer in Silence Music
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sams Jammin Music
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs Of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mix-A-Lot Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?