Loughridge v. Byers et al
Plaintiff: James W. Loughridge
Defendant: Unknown Dowdy, Unknown Bell, Unknown Black, Unknown Pallard and Unknown Byers
Case Number: 4:2011cv02039
Filed: November 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 33 ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 31], is GRANTED. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 1/10/14. (CEL)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for a copy of the court file[Doc. 22] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. 23] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for discovery [Doc. 24] is DENIED. 23 22 24 Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 5/4/12. (CLA)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. 4] is DENIED without prejudice. 4 Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/27/12. (CLA)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION, MEMORANDUM, AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Unknown Black and Unknown Bell. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2) , defendants Unknown Black and Unknown Bell shall reply to plaintiffs claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Unknown Byers and Unknown Defendants because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/26/12. (TRC)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time[Doc. 8] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint and pay aninitial partial filing fee of $6.44 no later than February 15, 2012. 8 ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 2/15/2012.) Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 1/18/12. (CLA)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $6.44 within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original pr oceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. If plaintiff does file an amended complaint, the Court will submit it for review under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e).IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that if plaintiff does not file an amended complaint or pay the initial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice. 2 ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 1/16/2012., Response to Court due by 1/16/2012.) Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 12/16/11. (CLA) Modified on 12/16/2011 (CLA).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loughridge v. Byers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Loughridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?